EP2382883 - Surgical sleeve for glove retention [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Patent revoked Status updated on 15.04.2019 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 14.12.2016 | Most recent event Tooltip | 31.03.2017 | Revocation of patent | published on 03.05.2017 [2017/18] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Avent, Inc. 5405 Windward Parkway Alpharetta, GA 30004 / US | [2015/42] |
Former [2014/32] | For all designated states KIMBERLY-CLARK WORLDWIDE, INC. 2300 Winchester Road Neenah, WI 54956 / US | ||
Former [2011/44] | For all designated states KIMBERLY-CLARK WORLDWIDE, INC. 2300 Winchester Road Neenah, WI 54956 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Mathis, Michael P. 998 Midway Road Powder Springs, GA Georgia 30127 / US | 02 /
Rotella, John 305 Barrington Drive East Roswell, GA Georgia 30076 / US | 03 /
Houde, Ajay 325 Green Way Duluth, GA Georgia 30097 / US | [2011/44] | Representative(s) | Hull, James Edward Dehns St. Bride's House 10 Salisbury Square London EC4Y 8JD / GB | [2013/37] |
Former [2011/44] | Davies, Christopher Robert Dehns St Bride's House 10 Salisbury Square London EC4Y 8JD / GB | Application number, filing date | 11175726.6 | 27.01.2006 | [2011/44] | Priority number, date | US20050096580 | 01.04.2005 Original published format: US 96580 | [2011/44] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2382883 | Date: | 02.11.2011 | Language: | EN | [2011/44] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2382883 | Date: | 06.08.2014 | Language: | EN | [2014/32] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 23.09.2011 | Classification | IPC: | A41D13/12, A41D19/00, A41D27/10, A61B19/04 | [2011/44] | CPC: |
A41D19/0089 (EP,KR,US);
A41D19/0041 (EP,KR,US);
A41D13/1209 (KR);
A61B42/10 (KR);
A41D2400/80 (KR);
A61B2090/081 (KR);
A61B42/00 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | DE, ES, FR, GB, IT, NL [2011/44] | Title | German: | Chirurgische Hülse zum Handschuhhalt | [2011/44] | English: | Surgical sleeve for glove retention | [2011/44] | French: | Manchon chirurgical pour la rétention des gants | [2011/44] | Examination procedure | 26.03.2012 | Examination requested [2012/19] | 26.04.2012 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 11.06.2013 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 23.12.2013 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 28.02.2014 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 26.06.2014 | Fee for grant paid | 26.06.2014 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 26.06.2014 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP06719688.1 / EP1863362 | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued (EP20060719688) is 05.03.2008 | Opposition(s) | Opponent(s) | 01
05.05.2015
ADMISSIBLE Paul Hartmann Aktiengesellschaft Paul-Hartmann-Strasse D-89522 Heidenheim / DE Opponent's representative DREISS Patentanwälte PartG mbB Friedrichstraße 6 70174 Stuttgart / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2015/24] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
05.05.2015
ADMISSIBLE Paul Hartmann Aktiengesellschaft Paul-Hartmann-Strasse D-89522 Heidenheim / DE Opponent's representative DREISS Patentanwälte PartG mbB Friedrichstrasse 6 70174 Stuttgart / DE | 08.06.2015 | Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition | 09.12.2016 | Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 03.05.2017 | 14.12.2016 | Despatch of communication that the patent will be revoked | 24.12.2016 | Legal effect of revocation of patent [2017/18] | 03.05.2017 | Date of oral proceedings | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.07.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 28.07.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 28.07.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 28.07.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 25.01.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 25.01.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 27.01.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 09 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XA]US5673433 (ROTHRUM ROBERT J [US]) [X] 1,2,4-8 * column 5, line 32 - column 6, line 38; figure 7 * * column 7, line 60 - column 8, line 15 * [A] 9-15; | [XDA]US6530090 (AMBROSE JULIA [US], et al) [XD] 9-15 * the whole document * [A] 1-8; | [X]US2001053643 (MCAMISH LARRY [US], et al) [X] 1,2,4-8 * paragraph [0029] - paragraph [0032]; figure 1 * * paragraph [0041] - paragraph [0043] *; | [A]US2004123367 (SCHORR PHILLIP ANDREW [US], et al) [A] 1-15 * figures 1-4 * * paragraph [0045] - paragraph [0047] * * paragraph [0050] - paragraph [0055] * * paragraph [0058] - paragraph [0063] * * paragraph [0067] * * paragraph [0088] - paragraph [0089] * | by applicant | US4041203 | US5594955 | US5680653 | US6530090 |