EP2426622 - Finding low variance regions in document images for generating image anchor templates for content anchoring, data extraction, and document classification [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 03.02.2017 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.10.2018 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): AL | published on 14.11.2018 [2018/46] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Palo Alto Research Center Incorporated 3333 Coyote Hill Road Palo Alto, California 94304 / US | For all designated states Xerox Corporation Patent Department Xerox Square - 20 A 100 Clinton Avenue South Rochester, NY 14644 / US | [2016/13] |
Former [2012/10] | For all designated states Palo Alto Research Center Incorporated 3333 Coyote Hill Road Palo Alto, California 94304 / US | ||
For all designated states Xerox Corporation Patent Department, Xerox Square - 20 A, 100 Clinton Avenue South Rochester, New York 14644 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Saund, Eric 469 Clifton Avenue San Carlos, CA California 94070 / US | 02 /
Sarkar, Prateek 992 Coeur D'alene Way Sunnyvale, CA California 94087 / US | 03 /
Brito, Alejandro E. 163 Ortega Avenue Mountain View, CA California 94070 / US | 04 /
Bern, Marshall W. 368 Cedar Street San Carlos, CA California 94070 / US | 05 /
Ragnet, Francois Pre Perroud 38610 Venon / FR | [2012/10] | Representative(s) | Gill Jennings & Every LLP The Broadgate Tower 20 Primrose Street London EC2A 2ES / GB | [2016/13] |
Former [2012/10] | Skone James, Robert Edmund Gill Jennings & Every LLP The Broadgate Tower 20 Primrose Street London EC2A 2ES / GB | Application number, filing date | 11177531.8 | 15.08.2011 | [2012/10] | Priority number, date | US20100873657 | 01.09.2010 Original published format: US 873657 | [2012/10] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2426622 | Date: | 07.03.2012 | Language: | EN | [2012/10] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP2426622 | Date: | 01.05.2013 | Language: | EN | [2013/18] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2426622 | Date: | 30.03.2016 | Language: | EN | [2016/13] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 05.04.2013 | Classification | IPC: | G06K9/20, G06K9/62, G06K9/46 | [2012/10] | CPC: |
G06V30/1444 (EP,US);
G06F18/28 (US);
G06V30/18143 (EP,US);
G06V30/1914 (EP,US);
G06V30/10 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2016/13] |
Former [2012/10] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Title | German: | Auffinden von Regionen mit niedriger Varianz auf Dokumentbildern zur Erzeugung von Bildverankerungsvorlagen zur Inhaltsverankerung, Datenextraktion und Dokumentklassifizierung | [2012/10] | English: | Finding low variance regions in document images for generating image anchor templates for content anchoring, data extraction, and document classification | [2012/10] | French: | Recherche de régions à faible variation dans les documents images pour générer des modèles d'ancrage d'image pour l'ancrage de contenu, l'extraction de données et la classification de document | [2012/10] | Examination procedure | 02.10.2013 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 04.11.2013 | Examination requested [2013/50] | 10.01.2014 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 14.07.2014 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 04.02.2015 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 05.06.2015 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 21.10.2015 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 29.01.2016 | Fee for grant paid | 29.01.2016 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 29.01.2016 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 10.01.2014 | Opposition(s) | 03.01.2017 | No opposition filed within time limit [2017/10] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 02.09.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 01.09.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 31.08.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 15.08.2011 | AL | 30.03.2016 | AT | 30.03.2016 | BE | 30.03.2016 | BG | 30.03.2016 | CY | 30.03.2016 | CZ | 30.03.2016 | DK | 30.03.2016 | EE | 30.03.2016 | ES | 30.03.2016 | FI | 30.03.2016 | HR | 30.03.2016 | IT | 30.03.2016 | LT | 30.03.2016 | LV | 30.03.2016 | MC | 30.03.2016 | MK | 30.03.2016 | NL | 30.03.2016 | PL | 30.03.2016 | RO | 30.03.2016 | RS | 30.03.2016 | SE | 30.03.2016 | SI | 30.03.2016 | SK | 30.03.2016 | SM | 30.03.2016 | TR | 30.03.2016 | NO | 30.06.2016 | GR | 01.07.2016 | IS | 30.07.2016 | PT | 01.08.2016 | IE | 15.08.2016 | LU | 15.08.2016 | CH | 31.08.2016 | LI | 31.08.2016 | MT | 31.08.2016 | [2018/46] |
Former [2018/38] | HU | 15.08.2011 | |
AT | 30.03.2016 | ||
BE | 30.03.2016 | ||
BG | 30.03.2016 | ||
CY | 30.03.2016 | ||
CZ | 30.03.2016 | ||
DK | 30.03.2016 | ||
EE | 30.03.2016 | ||
ES | 30.03.2016 | ||
FI | 30.03.2016 | ||
HR | 30.03.2016 | ||
IT | 30.03.2016 | ||
LT | 30.03.2016 | ||
LV | 30.03.2016 | ||
MC | 30.03.2016 | ||
MK | 30.03.2016 | ||
NL | 30.03.2016 | ||
PL | 30.03.2016 | ||
RO | 30.03.2016 | ||
RS | 30.03.2016 | ||
SE | 30.03.2016 | ||
SI | 30.03.2016 | ||
SK | 30.03.2016 | ||
SM | 30.03.2016 | ||
TR | 30.03.2016 | ||
NO | 30.06.2016 | ||
GR | 01.07.2016 | ||
IS | 30.07.2016 | ||
PT | 01.08.2016 | ||
IE | 15.08.2016 | ||
LU | 15.08.2016 | ||
CH | 31.08.2016 | ||
LI | 31.08.2016 | ||
MT | 31.08.2016 | ||
Former [2018/31] | HU | 15.08.2011 | |
AT | 30.03.2016 | ||
BE | 30.03.2016 | ||
CY | 30.03.2016 | ||
CZ | 30.03.2016 | ||
DK | 30.03.2016 | ||
EE | 30.03.2016 | ||
ES | 30.03.2016 | ||
FI | 30.03.2016 | ||
HR | 30.03.2016 | ||
IT | 30.03.2016 | ||
LT | 30.03.2016 | ||
LV | 30.03.2016 | ||
MC | 30.03.2016 | ||
MK | 30.03.2016 | ||
NL | 30.03.2016 | ||
PL | 30.03.2016 | ||
RO | 30.03.2016 | ||
RS | 30.03.2016 | ||
SE | 30.03.2016 | ||
SI | 30.03.2016 | ||
SK | 30.03.2016 | ||
SM | 30.03.2016 | ||
TR | 30.03.2016 | ||
NO | 30.06.2016 | ||
GR | 01.07.2016 | ||
IS | 30.07.2016 | ||
PT | 01.08.2016 | ||
IE | 15.08.2016 | ||
LU | 15.08.2016 | ||
CH | 31.08.2016 | ||
LI | 31.08.2016 | ||
MT | 31.08.2016 | ||
Former [2018/29] | HU | 15.08.2011 | |
AT | 30.03.2016 | ||
BE | 30.03.2016 | ||
CY | 30.03.2016 | ||
CZ | 30.03.2016 | ||
DK | 30.03.2016 | ||
EE | 30.03.2016 | ||
ES | 30.03.2016 | ||
FI | 30.03.2016 | ||
HR | 30.03.2016 | ||
IT | 30.03.2016 | ||
LT | 30.03.2016 | ||
LV | 30.03.2016 | ||
MC | 30.03.2016 | ||
MK | 30.03.2016 | ||
NL | 30.03.2016 | ||
PL | 30.03.2016 | ||
RO | 30.03.2016 | ||
RS | 30.03.2016 | ||
SE | 30.03.2016 | ||
SI | 30.03.2016 | ||
SK | 30.03.2016 | ||
SM | 30.03.2016 | ||
TR | 30.03.2016 | ||
NO | 30.06.2016 | ||
GR | 01.07.2016 | ||
IS | 30.07.2016 | ||
PT | 01.08.2016 | ||
IE | 15.08.2016 | ||
LU | 15.08.2016 | ||
CH | 31.08.2016 | ||
LI | 31.08.2016 | ||
Former [2018/28] | HU | 15.08.2011 | |
AT | 30.03.2016 | ||
BE | 30.03.2016 | ||
CY | 30.03.2016 | ||
CZ | 30.03.2016 | ||
DK | 30.03.2016 | ||
EE | 30.03.2016 | ||
ES | 30.03.2016 | ||
FI | 30.03.2016 | ||
HR | 30.03.2016 | ||
IT | 30.03.2016 | ||
LT | 30.03.2016 | ||
LV | 30.03.2016 | ||
MC | 30.03.2016 | ||
MK | 30.03.2016 | ||
NL | 30.03.2016 | ||
PL | 30.03.2016 | ||
RO | 30.03.2016 | ||
RS | 30.03.2016 | ||
SE | 30.03.2016 | ||
SI | 30.03.2016 | ||
SK | 30.03.2016 | ||
SM | 30.03.2016 | ||
NO | 30.06.2016 | ||
GR | 01.07.2016 | ||
IS | 30.07.2016 | ||
PT | 01.08.2016 | ||
IE | 15.08.2016 | ||
LU | 15.08.2016 | ||
CH | 31.08.2016 | ||
LI | 31.08.2016 | ||
Former [2017/37] | AT | 30.03.2016 | |
BE | 30.03.2016 | ||
CZ | 30.03.2016 | ||
DK | 30.03.2016 | ||
EE | 30.03.2016 | ||
ES | 30.03.2016 | ||
FI | 30.03.2016 | ||
HR | 30.03.2016 | ||
IT | 30.03.2016 | ||
LT | 30.03.2016 | ||
LV | 30.03.2016 | ||
MC | 30.03.2016 | ||
NL | 30.03.2016 | ||
PL | 30.03.2016 | ||
RO | 30.03.2016 | ||
RS | 30.03.2016 | ||
SE | 30.03.2016 | ||
SI | 30.03.2016 | ||
SK | 30.03.2016 | ||
SM | 30.03.2016 | ||
NO | 30.06.2016 | ||
GR | 01.07.2016 | ||
IS | 30.07.2016 | ||
PT | 01.08.2016 | ||
IE | 15.08.2016 | ||
LU | 15.08.2016 | ||
CH | 31.08.2016 | ||
LI | 31.08.2016 | ||
Former [2017/23] | AT | 30.03.2016 | |
BE | 30.03.2016 | ||
CZ | 30.03.2016 | ||
DK | 30.03.2016 | ||
EE | 30.03.2016 | ||
ES | 30.03.2016 | ||
FI | 30.03.2016 | ||
HR | 30.03.2016 | ||
IT | 30.03.2016 | ||
LT | 30.03.2016 | ||
LV | 30.03.2016 | ||
MC | 30.03.2016 | ||
NL | 30.03.2016 | ||
PL | 30.03.2016 | ||
RO | 30.03.2016 | ||
RS | 30.03.2016 | ||
SE | 30.03.2016 | ||
SI | 30.03.2016 | ||
SK | 30.03.2016 | ||
SM | 30.03.2016 | ||
NO | 30.06.2016 | ||
GR | 01.07.2016 | ||
IS | 30.07.2016 | ||
PT | 01.08.2016 | ||
CH | 31.08.2016 | ||
LI | 31.08.2016 | ||
Former [2017/07] | AT | 30.03.2016 | |
BE | 30.03.2016 | ||
CZ | 30.03.2016 | ||
DK | 30.03.2016 | ||
EE | 30.03.2016 | ||
ES | 30.03.2016 | ||
FI | 30.03.2016 | ||
HR | 30.03.2016 | ||
IT | 30.03.2016 | ||
LT | 30.03.2016 | ||
LV | 30.03.2016 | ||
NL | 30.03.2016 | ||
PL | 30.03.2016 | ||
RO | 30.03.2016 | ||
RS | 30.03.2016 | ||
SE | 30.03.2016 | ||
SK | 30.03.2016 | ||
SM | 30.03.2016 | ||
NO | 30.06.2016 | ||
GR | 01.07.2016 | ||
IS | 30.07.2016 | ||
PT | 01.08.2016 | ||
Former [2017/03] | AT | 30.03.2016 | |
BE | 30.03.2016 | ||
CZ | 30.03.2016 | ||
EE | 30.03.2016 | ||
ES | 30.03.2016 | ||
FI | 30.03.2016 | ||
HR | 30.03.2016 | ||
IT | 30.03.2016 | ||
LT | 30.03.2016 | ||
LV | 30.03.2016 | ||
NL | 30.03.2016 | ||
PL | 30.03.2016 | ||
RO | 30.03.2016 | ||
RS | 30.03.2016 | ||
SE | 30.03.2016 | ||
SK | 30.03.2016 | ||
SM | 30.03.2016 | ||
NO | 30.06.2016 | ||
GR | 01.07.2016 | ||
IS | 30.07.2016 | ||
PT | 01.08.2016 | ||
Former [2016/51] | AT | 30.03.2016 | |
CZ | 30.03.2016 | ||
EE | 30.03.2016 | ||
ES | 30.03.2016 | ||
FI | 30.03.2016 | ||
HR | 30.03.2016 | ||
LT | 30.03.2016 | ||
LV | 30.03.2016 | ||
NL | 30.03.2016 | ||
PL | 30.03.2016 | ||
RO | 30.03.2016 | ||
RS | 30.03.2016 | ||
SE | 30.03.2016 | ||
SK | 30.03.2016 | ||
SM | 30.03.2016 | ||
NO | 30.06.2016 | ||
GR | 01.07.2016 | ||
IS | 30.07.2016 | ||
PT | 01.08.2016 | ||
Former [2016/50] | AT | 30.03.2016 | |
CZ | 30.03.2016 | ||
EE | 30.03.2016 | ||
ES | 30.03.2016 | ||
FI | 30.03.2016 | ||
HR | 30.03.2016 | ||
LT | 30.03.2016 | ||
LV | 30.03.2016 | ||
NL | 30.03.2016 | ||
PL | 30.03.2016 | ||
RO | 30.03.2016 | ||
RS | 30.03.2016 | ||
SE | 30.03.2016 | ||
SK | 30.03.2016 | ||
SM | 30.03.2016 | ||
NO | 30.06.2016 | ||
GR | 01.07.2016 | ||
IS | 30.07.2016 | ||
Former [2016/49] | EE | 30.03.2016 | |
FI | 30.03.2016 | ||
HR | 30.03.2016 | ||
LT | 30.03.2016 | ||
LV | 30.03.2016 | ||
NL | 30.03.2016 | ||
PL | 30.03.2016 | ||
RS | 30.03.2016 | ||
SE | 30.03.2016 | ||
NO | 30.06.2016 | ||
GR | 01.07.2016 | ||
IS | 30.07.2016 | ||
Former [2016/48] | FI | 30.03.2016 | |
HR | 30.03.2016 | ||
LT | 30.03.2016 | ||
LV | 30.03.2016 | ||
NL | 30.03.2016 | ||
RS | 30.03.2016 | ||
SE | 30.03.2016 | ||
NO | 30.06.2016 | ||
GR | 01.07.2016 | ||
IS | 30.07.2016 | ||
Former [2016/44] | FI | 30.03.2016 | |
HR | 30.03.2016 | ||
LT | 30.03.2016 | ||
LV | 30.03.2016 | ||
NL | 30.03.2016 | ||
RS | 30.03.2016 | ||
SE | 30.03.2016 | ||
NO | 30.06.2016 | ||
GR | 01.07.2016 | ||
Former [2016/39] | FI | 30.03.2016 | |
HR | 30.03.2016 | ||
LT | 30.03.2016 | ||
LV | 30.03.2016 | ||
RS | 30.03.2016 | ||
SE | 30.03.2016 | ||
NO | 30.06.2016 | ||
GR | 01.07.2016 | ||
Former [2016/36] | FI | 30.03.2016 | |
HR | 30.03.2016 | ||
LT | 30.03.2016 | ||
NO | 30.06.2016 | ||
GR | 01.07.2016 | ||
Former [2016/35] | FI | 30.03.2016 | |
HR | 30.03.2016 | ||
NO | 30.06.2016 | ||
GR | 01.07.2016 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US5920658 (YAMAGATA HIDEAKI [JP], et al) [A] 1-14 * column 2, line 35 - column 3, line 32 * * column 4, line 62 - column 6, line 11 ** column 8, lines 28-39 *; | [XI]US2002106128 (ZLOTNICK AVIAD [IL]) [X] 1,9,11 * paragraphs [0009] - [0022] * * paragraphs [0037] - [0054] * [I] 2-8,10,12-14; | [A]US6778703 (ZLOTNICK AVIAD [IL]) [A] 1-14 * column 2, line 18 - column 3, line 46 * * column 9, line 48 - column 13, paragraph 7 * | Examination | US5182656 |