EP2388587 - Method of quantifying substrate [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2011/47] | Biosensor, measuring instrument for biosensor, and method of quantifying substrate | ||
[2017/32] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 16.11.2018 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 08.12.2017 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 25.07.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 16.11.2018 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 19.12.2018 [2018/51] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states PHC Holdings Corporation 2-38-5 Nishishimbashi Minato-ku Tokyo / JP | [2018/28] |
Former [2016/15] | For all designated states Panasonic Healthcare Holdings Co., Ltd. 2-38-5 Nishishimbashi Minato-ku Tokyo 105-8433 / JP | ||
Former [2014/16] | For all designated states Panasonic Healthcare Co., Ltd. 2131-1, Minamigata Toon-shi Ehime 791-0395 / JP | ||
Former [2011/47] | For all designated states Panasonic Corporation 1006, Oaza Kadoma Kadoma-shi Osaka 571-8501 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Sawada, Yasuhiko c/o Panasonic Healthcare Holdings Co., Ltd. Intellectual Property Department 2131-1, Minamigata Toon-shi, Ehime 791-0395 / JP | 02 /
Matsumoto, Kazuhiro c/o Panasonic Healthcare Holdings Co., Ltd. Intellectual Property Department 2131-1, Minamigata Toon-shi, Ehime 791-0395 / JP | 03 /
Tokuno, Yoshinobu c/o Panasonic Healthcare Holdings Co., Ltd. Intellectual Property Department 2131-1, Minamigata Toon-shi, Ehime 791-0395 / JP | 04 /
Tokunaga, Hiroyuki c/o Panasonic Healthcare Holdings Co., Ltd. Intellectual Property Department 2131-1, Minamigata Toon-shi, Ehime 791-0395 / JP | 05 /
Miyazaki, Shoji c/o Panasonic Healthcare Holdings Co., Ltd. Intellectual Property Department 2131-1, Minamigata Toon-shi, Ehime 791-0395 / JP | [2018/02] |
Former [2011/47] | 01 /
Sawada, Yasuhiko c/o Panasonic Corporation IPROC 7F Twin 21 OBP Panasonic Tower 2-1-61, Shiromi, Chuo-ku Osaka-shi Osaka 540-6207 / JP | ||
02 /
Matsumoto, Kazuhiro 5-3-26, Kuwabara Matsuyama-shi Ehime Osaka 790-0911 / JP | |||
03 /
Tokuno, Yoshinobu 1191-36, Takoda, Tobe-cho Iyo-gun Ehime Osaka 791-2103 / JP | |||
04 /
Tokunaga, Hiroyuki 1348-6, Tanokubo, Shigenobu-cho Onsen-gun Ehime 791-0212 / JP | |||
05 /
Miyazaki, Shoji 1052, Minamisaya-cho Matsuyama-shi Ehime 791-8032 / JP | Representative(s) | Grünecker Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartG mbB Leopoldstraße 4 80802 München / DE | [2018/02] |
Former [2011/47] | Grünecker, Kinkeldey, Stockmair & Schwanhäusser Leopoldstrasse 4 80802 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 11176154.0 | 30.11.2001 | [2011/47] | Priority number, date | JP20000364225 | 30.11.2000 Original published format: JP 2000364225 | JP20010357144 | 22.11.2001 Original published format: JP 2001357144 | [2011/47] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2388587 | Date: | 23.11.2011 | Language: | EN | [2011/47] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP2388587 | Date: | 24.04.2013 | Language: | EN | [2013/17] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2388587 | Date: | 10.01.2018 | Language: | EN | [2018/02] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 21.03.2013 | Classification | IPC: | G01N33/487, G01N27/327, C12Q1/00 | [2011/47] | CPC: |
C12Q1/001 (EP,US);
G01N27/327 (US);
C12Q1/005 (EP,US);
C12Q1/006 (EP,US);
G01N27/3272 (EP,US);
G01N27/3274 (US);
G01N33/48771 (EP,US);
G01N33/5438 (EP,US);
A61B2562/0295 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT [2018/02] |
Former [2011/47] | DE, FR, GB, IT | Title | German: | Verfahren zur Quantifizierung eines Substrats | [2017/32] | English: | Method of quantifying substrate | [2017/32] | French: | Procédé de quantification de substrat | [2017/32] |
Former [2011/47] | Biosensor, Messinstrument für Biosensor und Verfahren zur Quantifizierung eines Substrats | ||
Former [2011/47] | Biosensor, measuring instrument for biosensor, and method of quantifying substrate | ||
Former [2011/47] | Biocapteur, instrument de mesure pour biocapteur et procédé de quantification de substrat | Examination procedure | 23.10.2013 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 24.10.2013 | Examination requested [2013/49] | 26.07.2017 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 14.11.2017 | Fee for grant paid | 14.11.2017 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 14.11.2017 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP01998816.1 / EP1256798 | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued (EP20010998816) is 22.07.2009 | Opposition(s) | 11.10.2018 | No opposition filed within time limit [2018/51] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 01.08.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 01.08.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 01.08.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 01.08.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 01.08.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 01.08.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 01.08.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 01.08.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 29.11.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | 28.11.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 12 | 28.11.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 13 | 26.11.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 14 | 26.11.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 15 | 25.11.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 16 | 27.11.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 17 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]EP0537761 (MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC IND CO LTD [JP]) [A] 1-8 * column 8, line 6 - line 22; figure 1 *; | [A]US5352351 (WHITE BRADLEY E [US], et al) [A] 1-8 * column 4, line 42 - column 5, line 41 *; | [A]EP0732406 (MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC IND CO LTD [JP]) [A] 1-8* column 12, line 10 - column 13, line 10; figures 3,4 * |