EP2431152 - Method and extrusion nozzle for producing reinforced hollow plastic profiles [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 30.03.2018 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 21.04.2017 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 02.04.2017 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 14.03.2017 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 02.11.2016 | Most recent event Tooltip | 10.07.2020 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): AL | published on 12.08.2020 [2020/33] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states aluplast GmbH Auf der Breit 2 76227 Karlsruhe / DE | [2012/12] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Englender, Claude 15, route du Rhin 67930 Beinheim / DE | 02 /
Schaaf, Alexander Am Kehler Tor 13 76437 Rastatt / DE | 03 /
Mölter, Ben Fronäcker 25 76474 Au am Rhein / DE | 04 /
Krell, Rüdiger Im Thäle 45 76307 Karlsbad-Auerbach / DE | 05 /
Mosquera, Alfonso 36, route de Rittershoffen 67660 Betschdorf / DE | 06 /
Heilig, Andreas Ulmenstr. 5 76676 Graben-Neudorf / DE | [2012/12] | Representative(s) | Stoffregen, Hans-Herbert Patentanwalt Friedrich-Ebert-Anlage 11b 63450 Hanau / DE | [2017/21] |
Former [2012/12] | Stoffregen, Hans-Herbert Patentanwalt Friedrich-Ebert-Anlage 11b 63450 Hanau / DE | Application number, filing date | 11175971.8 | 29.07.2011 | [2012/12] | Priority number, date | DE20101036733 | 29.07.2010 Original published format: DE102010036733 | DE20101036735 | 29.07.2010 Original published format: DE102010036735 | [2012/12] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2431152 | Date: | 21.03.2012 | Language: | DE | [2012/12] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP2431152 | Date: | 01.08.2012 | Language: | DE | [2012/31] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2431152 | Date: | 24.05.2017 | Language: | DE | [2017/21] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 29.06.2012 | Classification | IPC: | B29C47/26, B29C47/08, B29C47/02, B29C47/86, // B29C47/10, B29C47/06 | [2012/31] | CPC: |
B29C48/87 (EP,US);
B29C48/09 (EP,US);
B29C48/15 (EP,US);
B29C48/154 (EP,US);
B29C48/21 (EP,US);
B29C48/2566 (EP,US);
B29C48/2883 (EP,US);
B29C48/298 (EP,US);
B29C48/32 (EP,US);
B29C48/3363 (EP,US);
B29C48/86 (EP,US);
B29C48/865 (EP,US);
B29C2948/92704 (EP,US);
B29C2948/92838 (EP,US);
B29C2948/92847 (EP,US);
B29C48/11 (EP,US);
B29K2027/06 (EP);
B29K2105/06 (EP);
|
Former IPC [2012/12] | B29C47/02, B29C47/20, B29C47/86, B29C70/50, // B29C47/92, B29C47/06, B29C47/00 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2017/21] |
Former [2012/12] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Title | German: | Verfahren zum Herstellen von versteiften Kunststoff-Hohlprofilen sowie Extrusionswerkzeugdüse | [2012/12] | English: | Method and extrusion nozzle for producing reinforced hollow plastic profiles | [2012/12] | French: | Procédé de fabrication de profilés renforcés en matière synthétique et filière d'extrusion | [2012/12] | Examination procedure | 14.12.2012 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 14.12.2012 | Examination requested [2013/04] | 08.12.2015 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 07.06.2016 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 03.11.2016 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 08.03.2017 | Disapproval of the communication of intention to grant the patent by the applicant or resumption of examination proceedings by the EPO | 08.03.2017 | Fee for grant paid | 08.03.2017 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 03.04.2017 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 10.04.2017 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 08.12.2015 | Opposition(s) | 27.02.2018 | No opposition filed within time limit [2018/18] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 18.07.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 30.07.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 24.07.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 25.07.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 29.07.2011 | AL | 24.05.2017 | CY | 24.05.2017 | CZ | 24.05.2017 | DK | 24.05.2017 | EE | 24.05.2017 | ES | 24.05.2017 | FI | 24.05.2017 | HR | 24.05.2017 | IT | 24.05.2017 | LT | 24.05.2017 | LV | 24.05.2017 | MC | 24.05.2017 | MK | 24.05.2017 | MT | 24.05.2017 | NL | 24.05.2017 | PT | 24.05.2017 | RO | 24.05.2017 | RS | 24.05.2017 | SE | 24.05.2017 | SI | 24.05.2017 | SK | 24.05.2017 | SM | 24.05.2017 | TR | 24.05.2017 | IE | 29.07.2017 | LU | 29.07.2017 | BE | 31.07.2017 | BG | 24.08.2017 | GB | 24.08.2017 | NO | 24.08.2017 | GR | 25.08.2017 | IS | 24.09.2017 | [2020/33] |
Former [2020/27] | HU | 29.07.2011 | |
CY | 24.05.2017 | ||
CZ | 24.05.2017 | ||
DK | 24.05.2017 | ||
EE | 24.05.2017 | ||
ES | 24.05.2017 | ||
FI | 24.05.2017 | ||
HR | 24.05.2017 | ||
IT | 24.05.2017 | ||
LT | 24.05.2017 | ||
LV | 24.05.2017 | ||
MC | 24.05.2017 | ||
MK | 24.05.2017 | ||
MT | 24.05.2017 | ||
NL | 24.05.2017 | ||
PT | 24.05.2017 | ||
RO | 24.05.2017 | ||
RS | 24.05.2017 | ||
SE | 24.05.2017 | ||
SI | 24.05.2017 | ||
SK | 24.05.2017 | ||
SM | 24.05.2017 | ||
TR | 24.05.2017 | ||
IE | 29.07.2017 | ||
LU | 29.07.2017 | ||
BE | 31.07.2017 | ||
BG | 24.08.2017 | ||
GB | 24.08.2017 | ||
NO | 24.08.2017 | ||
GR | 25.08.2017 | ||
IS | 24.09.2017 | ||
Former [2020/15] | HU | 29.07.2011 | |
CY | 24.05.2017 | ||
CZ | 24.05.2017 | ||
DK | 24.05.2017 | ||
EE | 24.05.2017 | ||
ES | 24.05.2017 | ||
FI | 24.05.2017 | ||
HR | 24.05.2017 | ||
IT | 24.05.2017 | ||
LT | 24.05.2017 | ||
LV | 24.05.2017 | ||
MC | 24.05.2017 | ||
MK | 24.05.2017 | ||
MT | 24.05.2017 | ||
NL | 24.05.2017 | ||
RO | 24.05.2017 | ||
RS | 24.05.2017 | ||
SE | 24.05.2017 | ||
SI | 24.05.2017 | ||
SK | 24.05.2017 | ||
SM | 24.05.2017 | ||
TR | 24.05.2017 | ||
IE | 29.07.2017 | ||
LU | 29.07.2017 | ||
BE | 31.07.2017 | ||
BG | 24.08.2017 | ||
GB | 24.08.2017 | ||
NO | 24.08.2017 | ||
GR | 25.08.2017 | ||
IS | 24.09.2017 | ||
Former [2019/51] | HU | 29.07.2011 | |
CY | 24.05.2017 | ||
CZ | 24.05.2017 | ||
DK | 24.05.2017 | ||
EE | 24.05.2017 | ||
ES | 24.05.2017 | ||
FI | 24.05.2017 | ||
HR | 24.05.2017 | ||
IT | 24.05.2017 | ||
LT | 24.05.2017 | ||
LV | 24.05.2017 | ||
MC | 24.05.2017 | ||
MK | 24.05.2017 | ||
MT | 24.05.2017 | ||
NL | 24.05.2017 | ||
RO | 24.05.2017 | ||
RS | 24.05.2017 | ||
SE | 24.05.2017 | ||
SI | 24.05.2017 | ||
SK | 24.05.2017 | ||
SM | 24.05.2017 | ||
IE | 29.07.2017 | ||
LU | 29.07.2017 | ||
BE | 31.07.2017 | ||
BG | 24.08.2017 | ||
GB | 24.08.2017 | ||
NO | 24.08.2017 | ||
GR | 25.08.2017 | ||
IS | 24.09.2017 | ||
Former [2019/46] | HU | 29.07.2011 | |
CY | 24.05.2017 | ||
CZ | 24.05.2017 | ||
DK | 24.05.2017 | ||
EE | 24.05.2017 | ||
ES | 24.05.2017 | ||
FI | 24.05.2017 | ||
HR | 24.05.2017 | ||
IT | 24.05.2017 | ||
LT | 24.05.2017 | ||
LV | 24.05.2017 | ||
MC | 24.05.2017 | ||
MT | 24.05.2017 | ||
NL | 24.05.2017 | ||
RO | 24.05.2017 | ||
RS | 24.05.2017 | ||
SE | 24.05.2017 | ||
SI | 24.05.2017 | ||
SK | 24.05.2017 | ||
SM | 24.05.2017 | ||
IE | 29.07.2017 | ||
LU | 29.07.2017 | ||
BE | 31.07.2017 | ||
BG | 24.08.2017 | ||
GB | 24.08.2017 | ||
NO | 24.08.2017 | ||
GR | 25.08.2017 | ||
IS | 24.09.2017 | ||
Former [2019/31] | HU | 29.07.2011 | |
CZ | 24.05.2017 | ||
DK | 24.05.2017 | ||
EE | 24.05.2017 | ||
ES | 24.05.2017 | ||
FI | 24.05.2017 | ||
HR | 24.05.2017 | ||
IT | 24.05.2017 | ||
LT | 24.05.2017 | ||
LV | 24.05.2017 | ||
MC | 24.05.2017 | ||
MT | 24.05.2017 | ||
NL | 24.05.2017 | ||
RO | 24.05.2017 | ||
RS | 24.05.2017 | ||
SE | 24.05.2017 | ||
SI | 24.05.2017 | ||
SK | 24.05.2017 | ||
SM | 24.05.2017 | ||
IE | 29.07.2017 | ||
LU | 29.07.2017 | ||
BE | 31.07.2017 | ||
BG | 24.08.2017 | ||
GB | 24.08.2017 | ||
NO | 24.08.2017 | ||
GR | 25.08.2017 | ||
IS | 24.09.2017 | ||
Former [2019/30] | CZ | 24.05.2017 | |
DK | 24.05.2017 | ||
EE | 24.05.2017 | ||
ES | 24.05.2017 | ||
FI | 24.05.2017 | ||
HR | 24.05.2017 | ||
IT | 24.05.2017 | ||
LT | 24.05.2017 | ||
LV | 24.05.2017 | ||
MC | 24.05.2017 | ||
MT | 24.05.2017 | ||
NL | 24.05.2017 | ||
RO | 24.05.2017 | ||
RS | 24.05.2017 | ||
SE | 24.05.2017 | ||
SI | 24.05.2017 | ||
SK | 24.05.2017 | ||
SM | 24.05.2017 | ||
IE | 29.07.2017 | ||
LU | 29.07.2017 | ||
BE | 31.07.2017 | ||
BG | 24.08.2017 | ||
GB | 24.08.2017 | ||
NO | 24.08.2017 | ||
GR | 25.08.2017 | ||
IS | 24.09.2017 | ||
Former [2018/43] | CZ | 24.05.2017 | |
DK | 24.05.2017 | ||
EE | 24.05.2017 | ||
ES | 24.05.2017 | ||
FI | 24.05.2017 | ||
HR | 24.05.2017 | ||
IT | 24.05.2017 | ||
LT | 24.05.2017 | ||
LV | 24.05.2017 | ||
MT | 24.05.2017 | ||
NL | 24.05.2017 | ||
RO | 24.05.2017 | ||
RS | 24.05.2017 | ||
SE | 24.05.2017 | ||
SI | 24.05.2017 | ||
SK | 24.05.2017 | ||
SM | 24.05.2017 | ||
IE | 29.07.2017 | ||
LU | 29.07.2017 | ||
BE | 31.07.2017 | ||
BG | 24.08.2017 | ||
GB | 24.08.2017 | ||
NO | 24.08.2017 | ||
GR | 25.08.2017 | ||
IS | 24.09.2017 | ||
Former [2018/37] | CZ | 24.05.2017 | |
DK | 24.05.2017 | ||
EE | 24.05.2017 | ||
ES | 24.05.2017 | ||
FI | 24.05.2017 | ||
HR | 24.05.2017 | ||
IT | 24.05.2017 | ||
LT | 24.05.2017 | ||
LV | 24.05.2017 | ||
NL | 24.05.2017 | ||
RO | 24.05.2017 | ||
RS | 24.05.2017 | ||
SE | 24.05.2017 | ||
SI | 24.05.2017 | ||
SK | 24.05.2017 | ||
SM | 24.05.2017 | ||
IE | 29.07.2017 | ||
LU | 29.07.2017 | ||
BE | 31.07.2017 | ||
BG | 24.08.2017 | ||
GB | 24.08.2017 | ||
NO | 24.08.2017 | ||
GR | 25.08.2017 | ||
IS | 24.09.2017 | ||
Former [2018/35] | CZ | 24.05.2017 | |
DK | 24.05.2017 | ||
EE | 24.05.2017 | ||
ES | 24.05.2017 | ||
FI | 24.05.2017 | ||
HR | 24.05.2017 | ||
IT | 24.05.2017 | ||
LT | 24.05.2017 | ||
LV | 24.05.2017 | ||
NL | 24.05.2017 | ||
RO | 24.05.2017 | ||
RS | 24.05.2017 | ||
SE | 24.05.2017 | ||
SI | 24.05.2017 | ||
SK | 24.05.2017 | ||
SM | 24.05.2017 | ||
IE | 29.07.2017 | ||
LU | 29.07.2017 | ||
BG | 24.08.2017 | ||
GB | 24.08.2017 | ||
NO | 24.08.2017 | ||
GR | 25.08.2017 | ||
IS | 24.09.2017 | ||
Former [2018/34] | CZ | 24.05.2017 | |
DK | 24.05.2017 | ||
EE | 24.05.2017 | ||
ES | 24.05.2017 | ||
FI | 24.05.2017 | ||
HR | 24.05.2017 | ||
IT | 24.05.2017 | ||
LT | 24.05.2017 | ||
LV | 24.05.2017 | ||
NL | 24.05.2017 | ||
RO | 24.05.2017 | ||
RS | 24.05.2017 | ||
SE | 24.05.2017 | ||
SI | 24.05.2017 | ||
SK | 24.05.2017 | ||
SM | 24.05.2017 | ||
IE | 29.07.2017 | ||
LU | 29.07.2017 | ||
BG | 24.08.2017 | ||
NO | 24.08.2017 | ||
GR | 25.08.2017 | ||
IS | 24.09.2017 | ||
Former [2018/25] | CZ | 24.05.2017 | |
DK | 24.05.2017 | ||
EE | 24.05.2017 | ||
ES | 24.05.2017 | ||
FI | 24.05.2017 | ||
HR | 24.05.2017 | ||
IT | 24.05.2017 | ||
LT | 24.05.2017 | ||
LV | 24.05.2017 | ||
NL | 24.05.2017 | ||
RO | 24.05.2017 | ||
RS | 24.05.2017 | ||
SE | 24.05.2017 | ||
SI | 24.05.2017 | ||
SK | 24.05.2017 | ||
SM | 24.05.2017 | ||
BG | 24.08.2017 | ||
NO | 24.08.2017 | ||
GR | 25.08.2017 | ||
IS | 24.09.2017 | ||
Former [2018/11] | CZ | 24.05.2017 | |
DK | 24.05.2017 | ||
EE | 24.05.2017 | ||
ES | 24.05.2017 | ||
FI | 24.05.2017 | ||
HR | 24.05.2017 | ||
IT | 24.05.2017 | ||
LT | 24.05.2017 | ||
LV | 24.05.2017 | ||
NL | 24.05.2017 | ||
RO | 24.05.2017 | ||
RS | 24.05.2017 | ||
SE | 24.05.2017 | ||
SK | 24.05.2017 | ||
SM | 24.05.2017 | ||
BG | 24.08.2017 | ||
NO | 24.08.2017 | ||
GR | 25.08.2017 | ||
IS | 24.09.2017 | ||
Former [2018/10] | CZ | 24.05.2017 | |
DK | 24.05.2017 | ||
EE | 24.05.2017 | ||
ES | 24.05.2017 | ||
FI | 24.05.2017 | ||
HR | 24.05.2017 | ||
LT | 24.05.2017 | ||
LV | 24.05.2017 | ||
NL | 24.05.2017 | ||
RO | 24.05.2017 | ||
RS | 24.05.2017 | ||
SE | 24.05.2017 | ||
SK | 24.05.2017 | ||
BG | 24.08.2017 | ||
NO | 24.08.2017 | ||
GR | 25.08.2017 | ||
IS | 24.09.2017 | ||
Former [2018/09] | DK | 24.05.2017 | |
EE | 24.05.2017 | ||
ES | 24.05.2017 | ||
FI | 24.05.2017 | ||
HR | 24.05.2017 | ||
LT | 24.05.2017 | ||
LV | 24.05.2017 | ||
NL | 24.05.2017 | ||
RS | 24.05.2017 | ||
SE | 24.05.2017 | ||
BG | 24.08.2017 | ||
NO | 24.08.2017 | ||
GR | 25.08.2017 | ||
IS | 24.09.2017 | ||
Former [2017/52] | ES | 24.05.2017 | |
FI | 24.05.2017 | ||
HR | 24.05.2017 | ||
LT | 24.05.2017 | ||
LV | 24.05.2017 | ||
NL | 24.05.2017 | ||
RS | 24.05.2017 | ||
SE | 24.05.2017 | ||
BG | 24.08.2017 | ||
NO | 24.08.2017 | ||
GR | 25.08.2017 | ||
IS | 24.09.2017 | ||
Former [2017/50] | ES | 24.05.2017 | |
FI | 24.05.2017 | ||
HR | 24.05.2017 | ||
LT | 24.05.2017 | ||
LV | 24.05.2017 | ||
RS | 24.05.2017 | ||
SE | 24.05.2017 | ||
BG | 24.08.2017 | ||
NO | 24.08.2017 | ||
GR | 25.08.2017 | ||
IS | 24.09.2017 | ||
Former [2017/49] | ES | 24.05.2017 | |
FI | 24.05.2017 | ||
HR | 24.05.2017 | ||
LT | 24.05.2017 | ||
NO | 24.08.2017 | ||
GR | 25.08.2017 | ||
IS | 24.09.2017 | Documents cited: | Search | [XI]US3416982 (GEORGE PETZETAKIS ARISTOVOULOS) [X] 1,7-10 * column 5, lines 42-60 * * column 8, lines 2-72 * * claims 4-6 * * figures 1,6 * [I] 11; | [I]DE2138427 (KNEZ M) [I] 1,2,4,6 * page 4, lines 8-12 * * figures 1-114 *; | [Y]DE3824181 (BARMAG BARMER MASCHF [DE]) [Y] 3,5 * abstract * * column 5, lines 33-39 ** figures 1-2 *; | [XY]US5096646 (SHIGEMOTO HIROMI [JP], et al) [X] 1,2,4,6 * abstract * * column 3, line 66 - column 4, line 8 * * examples 1,2 * * table 1 * * figures 1,2 * [Y] 3,5; | [A]US5482667 (DUNTON THOMAS P [US], et al) [A] 1,2,4,6 * claims 1-11 *; | [X]WO0124993 (FIBREPLAS EXTRUSIONS LTD [GB], et al) [X] 1,2,4,6 * abstract * * page 2, lines 22-27 * * page 3, lines 2-24 * * page 4, lines 6-24 * * page 5, lines 26-27 * * page 6, line 16 - page 7, line 14 * * claims 1-4 * * figures 1-2 *; | [XI]WO2009136750 (HANWHA L & C CORP [KR], et al) [X] 1,3,7,12,13 * abstract * * figures 1-5 * [I] 5,8,9,14,15; | [IP]DE102009051058 (REHAU AG & CO [DE]) [IP] 1,2,4,6 * abstract * * paragraph [0005] * * paragraph [0018] * * claims 1,9,10 * * figures 1,3 * | by applicant | WO2009098069 |