EP2441840 - MUCOSAL OR ENTERAL ADMINISTRATION OF BIOLOGICALLY ACTIVE MACROMOLECULES [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2012/16] | Mucosal or enteral administration of biologically active macromolecules | ||
[2017/25] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 13.07.2018 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 04.08.2017 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 16.05.2017 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 30.01.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 26.06.2020 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): CY | published on 29.07.2020 [2020/31] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Protalix Ltd. 2 Snunit Street, Science Park 20100 Carmiel / IL | [2012/16] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SHAALTIEL, Yoseph Kibbutz HaSolelim 17905 Doar-Na HaMovil / IL | 02 /
ALMON, Einat 10 Hadas Street 23840 Timrat / IL | [2017/36] |
Former [2012/16] | 01 /
Shaaltiel, Yoseph Kibbutz HaSolelim 17905 Doar-Na HaMovil / IL | ||
02 /
Almon, Einat 10 Hadas Street 23840 Timrat / IL | Representative(s) | Dennemeyer & Associates S.A. Postfach 70 04 25 81304 München / DE | [2017/36] |
Former [2014/09] | Dennemeyer & Associates S.A. Poccistrasse 11 80336 München / DE | ||
Former [2014/05] | Speich, Stéphane, et al Dennemeyer & Associates S.A. 55, rue des Bruyères 1274 Luxembourg-Howald / LU | ||
Former [2012/46] | Dennemeyer & Associates S.A. 55, rue des Bruyères 1274 Howald / LU | ||
Former [2012/16] | Dennemeyer, John James Dennemeyer & Associates S.A. 55, rue des Bruyères 1274 Howald / LU | Application number, filing date | 11175326.5 | 18.07.2006 | [2012/16] | Priority number, date | US20050699928P | 18.07.2005 Original published format: US 699928 P | [2012/16] | Previously filed application, date | WO2006IL00832 | 18.07.2006 | [2012/16] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2441840 | Date: | 18.04.2012 | Language: | EN | [2012/16] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2441840 | Date: | 06.09.2017 | Language: | EN | [2017/36] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 21.03.2012 | Classification | IPC: | C12N15/82, A61K35/00 | [2012/16] | CPC: |
C12N15/8257 (EP,US);
C12N15/82 (KR);
A61P15/08 (EP);
A61P3/00 (EP);
A61P35/00 (EP);
A61P43/00 (EP);
C12N15/8258 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2012/16] | Title | German: | MUKOSALE ODER ENTERALE VERABREICHUNG BIOLOGISCH AKTIVER MAKROMOLEKÜLE | [2017/25] | English: | MUCOSAL OR ENTERAL ADMINISTRATION OF BIOLOGICALLY ACTIVE MACROMOLECULES | [2017/25] | French: | ADMINISTRATION MUCOSALE OU ENTERALE DE MACROMOLECULES BIOLOGIQUEMENT ACTIVES | [2017/25] |
Former [2012/16] | Mukosale oder Enterale Verabreichung Biologisch Aktiver Makromoleküle | ||
Former [2012/16] | Mucosal or enteral administration of biologically active macromolecules | ||
Former [2012/16] | Administration mucosale ou enterale de macromolecules biologiquement actives | Examination procedure | 26.07.2011 | Examination requested [2012/16] | 16.10.2012 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 09.10.2015 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 14.01.2016 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 19.01.2017 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 14.04.2017 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 24.05.2017 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 31.07.2017 | Fee for grant paid | 31.07.2017 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 31.07.2017 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP06766149.6 / EP1904638 | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued (EP20060766149) is 16.07.2009 | Opposition(s) | 07.06.2018 | No opposition filed within time limit [2018/33] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 26.07.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 26.07.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 26.07.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 26.07.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 23.07.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 22.07.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 23.07.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 23.07.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 22.07.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | 24.07.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 12 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 18.07.2006 | AT | 06.09.2017 | CY | 06.09.2017 | CZ | 06.09.2017 | DK | 06.09.2017 | EE | 06.09.2017 | ES | 06.09.2017 | FI | 06.09.2017 | IT | 06.09.2017 | LT | 06.09.2017 | LV | 06.09.2017 | MC | 06.09.2017 | NL | 06.09.2017 | PL | 06.09.2017 | PT | 06.09.2017 | RO | 06.09.2017 | SE | 06.09.2017 | SI | 06.09.2017 | SK | 06.09.2017 | TR | 06.09.2017 | BG | 06.12.2017 | GR | 07.12.2017 | IS | 06.01.2018 | [2020/31] |
Former [2020/27] | HU | 18.07.2006 | |
AT | 06.09.2017 | ||
CZ | 06.09.2017 | ||
DK | 06.09.2017 | ||
EE | 06.09.2017 | ||
ES | 06.09.2017 | ||
FI | 06.09.2017 | ||
IT | 06.09.2017 | ||
LT | 06.09.2017 | ||
LV | 06.09.2017 | ||
MC | 06.09.2017 | ||
NL | 06.09.2017 | ||
PL | 06.09.2017 | ||
PT | 06.09.2017 | ||
RO | 06.09.2017 | ||
SE | 06.09.2017 | ||
SI | 06.09.2017 | ||
SK | 06.09.2017 | ||
TR | 06.09.2017 | ||
BG | 06.12.2017 | ||
GR | 07.12.2017 | ||
IS | 06.01.2018 | ||
Former [2020/16] | AT | 06.09.2017 | |
CZ | 06.09.2017 | ||
DK | 06.09.2017 | ||
EE | 06.09.2017 | ||
ES | 06.09.2017 | ||
FI | 06.09.2017 | ||
IT | 06.09.2017 | ||
LT | 06.09.2017 | ||
LV | 06.09.2017 | ||
MC | 06.09.2017 | ||
NL | 06.09.2017 | ||
PL | 06.09.2017 | ||
RO | 06.09.2017 | ||
SE | 06.09.2017 | ||
SI | 06.09.2017 | ||
SK | 06.09.2017 | ||
TR | 06.09.2017 | ||
BG | 06.12.2017 | ||
GR | 07.12.2017 | ||
IS | 06.01.2018 | ||
Former [2019/15] | AT | 06.09.2017 | |
CZ | 06.09.2017 | ||
DK | 06.09.2017 | ||
EE | 06.09.2017 | ||
ES | 06.09.2017 | ||
FI | 06.09.2017 | ||
IT | 06.09.2017 | ||
LT | 06.09.2017 | ||
LV | 06.09.2017 | ||
MC | 06.09.2017 | ||
NL | 06.09.2017 | ||
PL | 06.09.2017 | ||
RO | 06.09.2017 | ||
SE | 06.09.2017 | ||
SI | 06.09.2017 | ||
SK | 06.09.2017 | ||
BG | 06.12.2017 | ||
GR | 07.12.2017 | ||
IS | 06.01.2018 | ||
Former [2018/39] | AT | 06.09.2017 | |
CZ | 06.09.2017 | ||
DK | 06.09.2017 | ||
EE | 06.09.2017 | ||
ES | 06.09.2017 | ||
FI | 06.09.2017 | ||
IT | 06.09.2017 | ||
LT | 06.09.2017 | ||
LV | 06.09.2017 | ||
NL | 06.09.2017 | ||
PL | 06.09.2017 | ||
RO | 06.09.2017 | ||
SE | 06.09.2017 | ||
SI | 06.09.2017 | ||
SK | 06.09.2017 | ||
BG | 06.12.2017 | ||
GR | 07.12.2017 | ||
IS | 06.01.2018 | ||
Former [2018/35] | AT | 06.09.2017 | |
CZ | 06.09.2017 | ||
DK | 06.09.2017 | ||
EE | 06.09.2017 | ||
ES | 06.09.2017 | ||
FI | 06.09.2017 | ||
IT | 06.09.2017 | ||
LT | 06.09.2017 | ||
LV | 06.09.2017 | ||
NL | 06.09.2017 | ||
PL | 06.09.2017 | ||
RO | 06.09.2017 | ||
SE | 06.09.2017 | ||
SK | 06.09.2017 | ||
BG | 06.12.2017 | ||
GR | 07.12.2017 | ||
IS | 06.01.2018 | ||
Former [2018/24] | AT | 06.09.2017 | |
CZ | 06.09.2017 | ||
EE | 06.09.2017 | ||
ES | 06.09.2017 | ||
FI | 06.09.2017 | ||
IT | 06.09.2017 | ||
LT | 06.09.2017 | ||
LV | 06.09.2017 | ||
NL | 06.09.2017 | ||
PL | 06.09.2017 | ||
RO | 06.09.2017 | ||
SE | 06.09.2017 | ||
SK | 06.09.2017 | ||
BG | 06.12.2017 | ||
GR | 07.12.2017 | ||
IS | 06.01.2018 | ||
Former [2018/23] | AT | 06.09.2017 | |
CZ | 06.09.2017 | ||
EE | 06.09.2017 | ||
ES | 06.09.2017 | ||
FI | 06.09.2017 | ||
LT | 06.09.2017 | ||
LV | 06.09.2017 | ||
NL | 06.09.2017 | ||
PL | 06.09.2017 | ||
RO | 06.09.2017 | ||
SE | 06.09.2017 | ||
SK | 06.09.2017 | ||
BG | 06.12.2017 | ||
GR | 07.12.2017 | ||
IS | 06.01.2018 | ||
Former [2018/21] | CZ | 06.09.2017 | |
ES | 06.09.2017 | ||
FI | 06.09.2017 | ||
LT | 06.09.2017 | ||
LV | 06.09.2017 | ||
NL | 06.09.2017 | ||
SE | 06.09.2017 | ||
BG | 06.12.2017 | ||
GR | 07.12.2017 | ||
Former [2018/15] | ES | 06.09.2017 | |
FI | 06.09.2017 | ||
LT | 06.09.2017 | ||
LV | 06.09.2017 | ||
NL | 06.09.2017 | ||
SE | 06.09.2017 | ||
BG | 06.12.2017 | ||
GR | 07.12.2017 | ||
Former [2018/12] | ES | 06.09.2017 | |
FI | 06.09.2017 | ||
LT | 06.09.2017 | ||
LV | 06.09.2017 | ||
SE | 06.09.2017 | ||
BG | 06.12.2017 | ||
GR | 07.12.2017 | ||
Former [2018/09] | FI | 06.09.2017 | |
LT | 06.09.2017 | ||
SE | 06.09.2017 | ||
Former [2018/08] | FI | 06.09.2017 | |
LT | 06.09.2017 | ||
Former [2018/07] | LT | 06.09.2017 | Documents cited: | Search | [A] - SERENA REGGI ET AL, "Recombinant human acid [beta]-glucosidase stored in tobacco seed is stable, active and taken up by human fibroblasts", PLANT MOLECULAR BIOLOGY, KLUWER ACADEMIC PUBLISHERS, DORDRECHT, NL, (20050101), vol. 57, no. 1, doi:10.1007/S11103-004-6832-X, ISSN 1573-5028, pages 101 - 113, XP019262631 [A] 1-14 * abstract * * page 110 - page 111, column r, paragraph 1 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1007/s11103-004-6832-x | [A] - SIATSKAS C ET AL, "Gene therapy for Fabry disease", JOURNAL OF INHERITED METABOLIC DISEASE, & INTERNATIONAL SYMPOSIUM ON LYSOSOMAL STORAGE DISEASES, FABRY DISEASE: NEW INSIGHTS AND FUTURE PERSPE; SEVILLE, SPAIN; APRIL, 2001, (2001), vol. 24, no. Supplement 2, ISSN 0141-8955, pages 25 - 41, XP002670934 [A] 1-14 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1023/A:1012455421014 | [A] - GIDDINGS G ET AL, "Transgenic plants as factories for biopharmaceuticals", NATURE BIOTECHNOLOGY, NATURE PUBLISHING GROUP, NEW YORK, NY, US, (20001101), vol. 18, no. 11, doi:10.1038/81132, ISSN 1087-0156, pages 1151 - 1155, XP002988986 [A] 1-14 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1038/81132 | [A] - AZIZ M A ET AL, "Expression of protective antigen in transgenic plants: a step towards edible vaccine against anthrax", BIOCHEMICAL AND BIOPHYSICAL RESEARCH COMMUNICATIONS, ACADEMIC PRESS INC. ORLANDO, FL, US, (20021206), vol. 299, no. 3, doi:10.1016/S0006-291X(02)02625-6, ISSN 0006-291X, pages 345 - 351, XP002314418 [A] 1-14 * abstract * * page 346, column l, paragraph 3 * * page 349, column r - page 350, column r * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/S0006-291X(02)02625-6 | [A] - KIM YOUNG-SOOK ET AL, "Expression of the green fluorescent protein (GFP) in tobacco containing low nicotine for the development of edible vaccine", JOURNAL OF PLANT BIOTECHNOLOGY,, (20050601), vol. 7, no. 2, pages 97 - 103, XP002517286 [A] 1-14 * abstract * * page 97, column r * * page 102, column r, paragraph 2 - paragraph 2 * | [A] - HELGA SCHINKEL ET AL, "Production of an active recombinant thrombomodulin derivative in transgenic tobacco plants and suspension cells", TRANSGENIC RESEARCH, KLUWER ACADEMIC PUBLISHERS-PLENUM PUBLISHERS, NE, (20050601), vol. 14, no. 3, ISSN 1573-9368, pages 251 - 259, XP019269437 [A] 1-14 * abstract * * page 252, column l, paragraph 2 * * page 257, column l, paragraph 4 - page 258, column r, paragraph 1 * | by applicant | US2003229925 | US2004072317 | US2003096973 | US2003084484 | US2004175440 | US2137647 | US2003013588 | US4588693 | US5689056 | WO9307278 | US5464765 | US4855237 | EP0067553 | JPS6314693 | EP0194809 | EP0278667 | WO8706261 | US5316931 | US4945050 | US5693507 | US6020169 | US6589765 | WO0035298 | GB1489832 | US4753805 | EP0221850 | IT1273487 | US4666828 | US4683202 | US4801531 | US5192659 | US5272057 | US3791932 | US3839153 | US3850752 | US3850578 | US3853987 | US3867517 | US3879262 | US3901654 | US3935074 | US3984533 | US3996345 | US4034074 | US4098876 | US4879219 | US5011771 | US5281521 | - DORAN, CURRENT OPINION IN BIOTECH, (2000), vol. 11, pages 199 - 204 | - MASON ET AL., VACCINE, (1998), vol. 16, pages 1336 - 1340 | - KAPUSTA ET AL., FASEB J, (1999), vol. 13, pages 1796 - 99 | - GAO ET AL., W JOUR GASTROENT., (2003), vol. 9, pages 996 - 1002 | - SHCHELKUNOV ET AL., VESTN. ROSS.AKAD MED NAUK, (2004), vol. 11, pages 50 - 55 | - KORBAN ET AL., J AM COL NUTR, (2002), vol. 21, pages 212S - 217S | - WEBSTER ET AL., J OF VIROL, (2002), vol. 76, pages 7910 - 12 | - SMART ET AL., J IMMUNOL, (2003), vol. 171, pages 2116 - 26 | - JENKINS ET AL., NATURE BIOTECH, (1996), vol. 14, pages 975 - 981 | - CHRISPEELS, FAYE, transgenic plants, WILEY & SONS, (1996), pages 99 - 114 | - RUSSELL, CURR. TOP. MICROBIO. IMMUNOL., (1999), vol. 240 | - POTRYKUS, I, ANNU REV PLANT PHYSIOL PLANT MOL BIOL, (1991), vol. 42, pages 205 - 225 | - SHIMAMOTO, K. ET AL., "Fertile transgenic rice plants regenerated from transformed protoplasts.", NATURE, (1989), vol. 338, doi:doi:10.1038/338274a0, pages 274 - 276, XP002117777 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1038/338274a0 | - KLEE, H. J. ET AL., ANNU REV PLANT PHYSIOL, (1987), vol. 38, pages 467 - 486 | - "Cell Culture and Somatic Cell Genetics of Plants", KLEE, H. J., ROGERS, S. G., Molecular Biology of Plant Nuclear Genes, ACADEMIC PUBLISHERS, (1989), vol. 6, pages 2 - 25 | - "Regulation and Expression of Plant Genes in Microorganisms", GATENBY, A. A., Plant Biotechnology, BUTTERWORTH PUBLISHERS, (1989), pages 93 - 112 | - "Cell Culture and Somatic Cell Genetics of Plants", PASZKOWSKI, J. ET AL., Molecular Biology of Plant Nuclear Genes, ACADEMIC PUBLISHERS, (1989), vol. 6, pages 52 - 68 | - TORIYAMA, K. ET AL., BIO/TECHNOL, (1988), vol. 6, pages 1072 - 1074 | - ZHANG ET AL., PLANT CELL REP, (1988), vol. 7, pages 379 - 384 | - FROMM, M. E. ET AL., "Stable transformation of maize after gene transfer by electroporation", NATURE, (1986), vol. 319, doi:doi:10.1038/319791a0, pages 791 - 793, XP002059099 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1038/319791a0 | - KLEIN ET AL., BIO/TECHNOLOGY, (1988), vol. 6, pages 559 - 563 | - MCCABE, D. E. ET AL., "Stable transformation of soybean (Glycine max) by particle acceleration", BIO/TECHNOLOGY, (1988), vol. 6, doi:doi:10.1038/nbt0888-923, pages 923 - 926, XP002069342 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1038/nbt0888-923 | - SANFORD, J. C., "Biolistic plant transformation", PHYSIOL PLANT, (1990), vol. 79, pages 206 - 209 | - NEUHAUS, J. M. ET AL., THEOR APPL GENET, (1987), vol. 75, pages 30 - 36 | - NEUHAUS, J. M., SPANGENBERG, G. C., PHYSIOL PLANT, (1990), vol. 79, pages 213 - 217 | - "Exogenous gene transfer in maize (Zea mays) using DNA-treated pollen", DEWET, J. M. J. ET AL., Experimental Manipulation of Ovule Tissue, LONGMAN, (1985), pages 197 - 209 | - OHTA, Y., "High-Efficiency Genetic Transformation of Maize by a Mixture of Pollen and Exogenous DNA", PROC NATL ACAD SCI USA, (1986), vol. 83, doi:doi:10.1073/pnas.83.3.715, pages 715 - 719, XP002059098 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1073/pnas.83.3.715 | - "Leaf disc transformation.", HORSCH, R. B. ET AL., Plant Molecular Biology Manual, KLUWER ACADEMIC PUBLISHERS, (1988), vol. A5, pages 1 - 9 | - GLUZMAN, Y. ET AL., Communications in Molecular Biology: Viral Vectors, COLD SPRING HARBOR LABORATORY, (1988), pages 172 - 189 | - DAWSON, W. O. ET AL., "A tobacco mosaic virus-hybrid expresses and loses an added gene", VIROLOGY, (1989), vol. 172, doi:doi:10.1016/0042-6822(89)90130-X, pages 285 - 292, XP023047079 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/0042-6822(89)90130-X | - FRENCH, R. ET AL., SCIENCE, (1986), vol. 231, pages 1294 - 1297 | - TAKAMATSU, N. ET AL., "Production of enkephalin in tobacco protoplasts using tobacco mosaic virus RNA vector", FEBS LETT, (1990), vol. 269, doi:doi:10.1016/0014-5793(90)81121-4, pages 73 - 76, XP025605144 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/0014-5793(90)81121-4 | - GLEBA ET AL., CURRENT OPINION IN PLANT BIOLOGY, (2004), vol. 7, pages 182 - 188 | - ANDERSON, IN VITRO, (1978), vol. 14, page 334 | - ANDERSON, ACT. HORT., (1980), vol. 112, page 13 | - CHEE, POOL, SCI. HORT., (1987), vol. 32, page 85 | - CHEE ET AL., J. AM. SOC. HORT. SCI., (1992), vol. 117, page 663 | - CHU ET AL., SCIENTIA SINIC., (1975), vol. 18, page 659 | - CHU, PROC. SYMP. PLANT TISS. CULT., (1978), vol. 43 | - GUPTA, DURZAN, PLANT CELL REP., (1985), vol. 4, page 177 | - DRIVER, KUNIYUKI, HORTSCIENCE, (1984), vol. 19, page 507 | - DE GREEF, JACOBS, PLANT SCI. LETT., (1979), vol. 17, page 55 | - ERIKSSON, PHYSIOL. PLANT., (1965), vol. 18, page 976 | - GAMBORG ET AL., EXP. CELL RES., (1968), vol. 50, page 151 | - GRESSHOFF, DOY, Z, PFLANZENPHYSIOL., (1974), vol. 73, page 132 | - HELLER, ANN. SCI. NAT. BOT. BIOL. VEG. LLTH SER., (1953), vol. 14, no. 1 | - KAO, MICHAYLUK, PLANTA, (1975), vol. 126, page 105 | - LINSMAIER, SKOOG, PHYSIOL. PLANT., (1965), vol. 18, page 100 | - LITVAY ET AL., PLANT CELL REP., (1985), vol. 4, page 325 | - LLOYD, MCCOWN, PROC. INT. PLANT PROP. SOC., (1981), vol. 30, page 421 | - MURASHIGE, SKOOG, PHYSIOL. PLANT., (1962), vol. 15, page 473 | - NITSCH, NITSCH, SCIENCE, (1969), vol. 163, page 85 | - QUOIRIN ET AL., C. R. RES. STA. CULT. FRUIT MAR., (1977), vol. 93 | - SCHENK, HILDEBRANDT, CAN. J. BOT., (1972), vol. 50, page 199 | - Remington's Pharmaceutical Sciences, MACK PUBLISHING CO. | - FINGL, E. ET AL., The Pharmacological Basis of Therapeutics, (1975), page L | - KRENN V. ET AL., HISTOL HISTOPATHOL, (200007), vol. 15, no. 3, page 791 | - JAN VOSWINKEL ET AL., ARTHRITIS RES, (2001), vol. 3, no. 3, page 189 | - ERIKSON J. ET AL., IMMUNOL RES, (1998), vol. 17, no. 1-2, page 49 | - RENAUDINEAU Y. ET AL., CLIN DIAGN LAB IMMUNOL., (199903), vol. 6, no. 2, page 156 | - CHAN OT. ET AL., IMMUNOL REV, (199906), vol. 169, page 107 | - ZIMMET P., DIABETES RES CLIN PRACT, (199610), vol. 34, page 125 | - ORGIAZZI J., ENDOCRINOL METAB CLIN NORTH AM, (200006), vol. 29, no. 2, page 339 | - BRALEY-MULLEN H., YU S, J IMMUNOL, (20001215), vol. 165, no. 12, page 7262 | - TOYODA N. ET AL., NIPPON RINSHO, (199908), vol. 57, no. 8, page 1810 | - MITSUMA T., NIPPON RINSHO., (199908), vol. 57, no. 8, page 1759 | - GARZA KM. ET AL., J REPROD IMMUNOL, (199802), vol. 37, no. 2, page 87 | - DIEKMAN AB. ET AL., AM J REPROD IMMUNOL., (200003), vol. 43, no. 3, page 134 | - TINCANI A. ET AL., LUPUS, (1998), vol. 7, no. 2, pages 107 - 9 | - CROSS AH. ET AL., J NEUROIMMUNOL, (20010101), vol. 112, no. 1-2, page 1 | - ORON L. ET AL., J NEURAL TRANSM SUPPL., (1997), vol. 49, page 77 | - INFANTE AJ., AND KRAIG E, INT REV IMMUNOL, (1999), vol. 18, no. 1-2, page 83 | - KORNBERG AJ., J CLIN NEUROSCI., (200005), vol. 7, no. 3, page 191 | - KUSUNOKI S., AM J MED SCI., (200004), vol. 319, no. 4, page 234 | - TAKAMORI M., AM J MED SCI., (200004), vol. 319, no. 4, page 204 | - ANTOINE JC., HONNORAT J., REV NEUROL (PARIS, (200001), vol. 156, no. 1, page 23 | - NOBILE-ORAZIO E. ET AL., ELECTROENCEPHALOGR CLIN NEUROPHYSIOL SUPPL, (1999), vol. 50, page 419 | - VINCENT A. ET AL., ANN N Y ACAD SCI., (19980513), vol. 841, page 482 | - MATSUURA E. ET AL., LUPUS, (1998), vol. 7, no. 2, page S135 | - VAARALA O., LUPUS, (1998), vol. 7, no. 2, page S132 | - PRAPROTNIK S. ET AL., WIEN KLIN WOCHENSCHR, (20000825), vol. 112, no. 15-16, page 660 | - LACROIX-DESMAZES S. ET AL., SEMIN THROMB HEMOST., (2000), vol. 26, no. 2, page 157 | - NOEL LH., ANN MED INTERNE (PARIS, (200005), vol. 151, no. 3, page 178 | - FLAMHOLZ R. ET AL., J CLIN APHERESIS, (1999), vol. 14, no. 4, page 171 | - WALLUKAT G. ET AL., AM J CARDIOL., (19990617), vol. 83, no. 12A, page 75H | - MOCCIA F., ANN ITAL MED INT., (199904), vol. 14, no. 2, page 114 | - EFREMOV DG. ET AL., LEUK LYMPHOMA, (199801), vol. 28, no. 3-4, page 285 | - GARCIA HEROLA A. ET AL., GASTROENTEROL HEPATOL., (200001), vol. 23, no. 1, page 16 | - LANDAU YE., SHOENFELD Y., HAREFUAH, (20000116), vol. 138, no. 2, page 122 | - FEIST E. ET AL., INT ARCH ALLERGY IMMUNOL, (200009), vol. 123, no. 1, page 92 | - ZAULI D. ET AL., BIOMED PHARMACOTHER, (199906), vol. 53, no. 5-6, page 234 | - MANNS MP., J HEPATOL, (200008), vol. 33, no. 2, page 326 | - STRASSBURG CP. ET AL., EUR J GASTROENTEROL HEPATOL., (199906), vol. 11, no. 6, page 595 | - TISCH R, MCDEVITT HO, PROC NATL ACAD SCI U S A, (19940118), vol. 91, no. 2, page 437 | - DATTA SK., LUPUS, (1998), vol. 7, no. 9, page 591 | - CASTANO L., EISENBARTH GS., ANN. REV. IMMUNOL., vol. 8, page 647 | - SAKATA S. ET AL., MOL CELL ENDOCRINOL, (199303), vol. 92, no. 1, page 77 | - ALEXANDER RB. ET AL., UROLOGY, (199712), vol. 50, no. 6, page 893 | - HARA T. ET AL., BLOOD, (19910301), vol. 77, no. 5, page 1127 | - SODERSTROM M. ET AL., J NEUROL NEUROSURG PSYCHIATRY, (199405), vol. 57, no. 5, page 544 | - OSHIMA M. ET AL., EUR J IMMUNOL, (199012), vol. 20, no. 12, page 2563 | - HIEMSTRA HS. ET AL., PROC NATL ACAD SCI U S A, (20010327), vol. 98, no. 7, page 3988 | - CUNHA-NETO E. ET AL., J CLIN INVEST, (19961015), vol. 98, no. 8, page 1709 | - SEMPLE JW. ET AL., BLOOD, (19960515), vol. 87, no. 10, page 4245 | - CAPOROSSI AP. ET AL., VIRAL IMMUNOL, (1998), vol. 11, no. 1, page 9 | - SALLAH S. ET AL., ANN HEMATOL, (199703), vol. 74, no. 3, page 139 | - FRANCO A. ET AL., CLIN IMMUNOL IMMUNOPATHOL, (199003), vol. 54, no. 3, page 382 | - JONES DE., CLIN SCI (COLCH, (199611), vol. 91, no. 5, page 551 | - KELLY CJ., J AM SOC NEPHROL, (199008), vol. 1, no. 2, page 140 | - YOO TJ. ET AL., CELL IMMUNOL, (199408), vol. 157, no. 1, page 249 | - GLODDEK B., ANN N Y ACAD SCI, (19971229), vol. 830, page 266 | - MATSUURA E. ET AL., LUPUS, (1998), vol. 7, no. 2, page 135 | - VAARALA O., LUPUS, (1998), vol. 7, no. 2, page 132 | - CAPOROSSI AP ET AL., VIRAL IMMUNOL, (1998), vol. 11, no. 1, page 9 | - MCDEVITT HO, PROC NATL ACAD SCI UNITS S A, (19940118), vol. 91, no. 2, page 437 | - ZIMMET P., DIABETES RES CLIN PRACT, (199610), vol. 34, page S125 | - ORGIAZZI J. ENDOCRINOL METAB CLIN NORTH AM, (200006), vol. 29, no. 2, page 339 | - INFANTE AJ., KRAIG E, INT REV IMMUNOL, (1999), vol. 18, no. 1-2, page 83 | - HIEMSTRA HS. ET AL., PROC NATL ACAD SCI UNITS S A, (20010327), vol. 98, no. 7, page 3988 | - YOO TJ., CELL IMMUNOL, (199408), vol. 157, no. 1, page 249 | - GLODDEK B ET AL., ANN N Y ACAD SCI, (19971229), vol. 830, page 266 | - AUSUBEL, R. M.,, Current Protocols in Molecular Biology, (1994), vol. I-III | - WATSON ET AL., Recombinant DNA, SCIENTIFIC AMERICAN BOOKS | - Genome Analysis: A Laboratory Manual Series, COLD SPRING HARBOR LABORATORY PRESS, (1998), vol. 1-4 | - CELLIS, J. E.,, Cell Biology: A Laboratory Handbook, (1994), vol. I-III | - COLIGAN J. E.,, Current Protocols in Immunology, (1994), vol. I-III | - Methods in Enzymology, ACADEMIC PRESS, vol. 1-317 | WO2005IL00228 |