EP2397170 - Medical fluid administration device and color coding and detection system for glucose sensor set [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 15.11.2013 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 15.11.2013 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 18.12.2013 [2013/51] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Medtronic MiniMed, Inc. 18000 Devonshire Street Northridge, CA 91325 / US | [2011/51] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Bazargan, Afshin 148 Park Hill Road Simi Valley, CA 93065 / US | 02 /
Vazquez, Pablo 16800 Lahey St. Granada Hills, CA 91344 / US | 03 /
Monirabbasi, Salman 3777 Mentone Avenue No 113 Los Angeles, CA 90034 / US | 04 /
Covelman, Paul 5344 Seneca Place Simi Valley, CA 93065 / US | [2011/51] | Representative(s) | Lau, Sarah Jane Kilburn & Strode LLP Lacon London 84 Theobalds Road London WC1X 8NL / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2011/51] | Lau, Sarah Jane Kilburn & Strode LLP 20 Red Lion Street London WC1R 4PJ / GB | Application number, filing date | 11178847.7 | 18.12.2009 | [2011/51] | Priority number, date | US20080346726 | 30.12.2008 Original published format: US 346726 | US20080346730 | 30.12.2008 Original published format: US 346730 | [2011/51] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2397170 | Date: | 21.12.2011 | Language: | EN | [2011/51] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP2397170 | Date: | 05.12.2012 | Language: | EN | [2012/49] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 07.11.2012 | Classification | IPC: | A61M5/142, G06K7/12, G06K19/06 | [2011/51] | CPC: |
A61M5/14244 (EP,US);
A61B5/14532 (EP,US);
A61B5/14546 (EP,US);
A61B5/6849 (EP,US);
A61B90/92 (EP,US);
A61J1/00 (EP,US);
A61B2562/085 (EP,US);
A61B5/0002 (EP,US);
A61J2205/10 (EP,US);
A61J2205/20 (EP,US);
A61J2205/30 (EP,US);
A61M2205/14 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2011/51] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | RS | Not yet paid | Title | German: | Medizinische Flüssigkeitsverabreichungsvorrichtung mit Farberkennungs- und kodierungssystem für Blutzuckersensorset | [2011/51] | English: | Medical fluid administration device and color coding and detection system for glucose sensor set | [2011/51] | French: | Dispositif d'administration médical avec système de codage et détection de couleurs pour capteur de glycémie | [2011/51] | Examination procedure | 06.06.2013 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2013/51] | 12.07.2013 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [2013/51] | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP09796229.4 / EP2391407 | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued (EP20090796229) is 22.03.2016 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.12.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 26.12.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]EP0473987 (SCHOTT GLASWERKE [DE], et al) [Y] 3-7,10 * the whole document *; | [Y]WO2006083933 (BAXTER INT [US], et al) [Y] 3-7,10 * the whole document *; | [IY]WO2006084464 (NOVO NORDISK AS [DK], et al) [I] 3-7,10 * the whole document * * claim 7 * [Y] 3-7,10; | [Y]EP1872814 (DEBIOTECH SA [CH]) [Y] 3-7,10* the whole document *; | [Y]US2008269714 (MASTROTOTARO JOHN J [US], et al) [Y] 3-7,10 * abstract * | by applicant | US4562751 | US4678408 | US4685903 | US5080653 | US5097122 | US5505709 | US6248093 | US6248067 | US6362591 | US6424847 | US6554798 | US6555986 | US6752787 | US6895263 | US19990377472 | US20040867529 | US20050211095 | US20050322568 | US20060515225 | US20060588875 | US20060588847 | US20060589323 | US20060646000 |