EP2386826 - Angular velocity sensor [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 02.01.2015 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 02.01.2015 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 04.02.2015 [2015/06] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Panasonic Corporation 1006, Oaza Kadoma Kadoma-shi Osaka 571-8501 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2011/46] | For all designated states Panasonic Corporation 1006, Oaza Kadoma Kadoma-shi Osaka 571-8501 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Hayashi, Michihiko c/o Panasonic Corporation IPROC IP Development Center 7F OBP Panasonic Tower, 1-61, Shiromi 2-chome, Chuo-ku, Osaka-shi Osaka, 540-6207 / JP | 02 /
Tajika, Hirofumi c/o Panasonic Corporation IPROC IP Development Center 7F OBP Panasonic Tower, 1-61, Shiromi 2-chome, Chuo-ku, Osaka-shi Osaka, 540-6207 / JP | 03 /
Nakatani, Masaya c/o Panasonic Corporation IPROC IP Development Center 7F OBP Panasonic Tower, 1-61, Shiromi 2-chome, Chuo-ku, Osaka-shi Osaka, 540-6207 / JP | [2011/46] | Representative(s) | Pautex Schneider, Nicole Véronique, et al Novagraaf International SA Chemin de l'Echo 3 1213 Onex / CH | [2014/09] |
Former [2011/46] | Pautex Schneider, Nicole Véronique, et al Novagraaf International SA 3, chemin de l'Echo 1213 Onex Geneva / CH | Application number, filing date | 11177382.6 | 05.06.2003 | [2011/46] | Priority number, date | JP20020168757 | 10.06.2002 Original published format: JP 2002168757 | JP20020306938 | 22.10.2002 Original published format: JP 2002306938 | [2011/46] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2386826 | Date: | 16.11.2011 | Language: | EN | [2011/46] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2386826 | Date: | 26.02.2014 | Language: | EN | [2014/09] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 14.10.2011 | Classification | IPC: | G01C19/5628, G01C19/5663 | [2013/31] | CPC: |
G01C19/5663 (EP,US);
G01C19/5628 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2011/46] | G01C19/56, G01P9/04 | Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [2011/46] | Title | German: | Winkelgeschwindigkeitsmesser | [2011/46] | English: | Angular velocity sensor | [2011/46] | French: | Capteur de vitesse angulaire | [2011/46] | Examination procedure | 12.08.2011 | Examination requested [2011/46] | 05.04.2012 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 20.07.2012 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 16.11.2012 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 11.09.2013 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 24.10.2013 | Disapproval of the communication of intention to grant the patent by the applicant or resumption of examination proceedings by the EPO | 21.11.2013 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 02.01.2014 | Fee for grant paid | 02.01.2014 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP03730826.9 / EP1403616 | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued (EP20030730826) is 25.11.2010 | Opposition(s) | 27.11.2014 | No opposition filed within time limit [2015/06] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 12.08.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 12.08.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 12.08.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 12.08.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 12.08.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 12.08.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 12.08.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 14.06.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 21.06.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 11 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [IA]EP0574143 (LUCAS IND PLC [GB]); | [A]DE4335219 (BOSCH GMBH ROBERT [DE]); | [AD]US5438231 (KHOSHNEVISAN MOHSEN [US], et al); | [A]WO0155675 (BAE SYSTEMS PLC [GB], et al); | [A]US6276205 (MCNIE MARK E [GB], et al) | by applicant | US5438231 |