EP2381607 - Mimo receiver apparatus and mimo transmitter apparatus [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 22.11.2013 Database last updated on 06.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 22.11.2013 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 25.12.2013 [2013/52] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Panasonic Corporation 1006, Oaza Kadoma Kadoma-shi Osaka 571-8501 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2011/43] | For all designated states Panasonic Corporation 1006, Oaza Kadoma Kadoma-shi Osaka 571-8501 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Duan, Jinsong c/o Panasonic Corporation IPROC 7F Twin 21 OBP Panasonic Tower 2-1-61, Shiromi, Chuo-ku Osaka-shi, Osaka 540-6207 / JP | 02 /
Ebiko, Keisuke c/o Panasonic Corporation IPROC 7F Twin 21 OBP Panasonic Tower 2-1-61, Shiromi, Chuo-ku Osaka-shi, Osaka 540-6207 / JP | 03 /
Kimura, Ryohei c/o Panasonic Corporation IPROC 7F Twin 21 OBP Panasonic Tower 2-1-61, Shiromi, Chuo-ku Osaka-shi, Osaka 540-6207 / JP | [2011/43] | Representative(s) | Grünecker Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartG mbB Leopoldstraße 4 80802 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2013/03] | Grünecker, Kinkeldey, Stockmair & Schwanhäusser Leopoldstrasse 4 80802 München / DE | ||
Former [2011/43] | Grünecker, Kinkeldey, Stockmair & Schwanhäusser Leopoldstrasse 4 80802 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 11174726.7 | 21.04.2006 | [2011/43] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2381607 | Date: | 26.10.2011 | Language: | EN | [2011/43] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2381607 | Date: | 16.01.2013 | Language: | EN | [2013/03] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 08.09.2011 | Classification | IPC: | H04B7/06 | [2012/27] | CPC: |
H04B7/0632 (EP,US);
H04B7/0684 (EP,US);
H04L1/0026 (EP,US);
H04L1/0029 (EP,US);
H04B7/0417 (EP,US);
H04L1/0003 (EP,US);
|
Former IPC [2011/43] | H04L1/00, H04L1/06, H04B7/04 | Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [2011/43] | Title | German: | MIMO-Empfangsvorrichtung und MIMO-Sendevorrichtung | [2011/43] | English: | Mimo receiver apparatus and mimo transmitter apparatus | [2011/43] | French: | Appareil récepteur MIMO et appareil émetteur MIMO | [2011/43] | Examination procedure | 20.07.2011 | Examination requested [2011/43] | 16.04.2012 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 09.08.2012 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 05.12.2012 | Fee for grant paid | 05.12.2012 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP06732219.8 / EP2007050 | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued (EP20060732219) is 05.07.2012 | Opposition(s) | 17.10.2013 | No opposition filed within time limit [2013/52] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 20.07.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 20.07.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 20.07.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 20.07.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 29.03.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XI] - LG ELECTRONICS, "L1/L2 signaling for CQI reporting considering multiple streams transmission", 3GPP DRAFT; R1-060920 CQI REPORT CONSIDERING MIMO_WITH TP, 3RD GENERATION PARTNERSHIP PROJECT (3GPP), MOBILE COMPETENCE CENTRE ; 650, ROUTE DES LUCIOLES ; F-06921 SOPHIA-ANTIPOLIS CEDEX ; FRANCE, (20060321), vol. RAN WG1, no. Athens, Greece; 20060321, XP050101826 [X] 1-4 * Introduction Section 3 * [I] 5 | [XI] - NTT DOCOMO ET AL, "AMC and HARQ Using Frequency Domain Channel-dependent Scheduling in MIMO Channel Transmission", 3GPP DRAFT; R1-050942 AMC AND HARQ IN DOWNLINK MIMO, 3RD GENERATION PARTNERSHIP PROJECT (3GPP), MOBILE COMPETENCE CENTRE ; 650, ROUTE DES LUCIOLES ; F-06921 SOPHIA-ANTIPOLIS CEDEX ; FRANCE, (20050825), vol. RAN WG1, no. London, UK; 20050825, XP050100561 [X] 1-4 * sections 4 and 6. * [I] 5 |