EP2505080 - HEALTH PROMOTING DRINK COMPOUND [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2012/40] | Health promoting drink compound | ||
[2016/29] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 31.03.2017 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 08.12.2016 | Most recent event Tooltip | 31.03.2017 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 03.05.2017 [2017/18] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states feelglück GmbH Alsterchaussee 3 20149 Hamburg / DE | [2013/02] |
Former [2012/40] | For all designated states Pegel, Sybille Hikeberg 18 22043 Hamburg / DE | ||
For all designated states Kaesemann, Vera Wexstr. 26 20355 Hamburg / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Pegel, Sybille Hikeberg 18 22043 Hamburg / DE | 02 /
Kaesemann, Vera Wexstrasse 26 20355 Hamburg / DE | [2013/02] |
Former [2012/40] | 01 /
see applicant ... | Representative(s) | Uexküll & Stolberg Partnerschaft von Patent- und Rechtsanwälten mbB Beselerstraße 4 22607 Hamburg / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2012/40] | UEXKÜLL & STOLBERG Patentanwälte Beselerstrasse 4 22607 Hamburg / DE | Application number, filing date | 11178028.4 | 18.08.2011 | [2012/40] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2505080 | Date: | 03.10.2012 | Language: | DE | [2012/40] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 10.07.2012 | Classification | IPC: | A23L2/02 | [2016/26] | CPC: |
A23L2/52 (EP);
A23L33/105 (EP);
A61K36/28 (EP);
A61K36/48 (EP);
A61K36/899 (EP)
| C-Set: |
A61K36/28, A61K2300/00 (EP);
A61K36/48, A61K2300/00 (EP);
A61K36/899, A61K2300/00 (EP)
|
Former IPC [2012/40] | A23L1/30, A23L2/52, A61K36/28, A61K36/899, A61K36/48 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2012/40] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | GESUNDHEITSFÖRDERNDE GETRÄNKEZUSAMMENSETZUNG | [2016/29] | English: | HEALTH PROMOTING DRINK COMPOUND | [2016/29] | French: | COMPOSITION DE BOISSON AMÉLIORANT LA SANTÉ | [2016/29] |
Former [2012/40] | Gesundheitsfördernde Getränkezusammensetzung | ||
Former [2012/40] | Health promoting drink compound | ||
Former [2012/40] | Composition de boisson améliorant la santé | Examination procedure | 03.04.2013 | Examination requested [2013/20] | 23.07.2013 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 23.07.2014 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 01.12.2014 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 26.05.2015 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 09.11.2015 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 22.06.2016 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 03.11.2016 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2017/18] | 09.12.2016 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time [2017/18] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 23.07.2014 | Request for further processing for: | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to reply to the Extended European Search Report/Written Opinion of the International Searching Authority/International Preliminary Examination Report/Supplementary international search report/Supplementary European search report | 23.07.2013 | Request for further processing filed | 23.07.2013 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 02.08.2013 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 19.08.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 28.08.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 29.02.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.08.2015 | 05   M06   Fee paid on   29.02.2016 | 31.08.2016 | 06   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]BE445104 (PONCETTE) [X] 1,4,6,8,9,11,13-15 * example 1; claims 1,6 *; | HU2004002682 [ ] (HUNG.); | [X]WO9961038 (ADAMS FOOD LTD [US], et al) [X] 1,4,6,14,15 * example 1; claims 1,4,8-85 *; | [X]US2008095881 (BER LEONID [US]) [X] 1,8,11,14,15 * claims 1,8-19 *; | [X]US2010015109 (BIAS SCOTT [US]) [X] 1,4,6,8,9,13-15 * paragraph [0093]; claims 1,2,4,12-14,17,20 *; | CN101133829 [ ] (WEIQI ZHOU [CN]); | CN101406290 [ ] (ZHENG SHANG [CN]); | JP2001226279 [ ] (ORBIT SHOJI KK, et al); | [A]WO2008118129 (CALIFORNIA NATURAL PRODUCTS [US]) [A] 1-15 * the whole document *; | [A]WO2010063057 (GRAIN FOODS CRD LTD [AU], et al) [A] 1-15 * the whole document *; | [A]RU2152734 ; | [X]US5744187 (GAYNOR MITCHEL L [US]) [X] 1,4,6,8,11,14,15 * the whole document *; | [X]KR20070073650 ; | JPH11178552 [ ] (LET S KK) | [X] - CAPLUS, CHEMICAL ABSTRACTS SERVICE, COLUMBUS, OHIO, US, (20070409), Database accession no. 2007-390896, URL: stn, XP002670670 [X] 1,4,6,8,9,13-15 * abstract * | [X] - CAPLUS, (20080311), Database accession no. 2008:302375, URL: stn, XP002670671 [X] 1,11,14,15 * abstract * | [X] - CAPLUS, CHEMICAL ABSTRACTS SERVICE, COLUMBUS, OHIO, US, (20090417), Database accession no. 2009:460408, URL: stn, XP002670672 [X] 1,11,14,15 * abstract * | [X] - CAPLUS, CHEMICAL ABSTRACTS SERVICE, COLUMBUS, OHIO, US, (20010821), Database accession no. 2001:602815, URL: stn, XP002670673 [X] 1,4,6,8,9,13-15 * abstract * | [A] - DATABASE WPI, 0, Derwent World Patents Index, vol. 2001, no. 01, Database accession no. 2001-005779, XP002670674 & RU2152734 C2 20000720 (ZELENKOV V N) [A] 1-15 * abstract * | [X] - DATABASE WPI, 0, Derwent World Patents Index, vol. 2008, no. 04, Database accession no. 2008-A56616, XP002678926 & KR20070073650 A 20070710 (BIO SPECTRUM INC) [X] 1,4,6,8,11,14,15 * abstract * | [X] - CAPLUS, CHEMICAL ABSTRACTS SERVICE, COLUMBUS, OHIO, US, (20091123), Database accession no. 2009:1450397, URL: stn, XP002678927 [X] 1,11,14,15 * abstract * | by applicant | WO0189319 |