EP2413422 - Stack having uniform temperature distribution and method of operating the same [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 22.01.2016 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 22.01.2016 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 24.02.2016 [2016/08] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd. 129, Samsung-ro Yeongtong-gu Suwon-si, Gyeonggi-do, 443-742 / KR | [2012/39] |
Former [2012/05] | For all designated states SAMSUNG ELECTRONICS CO., LTD. 416, Maetan-dong, Yeongtong-gu Suwon-si Gyeonggi-do 442-742 / KR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Song, Tae-won c/o Samsung Advanced Insitute of Technology San 14-1 Nongseo-dong Giheung-gu Yongin-si 449-712 Gyeonggi-do / KR | 02 /
Choi, Kyoung-hwan c/o Samsung Advanced Insitute of Technology San 14-1 Nongseo-dong Giheung-gu Yongin-si 449-712 Gyeonggi-do / KR | 03 /
Yi, Jung-seok c/o Samsung Advanced Insitute of Technology San 14-1 Nongseo-dong Giheung-gu Yongin-si 449-712 Gyeonggi-do / KR | 04 /
Kim, Ji-rae c/o Samsung Advanced Insitute of Technology San 14-1 Nongseo-dong Giheung-gu Yongin-si 449-712 Gyeonggi-do / KR | [2012/05] | Representative(s) | Greene, Simon Kenneth Elkington and Fife LLP Prospect House 8 Pembroke Road Sevenoaks, Kent TN13 1XR / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2012/05] | Greene, Simon Kenneth Elkington and Fife LLP Prospect House 8 Pembroke Road Sevenoaks Kent TN13 1XR / GB | Application number, filing date | 11175366.1 | 26.07.2011 | [2012/05] | Priority number, date | KR20100074386 | 30.07.2010 Original published format: KR 20100074386 | [2012/05] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2413422 | Date: | 01.02.2012 | Language: | EN | [2012/05] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 03.11.2011 | Classification | IPC: | H01M8/04 | [2015/13] | CPC: |
H01M8/04768 (EP,US);
H01M8/04007 (EP,US);
H01M8/04029 (EP,US);
H01M8/04067 (EP,US);
Y02E60/50 (EP)
|
Former IPC [2012/05] | H01M10/50, H01M8/02, H01M8/04 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2012/05] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | Stapel mit gleichmässiger Temperaturverteilung und Betriebsverfahren dafür | [2012/05] | English: | Stack having uniform temperature distribution and method of operating the same | [2012/05] | French: | Pile dotée d'une distribution de température uniforme et son procédé de fonctionnement | [2012/05] | Examination procedure | 31.07.2012 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 01.08.2012 | Examination requested [2012/37] | 05.06.2013 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 14.10.2013 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 17.04.2015 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 28.08.2015 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2016/08] | 06.10.2015 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time [2016/08] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 05.06.2013 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.07.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.07.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 31.07.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XAI]EP0971428 (TOYOTA MOTOR CO LTD [JP]) [X] 9,10 * paragraphs [0094] - [0095]; figures 8-9 * [A] 1-8 [I] 12-15; | [XPA]WO2010109293 (TOYOTA MOTOR CO LTD [JP], et al) [XP] 9,11,15 * abstract * [A] 1-8; | [A]US2008026284 (FUJII KAZUHIRO [JP]) [A] 1-15 * abstract *; | [A]US2010089553 (YANG TAI-HER [TW]) [A] 7 * abstract * |