EP2423920 - Re-addressable alternate content [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 29.01.2016 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.10.2018 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): AL | published on 14.11.2018 [2018/46] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Comcast Cable Communications, LLC 1701 JFK Boulevard Philadelphia, PA 19103 / US | [2012/09] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Holden, Dan c/o Comcast Calble Communications, LLC 1701 JFK Boulevard Philadelphia, PA 19103 / US | [2012/11] | Representative(s) | V.O. P.O. Box 87930 2508 DH Den Haag / NL | [N/P] |
Former [2015/13] | Jansen, Cornelis Marinus V.O. Johan de Wittlaan 7 2517 JR Den Haag / NL | ||
Former [2012/09] | Jansen, Cornelis Marinus VEREENIGDE Johan de Wittlaan 7 2517 JR Den Haag / NL | Application number, filing date | 11178368.4 | 23.08.2011 | [2012/09] | Priority number, date | US20100862716 | 24.08.2010 Original published format: US 862716 | [2012/09] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2423920 | Date: | 29.02.2012 | Language: | EN | [2012/09] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP2423920 | Date: | 30.05.2012 | Language: | EN | [2012/22] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2423920 | Date: | 25.03.2015 | Language: | EN | [2015/13] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 02.05.2012 | Classification | IPC: | G11B27/00, H04N5/783, H04N7/16, H04N21/431, H04N21/432, H04N21/44, H04N21/458, H04N21/81 | [2012/09] | CPC: |
G11B27/005 (EP,US);
G11B27/10 (EP,US);
H04N21/23424 (EP,US);
H04N21/23439 (EP,US);
H04N21/2387 (EP,US);
H04N21/6587 (EP,US);
H04N21/812 (EP,US);
H04N5/783 (EP,US);
H04N7/163 (EP,US);
H04N5/765 (EP,US);
H04N5/781 (EP,US);
H04N5/907 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2012/09] | Title | German: | Wieder abrufbarer, sich verändernder Inhalt | [2012/09] | English: | Re-addressable alternate content | [2012/09] | French: | Contenu alternatif ré-adressable | [2012/09] | Examination procedure | 28.11.2012 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 28.11.2012 | Examination requested [2013/02] | 28.05.2014 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 08.09.2014 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 16.10.2014 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 16.02.2015 | Fee for grant paid | 16.02.2015 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 16.02.2015 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 28.05.2014 | Opposition(s) | 05.01.2016 | No opposition filed within time limit [2016/09] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.08.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.08.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 23.08.2011 | AL | 25.03.2015 | AT | 25.03.2015 | BE | 25.03.2015 | BG | 25.03.2015 | CY | 25.03.2015 | CZ | 25.03.2015 | DK | 25.03.2015 | EE | 25.03.2015 | ES | 25.03.2015 | FI | 25.03.2015 | HR | 25.03.2015 | IT | 25.03.2015 | LT | 25.03.2015 | LV | 25.03.2015 | MC | 25.03.2015 | MK | 25.03.2015 | MT | 25.03.2015 | NL | 25.03.2015 | PL | 25.03.2015 | RO | 25.03.2015 | RS | 25.03.2015 | SE | 25.03.2015 | SI | 25.03.2015 | SK | 25.03.2015 | SM | 25.03.2015 | TR | 25.03.2015 | NO | 25.06.2015 | GR | 26.06.2015 | IS | 25.07.2015 | PT | 27.07.2015 | IE | 23.08.2015 | LU | 23.08.2015 | CH | 31.08.2015 | LI | 31.08.2015 | [2018/46] |
Former [2018/31] | HU | 23.08.2011 | |
AT | 25.03.2015 | ||
BE | 25.03.2015 | ||
BG | 25.03.2015 | ||
CY | 25.03.2015 | ||
CZ | 25.03.2015 | ||
DK | 25.03.2015 | ||
EE | 25.03.2015 | ||
ES | 25.03.2015 | ||
FI | 25.03.2015 | ||
HR | 25.03.2015 | ||
IT | 25.03.2015 | ||
LT | 25.03.2015 | ||
LV | 25.03.2015 | ||
MC | 25.03.2015 | ||
MK | 25.03.2015 | ||
MT | 25.03.2015 | ||
NL | 25.03.2015 | ||
PL | 25.03.2015 | ||
RO | 25.03.2015 | ||
RS | 25.03.2015 | ||
SE | 25.03.2015 | ||
SI | 25.03.2015 | ||
SK | 25.03.2015 | ||
SM | 25.03.2015 | ||
TR | 25.03.2015 | ||
NO | 25.06.2015 | ||
GR | 26.06.2015 | ||
IS | 25.07.2015 | ||
PT | 27.07.2015 | ||
IE | 23.08.2015 | ||
LU | 23.08.2015 | ||
CH | 31.08.2015 | ||
LI | 31.08.2015 | ||
Former [2017/38] | HU | 23.08.2011 | |
AT | 25.03.2015 | ||
BE | 25.03.2015 | ||
BG | 25.03.2015 | ||
CY | 25.03.2015 | ||
CZ | 25.03.2015 | ||
DK | 25.03.2015 | ||
EE | 25.03.2015 | ||
ES | 25.03.2015 | ||
FI | 25.03.2015 | ||
HR | 25.03.2015 | ||
IT | 25.03.2015 | ||
LT | 25.03.2015 | ||
LV | 25.03.2015 | ||
MC | 25.03.2015 | ||
MT | 25.03.2015 | ||
NL | 25.03.2015 | ||
PL | 25.03.2015 | ||
RO | 25.03.2015 | ||
RS | 25.03.2015 | ||
SE | 25.03.2015 | ||
SI | 25.03.2015 | ||
SK | 25.03.2015 | ||
SM | 25.03.2015 | ||
TR | 25.03.2015 | ||
NO | 25.06.2015 | ||
GR | 26.06.2015 | ||
IS | 25.07.2015 | ||
PT | 27.07.2015 | ||
IE | 23.08.2015 | ||
LU | 23.08.2015 | ||
CH | 31.08.2015 | ||
LI | 31.08.2015 | ||
Former [2017/21] | AT | 25.03.2015 | |
BE | 25.03.2015 | ||
CZ | 25.03.2015 | ||
DK | 25.03.2015 | ||
EE | 25.03.2015 | ||
ES | 25.03.2015 | ||
FI | 25.03.2015 | ||
HR | 25.03.2015 | ||
IT | 25.03.2015 | ||
LT | 25.03.2015 | ||
LV | 25.03.2015 | ||
MC | 25.03.2015 | ||
MT | 25.03.2015 | ||
NL | 25.03.2015 | ||
PL | 25.03.2015 | ||
RO | 25.03.2015 | ||
RS | 25.03.2015 | ||
SE | 25.03.2015 | ||
SI | 25.03.2015 | ||
SK | 25.03.2015 | ||
GR | 26.06.2015 | ||
IS | 25.07.2015 | ||
PT | 27.07.2015 | ||
IE | 23.08.2015 | ||
LU | 23.08.2015 | ||
CH | 31.08.2015 | ||
LI | 31.08.2015 | ||
Former [2016/37] | AT | 25.03.2015 | |
BE | 25.03.2015 | ||
CZ | 25.03.2015 | ||
DK | 25.03.2015 | ||
EE | 25.03.2015 | ||
ES | 25.03.2015 | ||
FI | 25.03.2015 | ||
HR | 25.03.2015 | ||
IT | 25.03.2015 | ||
LT | 25.03.2015 | ||
LV | 25.03.2015 | ||
MC | 25.03.2015 | ||
NL | 25.03.2015 | ||
PL | 25.03.2015 | ||
RO | 25.03.2015 | ||
RS | 25.03.2015 | ||
SE | 25.03.2015 | ||
SI | 25.03.2015 | ||
SK | 25.03.2015 | ||
GR | 26.06.2015 | ||
IS | 25.07.2015 | ||
PT | 27.07.2015 | ||
IE | 23.08.2015 | ||
LU | 23.08.2015 | ||
CH | 31.08.2015 | ||
LI | 31.08.2015 | ||
Former [2016/33] | AT | 25.03.2015 | |
CZ | 25.03.2015 | ||
DK | 25.03.2015 | ||
EE | 25.03.2015 | ||
ES | 25.03.2015 | ||
FI | 25.03.2015 | ||
HR | 25.03.2015 | ||
IT | 25.03.2015 | ||
LT | 25.03.2015 | ||
LV | 25.03.2015 | ||
MC | 25.03.2015 | ||
NL | 25.03.2015 | ||
PL | 25.03.2015 | ||
RO | 25.03.2015 | ||
RS | 25.03.2015 | ||
SE | 25.03.2015 | ||
SI | 25.03.2015 | ||
SK | 25.03.2015 | ||
GR | 26.06.2015 | ||
IS | 25.07.2015 | ||
PT | 27.07.2015 | ||
IE | 23.08.2015 | ||
LU | 23.08.2015 | ||
CH | 31.08.2015 | ||
LI | 31.08.2015 | ||
Former [2016/24] | AT | 25.03.2015 | |
CZ | 25.03.2015 | ||
DK | 25.03.2015 | ||
EE | 25.03.2015 | ||
ES | 25.03.2015 | ||
FI | 25.03.2015 | ||
HR | 25.03.2015 | ||
IT | 25.03.2015 | ||
LT | 25.03.2015 | ||
LV | 25.03.2015 | ||
MC | 25.03.2015 | ||
NL | 25.03.2015 | ||
PL | 25.03.2015 | ||
RO | 25.03.2015 | ||
RS | 25.03.2015 | ||
SE | 25.03.2015 | ||
SI | 25.03.2015 | ||
SK | 25.03.2015 | ||
GR | 26.06.2015 | ||
IS | 25.07.2015 | ||
PT | 27.07.2015 | ||
LU | 23.08.2015 | ||
CH | 31.08.2015 | ||
LI | 31.08.2015 | ||
Former [2016/22] | AT | 25.03.2015 | |
CZ | 25.03.2015 | ||
DK | 25.03.2015 | ||
EE | 25.03.2015 | ||
ES | 25.03.2015 | ||
FI | 25.03.2015 | ||
HR | 25.03.2015 | ||
IT | 25.03.2015 | ||
LT | 25.03.2015 | ||
LV | 25.03.2015 | ||
MC | 25.03.2015 | ||
NL | 25.03.2015 | ||
PL | 25.03.2015 | ||
RO | 25.03.2015 | ||
RS | 25.03.2015 | ||
SE | 25.03.2015 | ||
SK | 25.03.2015 | ||
GR | 26.06.2015 | ||
IS | 25.07.2015 | ||
PT | 27.07.2015 | ||
LU | 23.08.2015 | ||
CH | 31.08.2015 | ||
LI | 31.08.2015 | ||
Former [2016/21] | AT | 25.03.2015 | |
CZ | 25.03.2015 | ||
DK | 25.03.2015 | ||
EE | 25.03.2015 | ||
ES | 25.03.2015 | ||
FI | 25.03.2015 | ||
HR | 25.03.2015 | ||
IT | 25.03.2015 | ||
LT | 25.03.2015 | ||
LV | 25.03.2015 | ||
MC | 25.03.2015 | ||
NL | 25.03.2015 | ||
PL | 25.03.2015 | ||
RO | 25.03.2015 | ||
RS | 25.03.2015 | ||
SE | 25.03.2015 | ||
SK | 25.03.2015 | ||
GR | 26.06.2015 | ||
IS | 25.07.2015 | ||
PT | 27.07.2015 | ||
LU | 23.08.2015 | ||
Former [2016/18] | AT | 25.03.2015 | |
CZ | 25.03.2015 | ||
DK | 25.03.2015 | ||
EE | 25.03.2015 | ||
ES | 25.03.2015 | ||
FI | 25.03.2015 | ||
HR | 25.03.2015 | ||
LT | 25.03.2015 | ||
LV | 25.03.2015 | ||
MC | 25.03.2015 | ||
NL | 25.03.2015 | ||
PL | 25.03.2015 | ||
RO | 25.03.2015 | ||
RS | 25.03.2015 | ||
SE | 25.03.2015 | ||
SK | 25.03.2015 | ||
GR | 26.06.2015 | ||
IS | 25.07.2015 | ||
PT | 27.07.2015 | ||
LU | 23.08.2015 | ||
Former [2016/17] | AT | 25.03.2015 | |
CZ | 25.03.2015 | ||
DK | 25.03.2015 | ||
EE | 25.03.2015 | ||
ES | 25.03.2015 | ||
FI | 25.03.2015 | ||
HR | 25.03.2015 | ||
LT | 25.03.2015 | ||
LV | 25.03.2015 | ||
NL | 25.03.2015 | ||
PL | 25.03.2015 | ||
RO | 25.03.2015 | ||
RS | 25.03.2015 | ||
SE | 25.03.2015 | ||
SK | 25.03.2015 | ||
GR | 26.06.2015 | ||
IS | 25.07.2015 | ||
PT | 27.07.2015 | ||
LU | 23.08.2015 | ||
Former [2016/07] | AT | 25.03.2015 | |
CZ | 25.03.2015 | ||
DK | 25.03.2015 | ||
EE | 25.03.2015 | ||
ES | 25.03.2015 | ||
FI | 25.03.2015 | ||
HR | 25.03.2015 | ||
LT | 25.03.2015 | ||
LV | 25.03.2015 | ||
NL | 25.03.2015 | ||
PL | 25.03.2015 | ||
RO | 25.03.2015 | ||
RS | 25.03.2015 | ||
SE | 25.03.2015 | ||
SK | 25.03.2015 | ||
GR | 26.06.2015 | ||
IS | 25.07.2015 | ||
PT | 27.07.2015 | ||
Former [2015/51] | AT | 25.03.2015 | |
CZ | 25.03.2015 | ||
EE | 25.03.2015 | ||
ES | 25.03.2015 | ||
FI | 25.03.2015 | ||
HR | 25.03.2015 | ||
LT | 25.03.2015 | ||
LV | 25.03.2015 | ||
NL | 25.03.2015 | ||
PL | 25.03.2015 | ||
RO | 25.03.2015 | ||
RS | 25.03.2015 | ||
SE | 25.03.2015 | ||
SK | 25.03.2015 | ||
GR | 26.06.2015 | ||
IS | 25.07.2015 | ||
PT | 27.07.2015 | ||
Former [2015/50] | CZ | 25.03.2015 | |
EE | 25.03.2015 | ||
ES | 25.03.2015 | ||
FI | 25.03.2015 | ||
HR | 25.03.2015 | ||
LT | 25.03.2015 | ||
LV | 25.03.2015 | ||
NL | 25.03.2015 | ||
PL | 25.03.2015 | ||
RO | 25.03.2015 | ||
RS | 25.03.2015 | ||
SE | 25.03.2015 | ||
SK | 25.03.2015 | ||
GR | 26.06.2015 | ||
IS | 25.07.2015 | ||
PT | 27.07.2015 | ||
Former [2015/49] | CZ | 25.03.2015 | |
EE | 25.03.2015 | ||
ES | 25.03.2015 | ||
FI | 25.03.2015 | ||
HR | 25.03.2015 | ||
LT | 25.03.2015 | ||
LV | 25.03.2015 | ||
NL | 25.03.2015 | ||
RO | 25.03.2015 | ||
RS | 25.03.2015 | ||
SE | 25.03.2015 | ||
SK | 25.03.2015 | ||
GR | 26.06.2015 | ||
PT | 27.07.2015 | ||
Former [2015/41] | FI | 25.03.2015 | |
HR | 25.03.2015 | ||
LT | 25.03.2015 | ||
LV | 25.03.2015 | ||
NL | 25.03.2015 | ||
RS | 25.03.2015 | ||
SE | 25.03.2015 | ||
GR | 26.06.2015 | ||
Former [2015/39] | FI | 25.03.2015 | |
HR | 25.03.2015 | ||
LT | 25.03.2015 | ||
LV | 25.03.2015 | ||
RS | 25.03.2015 | ||
SE | 25.03.2015 | ||
GR | 26.06.2015 | ||
Former [2015/37] | FI | 25.03.2015 | |
HR | 25.03.2015 | ||
LT | 25.03.2015 | ||
SE | 25.03.2015 | ||
GR | 26.06.2015 | ||
Former [2015/36] | FI | 25.03.2015 | |
HR | 25.03.2015 | ||
LT | 25.03.2015 | ||
SE | 25.03.2015 | ||
Former [2015/35] | LT | 25.03.2015 | Documents cited: | Search | [XI]US2008155585 (CRANER MICHAEL L [US], et al) [X] 1,10 * paragraph [0096] - paragraph [0099]; figure 13 * [I] 2-9,11-15; | [I]US2002144262 (PLOTNICK MICHAEL A [US], et al) [I] 1-15 * paragraph [0094] * * paragraph [0194] *; | [I]US2006218602 (SHERER W P [US], et al) [I] 1-15 * paragraph [0027]; figure 2A * * paragraph [0044] - paragraph [0045] * | by applicant | US20090393277 |