EP2556922 - Power tool [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 23.01.2015 Database last updated on 26.06.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.10.2018 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): AL | published on 14.11.2018 [2018/46] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states C. & E. Fein GmbH Hans-Fein-Strasse 81 73529 Schwäbisch Gmünd-Bargau / DE | [2013/07] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Clabunde, Joachim Scheuelbergstraße 41 73540 Heubach / DE | [2013/07] | Representative(s) | Witte, Weller & Partner Patentanwälte mbB Postfach 10 54 62 70047 Stuttgart / DE | [2014/12] |
Former [2013/07] | Witte, Weller & Partner Postfach 10 54 62 70047 Stuttgart / DE | Application number, filing date | 11176980.8 | 09.08.2011 | [2013/07] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2556922 | Date: | 13.02.2013 | Language: | DE | [2013/07] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2556922 | Date: | 19.03.2014 | Language: | DE | [2014/12] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 21.02.2012 | Classification | IPC: | B24B23/04, B25F5/00 | [2013/07] | CPC: |
B24B23/04 (EP,US);
B25F5/006 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2013/07] | Title | German: | Kraftgetriebenes Handwerkzeug | [2013/07] | English: | Power tool | [2013/07] | French: | Outil manuel à moteur | [2013/07] | Examination procedure | 08.08.2013 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 08.08.2013 | Examination requested [2013/38] | 27.09.2013 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 05.02.2014 | Fee for grant paid | 05.02.2014 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 27.09.2013 | Opposition(s) | 22.12.2014 | No opposition filed within time limit [2015/09] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 19.08.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 09.08.2011 | AL | 19.03.2014 | CY | 19.03.2014 | CZ | 19.03.2014 | DK | 19.03.2014 | EE | 19.03.2014 | ES | 19.03.2014 | FI | 19.03.2014 | HR | 19.03.2014 | IT | 19.03.2014 | LT | 19.03.2014 | LV | 19.03.2014 | MC | 19.03.2014 | MK | 19.03.2014 | MT | 19.03.2014 | NL | 19.03.2014 | PL | 19.03.2014 | RO | 19.03.2014 | RS | 19.03.2014 | SE | 19.03.2014 | SI | 19.03.2014 | SK | 19.03.2014 | SM | 19.03.2014 | TR | 19.03.2014 | BG | 19.06.2014 | NO | 19.06.2014 | GR | 20.06.2014 | IS | 19.07.2014 | PT | 21.07.2014 | IE | 09.08.2014 | LU | 09.08.2014 | BE | 31.08.2014 | CH | 31.08.2014 | LI | 31.08.2014 | [2018/46] |
Former [2018/31] | HU | 09.08.2011 | |
CY | 19.03.2014 | ||
CZ | 19.03.2014 | ||
DK | 19.03.2014 | ||
EE | 19.03.2014 | ||
ES | 19.03.2014 | ||
FI | 19.03.2014 | ||
HR | 19.03.2014 | ||
IT | 19.03.2014 | ||
LT | 19.03.2014 | ||
LV | 19.03.2014 | ||
MC | 19.03.2014 | ||
MK | 19.03.2014 | ||
MT | 19.03.2014 | ||
NL | 19.03.2014 | ||
PL | 19.03.2014 | ||
RO | 19.03.2014 | ||
RS | 19.03.2014 | ||
SE | 19.03.2014 | ||
SI | 19.03.2014 | ||
SK | 19.03.2014 | ||
SM | 19.03.2014 | ||
TR | 19.03.2014 | ||
BG | 19.06.2014 | ||
NO | 19.06.2014 | ||
GR | 20.06.2014 | ||
IS | 19.07.2014 | ||
PT | 21.07.2014 | ||
IE | 09.08.2014 | ||
LU | 09.08.2014 | ||
BE | 31.08.2014 | ||
CH | 31.08.2014 | ||
LI | 31.08.2014 | ||
Former [2016/33] | HU | 09.08.2011 | |
CY | 19.03.2014 | ||
CZ | 19.03.2014 | ||
DK | 19.03.2014 | ||
EE | 19.03.2014 | ||
ES | 19.03.2014 | ||
FI | 19.03.2014 | ||
HR | 19.03.2014 | ||
IT | 19.03.2014 | ||
LT | 19.03.2014 | ||
LV | 19.03.2014 | ||
MC | 19.03.2014 | ||
MT | 19.03.2014 | ||
NL | 19.03.2014 | ||
PL | 19.03.2014 | ||
RO | 19.03.2014 | ||
RS | 19.03.2014 | ||
SE | 19.03.2014 | ||
SI | 19.03.2014 | ||
SK | 19.03.2014 | ||
SM | 19.03.2014 | ||
TR | 19.03.2014 | ||
BG | 19.06.2014 | ||
NO | 19.06.2014 | ||
GR | 20.06.2014 | ||
IS | 19.07.2014 | ||
PT | 21.07.2014 | ||
IE | 09.08.2014 | ||
LU | 09.08.2014 | ||
BE | 31.08.2014 | ||
CH | 31.08.2014 | ||
LI | 31.08.2014 | ||
Former [2016/32] | HU | 09.08.2011 | |
CY | 19.03.2014 | ||
CZ | 19.03.2014 | ||
DK | 19.03.2014 | ||
EE | 19.03.2014 | ||
ES | 19.03.2014 | ||
FI | 19.03.2014 | ||
HR | 19.03.2014 | ||
IT | 19.03.2014 | ||
LT | 19.03.2014 | ||
LV | 19.03.2014 | ||
MC | 19.03.2014 | ||
MT | 19.03.2014 | ||
NL | 19.03.2014 | ||
PL | 19.03.2014 | ||
RO | 19.03.2014 | ||
RS | 19.03.2014 | ||
SE | 19.03.2014 | ||
SI | 19.03.2014 | ||
SK | 19.03.2014 | ||
SM | 19.03.2014 | ||
BG | 19.06.2014 | ||
NO | 19.06.2014 | ||
GR | 20.06.2014 | ||
IS | 19.07.2014 | ||
PT | 21.07.2014 | ||
IE | 09.08.2014 | ||
LU | 09.08.2014 | ||
BE | 31.08.2014 | ||
CH | 31.08.2014 | ||
LI | 31.08.2014 | ||
Former [2016/28] | CY | 19.03.2014 | |
CZ | 19.03.2014 | ||
DK | 19.03.2014 | ||
EE | 19.03.2014 | ||
ES | 19.03.2014 | ||
FI | 19.03.2014 | ||
HR | 19.03.2014 | ||
IT | 19.03.2014 | ||
LT | 19.03.2014 | ||
LV | 19.03.2014 | ||
MC | 19.03.2014 | ||
MT | 19.03.2014 | ||
NL | 19.03.2014 | ||
PL | 19.03.2014 | ||
RO | 19.03.2014 | ||
RS | 19.03.2014 | ||
SE | 19.03.2014 | ||
SI | 19.03.2014 | ||
SK | 19.03.2014 | ||
SM | 19.03.2014 | ||
BG | 19.06.2014 | ||
NO | 19.06.2014 | ||
GR | 20.06.2014 | ||
IS | 19.07.2014 | ||
PT | 21.07.2014 | ||
IE | 09.08.2014 | ||
LU | 09.08.2014 | ||
BE | 31.08.2014 | ||
CH | 31.08.2014 | ||
LI | 31.08.2014 | ||
Former [2016/22] | CY | 19.03.2014 | |
CZ | 19.03.2014 | ||
DK | 19.03.2014 | ||
EE | 19.03.2014 | ||
ES | 19.03.2014 | ||
FI | 19.03.2014 | ||
HR | 19.03.2014 | ||
IT | 19.03.2014 | ||
LT | 19.03.2014 | ||
LV | 19.03.2014 | ||
MC | 19.03.2014 | ||
NL | 19.03.2014 | ||
PL | 19.03.2014 | ||
RO | 19.03.2014 | ||
RS | 19.03.2014 | ||
SE | 19.03.2014 | ||
SI | 19.03.2014 | ||
SK | 19.03.2014 | ||
SM | 19.03.2014 | ||
BG | 19.06.2014 | ||
NO | 19.06.2014 | ||
IS | 19.07.2014 | ||
PT | 21.07.2014 | ||
IE | 09.08.2014 | ||
LU | 09.08.2014 | ||
BE | 31.08.2014 | ||
CH | 31.08.2014 | ||
LI | 31.08.2014 | ||
Former [2015/37] | CY | 19.03.2014 | |
CZ | 19.03.2014 | ||
DK | 19.03.2014 | ||
EE | 19.03.2014 | ||
ES | 19.03.2014 | ||
FI | 19.03.2014 | ||
HR | 19.03.2014 | ||
IT | 19.03.2014 | ||
LT | 19.03.2014 | ||
LV | 19.03.2014 | ||
MC | 19.03.2014 | ||
NL | 19.03.2014 | ||
PL | 19.03.2014 | ||
RO | 19.03.2014 | ||
RS | 19.03.2014 | ||
SE | 19.03.2014 | ||
SI | 19.03.2014 | ||
SK | 19.03.2014 | ||
BG | 19.06.2014 | ||
NO | 19.06.2014 | ||
IS | 19.07.2014 | ||
PT | 21.07.2014 | ||
IE | 09.08.2014 | ||
LU | 09.08.2014 | ||
BE | 31.08.2014 | ||
CH | 31.08.2014 | ||
LI | 31.08.2014 | ||
Former [2015/36] | CY | 19.03.2014 | |
CZ | 19.03.2014 | ||
DK | 19.03.2014 | ||
EE | 19.03.2014 | ||
ES | 19.03.2014 | ||
FI | 19.03.2014 | ||
HR | 19.03.2014 | ||
IT | 19.03.2014 | ||
LT | 19.03.2014 | ||
LV | 19.03.2014 | ||
MC | 19.03.2014 | ||
NL | 19.03.2014 | ||
PL | 19.03.2014 | ||
RO | 19.03.2014 | ||
RS | 19.03.2014 | ||
SE | 19.03.2014 | ||
SI | 19.03.2014 | ||
SK | 19.03.2014 | ||
BG | 19.06.2014 | ||
NO | 19.06.2014 | ||
IS | 19.07.2014 | ||
PT | 21.07.2014 | ||
LU | 09.08.2014 | ||
BE | 31.08.2014 | ||
CH | 31.08.2014 | ||
LI | 31.08.2014 | ||
Former [2015/20] | CY | 19.03.2014 | |
CZ | 19.03.2014 | ||
DK | 19.03.2014 | ||
EE | 19.03.2014 | ||
ES | 19.03.2014 | ||
FI | 19.03.2014 | ||
HR | 19.03.2014 | ||
IT | 19.03.2014 | ||
LT | 19.03.2014 | ||
LV | 19.03.2014 | ||
MC | 19.03.2014 | ||
NL | 19.03.2014 | ||
PL | 19.03.2014 | ||
RO | 19.03.2014 | ||
RS | 19.03.2014 | ||
SE | 19.03.2014 | ||
SK | 19.03.2014 | ||
BG | 19.06.2014 | ||
NO | 19.06.2014 | ||
IS | 19.07.2014 | ||
PT | 21.07.2014 | ||
LU | 09.08.2014 | ||
BE | 31.08.2014 | ||
CH | 31.08.2014 | ||
LI | 31.08.2014 | ||
Former [2015/19] | CY | 19.03.2014 | |
CZ | 19.03.2014 | ||
DK | 19.03.2014 | ||
EE | 19.03.2014 | ||
ES | 19.03.2014 | ||
FI | 19.03.2014 | ||
HR | 19.03.2014 | ||
IT | 19.03.2014 | ||
LT | 19.03.2014 | ||
LV | 19.03.2014 | ||
MC | 19.03.2014 | ||
NL | 19.03.2014 | ||
PL | 19.03.2014 | ||
RO | 19.03.2014 | ||
RS | 19.03.2014 | ||
SE | 19.03.2014 | ||
SK | 19.03.2014 | ||
BG | 19.06.2014 | ||
NO | 19.06.2014 | ||
IS | 19.07.2014 | ||
PT | 21.07.2014 | ||
LU | 09.08.2014 | ||
BE | 31.08.2014 | ||
Former [2015/18] | CY | 19.03.2014 | |
CZ | 19.03.2014 | ||
DK | 19.03.2014 | ||
EE | 19.03.2014 | ||
ES | 19.03.2014 | ||
FI | 19.03.2014 | ||
HR | 19.03.2014 | ||
IT | 19.03.2014 | ||
LT | 19.03.2014 | ||
LV | 19.03.2014 | ||
MC | 19.03.2014 | ||
NL | 19.03.2014 | ||
PL | 19.03.2014 | ||
RO | 19.03.2014 | ||
RS | 19.03.2014 | ||
SE | 19.03.2014 | ||
SK | 19.03.2014 | ||
BG | 19.06.2014 | ||
NO | 19.06.2014 | ||
IS | 19.07.2014 | ||
PT | 21.07.2014 | ||
Former [2015/08] | CY | 19.03.2014 | |
CZ | 19.03.2014 | ||
DK | 19.03.2014 | ||
EE | 19.03.2014 | ||
ES | 19.03.2014 | ||
FI | 19.03.2014 | ||
HR | 19.03.2014 | ||
LT | 19.03.2014 | ||
LV | 19.03.2014 | ||
NL | 19.03.2014 | ||
PL | 19.03.2014 | ||
RO | 19.03.2014 | ||
RS | 19.03.2014 | ||
SE | 19.03.2014 | ||
SK | 19.03.2014 | ||
BG | 19.06.2014 | ||
NO | 19.06.2014 | ||
IS | 19.07.2014 | ||
PT | 21.07.2014 | ||
Former [2015/02] | CY | 19.03.2014 | |
CZ | 19.03.2014 | ||
EE | 19.03.2014 | ||
ES | 19.03.2014 | ||
FI | 19.03.2014 | ||
HR | 19.03.2014 | ||
LT | 19.03.2014 | ||
LV | 19.03.2014 | ||
NL | 19.03.2014 | ||
PL | 19.03.2014 | ||
RO | 19.03.2014 | ||
RS | 19.03.2014 | ||
SE | 19.03.2014 | ||
SK | 19.03.2014 | ||
BG | 19.06.2014 | ||
NO | 19.06.2014 | ||
IS | 19.07.2014 | ||
PT | 21.07.2014 | ||
Former [2014/50] | CY | 19.03.2014 | |
CZ | 19.03.2014 | ||
EE | 19.03.2014 | ||
ES | 19.03.2014 | ||
FI | 19.03.2014 | ||
HR | 19.03.2014 | ||
LT | 19.03.2014 | ||
LV | 19.03.2014 | ||
NL | 19.03.2014 | ||
PL | 19.03.2014 | ||
RO | 19.03.2014 | ||
RS | 19.03.2014 | ||
SE | 19.03.2014 | ||
SK | 19.03.2014 | ||
BG | 19.06.2014 | ||
NO | 19.06.2014 | ||
IS | 19.07.2014 | ||
Former [2014/49] | CY | 19.03.2014 | |
CZ | 19.03.2014 | ||
EE | 19.03.2014 | ||
FI | 19.03.2014 | ||
HR | 19.03.2014 | ||
LT | 19.03.2014 | ||
LV | 19.03.2014 | ||
RO | 19.03.2014 | ||
RS | 19.03.2014 | ||
SE | 19.03.2014 | ||
BG | 19.06.2014 | ||
NO | 19.06.2014 | ||
IS | 19.07.2014 | ||
Former [2014/48] | CY | 19.03.2014 | |
CZ | 19.03.2014 | ||
EE | 19.03.2014 | ||
FI | 19.03.2014 | ||
HR | 19.03.2014 | ||
LT | 19.03.2014 | ||
LV | 19.03.2014 | ||
RS | 19.03.2014 | ||
SE | 19.03.2014 | ||
BG | 19.06.2014 | ||
NO | 19.06.2014 | ||
Former [2014/41] | CY | 19.03.2014 | |
FI | 19.03.2014 | ||
HR | 19.03.2014 | ||
LT | 19.03.2014 | ||
LV | 19.03.2014 | ||
RS | 19.03.2014 | ||
SE | 19.03.2014 | ||
NO | 19.06.2014 | ||
Former [2014/37] | CY | 19.03.2014 | |
FI | 19.03.2014 | ||
LT | 19.03.2014 | ||
SE | 19.03.2014 | ||
NO | 19.06.2014 | ||
Former [2014/36] | LT | 19.03.2014 | |
NO | 19.06.2014 | Documents cited: | Search | [YD]DE102007018466 (BOSCH GMBH ROBERT [DE]) [YD] 1,3-15 * the whole document *; | [Y]CN201511357U (POSITEC POWER TOOLS SUZHOU CO) [Y] 1,3-15 * abstract * | by applicant | WO2008128804 |