EP2506010 - VEGF polymorphisms and anti-angiogenesis therapy [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 22.04.2016 Database last updated on 23.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 06.10.2017 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): CY, HU, MT, NL, SE | published on 08.11.2017 [2017/45] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Genentech, Inc. 1 DNA Way South San Francisco, CA 94080 / US | [2012/40] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Schneider, Bryan P 790 Foxboro Drive Avon, IN Indiana 46123 / US | 02 /
Radovich, Milan 7116 Moon Court Indianapolis, IN Indiana 46241 / US | 03 /
Sledge, George W. 6342 Dawson Lake Drive Indianapolis, IN Indiana 46220 / US | [2012/40] | Representative(s) | Denison, Christopher Marcus Mewburn Ellis LLP City Tower 40 Basinghall Street London EC2V 5DE / GB | [2015/25] |
Former [2012/40] | Denison, Christopher Marcus Mewburn Ellis LLP 33 Gutter Lane London EC2V 8AS / GB | Application number, filing date | 11179025.9 | 26.11.2008 | [2012/40] | Priority number, date | US20070991616P | 30.11.2007 Original published format: US 991616 P | US20080038699P | 21.03.2008 Original published format: US 38699 P | [2012/40] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2506010 | Date: | 03.10.2012 | Language: | EN | [2012/40] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP2506010 | Date: | 09.01.2013 | Language: | EN | [2013/02] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2506010 | Date: | 17.06.2015 | Language: | EN | [2015/25] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 07.12.2012 | Classification | IPC: | G01N33/50 | [2012/40] | CPC: |
G01N33/574 (EP,KR,US);
C12Q1/6883 (EP,CN,KR,US);
A61P35/00 (EP);
G01N33/15 (KR);
G01N33/6893 (EP,KR,US);
C12Q1/6804 (RU);
C12Q1/6827 (RU);
C12Q1/6844 (RU);
C12Q1/6858 (RU);
C12Q1/686 (RU);
C12Q1/6881 (RU);
C12Q2531/113 (RU);
C12Q2561/101 (RU);
C12Q2561/113 (RU);
C12Q2600/106 (EP,CN,KR,US);
C12Q2600/118 (EP,CN,KR,US);
C12Q2600/136 (RU);
C12Q2600/142 (EP,CN,KR,US);
C12Q2600/156 (EP,CN,KR,RU,US);
G01N2800/321 (EP,KR,US);
G01N2800/50 (EP,KR,US);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2015/25] |
Former [2012/40] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | VEGF-Polymorphismen und Anti-Angiogenesetherapie | [2012/40] | English: | VEGF polymorphisms and anti-angiogenesis therapy | [2012/40] | French: | Polymorphismes VEGF et thérapie anti-angiogenèse | [2012/40] | Examination procedure | 09.05.2012 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: Claims {1} | 09.07.2013 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 09.07.2013 | Examination requested [2013/33] | 02.07.2014 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 11.11.2014 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 09.01.2015 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 06.05.2015 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | 07.05.2015 | Fee for grant paid | 07.05.2015 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP08857392.8 / EP2220492 | Divisional application(s) | EP15168854.6 Application withdrawn : 29.04.2016 | Opposition(s) | 18.03.2016 | No opposition filed within time limit [2016/21] | Request for further processing for: | Loss of rights: Claims | 05.07.2012 | Request for further processing filed | 05.07.2012 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 17.07.2012 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 14.09.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 14.09.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 13.11.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 07.11.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 07.11.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 26.11.2008 | AT | 17.06.2015 | BE | 17.06.2015 | CY | 17.06.2015 | CZ | 17.06.2015 | DK | 17.06.2015 | EE | 17.06.2015 | FI | 17.06.2015 | HR | 17.06.2015 | LT | 17.06.2015 | LV | 17.06.2015 | MC | 17.06.2015 | MT | 17.06.2015 | NL | 17.06.2015 | PL | 17.06.2015 | RO | 17.06.2015 | SE | 17.06.2015 | SI | 17.06.2015 | SK | 17.06.2015 | BG | 17.09.2015 | NO | 17.09.2015 | GR | 18.09.2015 | IS | 17.10.2015 | PT | 19.10.2015 | IE | 26.11.2015 | LU | 26.11.2015 | [2017/39] |
Former [2017/03] | AT | 17.06.2015 | |
BE | 17.06.2015 | ||
CZ | 17.06.2015 | ||
DK | 17.06.2015 | ||
EE | 17.06.2015 | ||
FI | 17.06.2015 | ||
HR | 17.06.2015 | ||
LT | 17.06.2015 | ||
LV | 17.06.2015 | ||
MC | 17.06.2015 | ||
PL | 17.06.2015 | ||
RO | 17.06.2015 | ||
SI | 17.06.2015 | ||
SK | 17.06.2015 | ||
BG | 17.09.2015 | ||
NO | 17.09.2015 | ||
GR | 18.09.2015 | ||
IS | 17.10.2015 | ||
PT | 19.10.2015 | ||
IE | 26.11.2015 | ||
LU | 26.11.2015 | ||
Former [2016/45] | AT | 17.06.2015 | |
CZ | 17.06.2015 | ||
DK | 17.06.2015 | ||
EE | 17.06.2015 | ||
FI | 17.06.2015 | ||
HR | 17.06.2015 | ||
LT | 17.06.2015 | ||
LV | 17.06.2015 | ||
MC | 17.06.2015 | ||
PL | 17.06.2015 | ||
RO | 17.06.2015 | ||
SI | 17.06.2015 | ||
SK | 17.06.2015 | ||
BG | 17.09.2015 | ||
NO | 17.09.2015 | ||
GR | 18.09.2015 | ||
IS | 17.10.2015 | ||
PT | 19.10.2015 | ||
IE | 26.11.2015 | ||
LU | 26.11.2015 | ||
Former [2016/36] | AT | 17.06.2015 | |
CZ | 17.06.2015 | ||
DK | 17.06.2015 | ||
EE | 17.06.2015 | ||
FI | 17.06.2015 | ||
HR | 17.06.2015 | ||
LT | 17.06.2015 | ||
LV | 17.06.2015 | ||
MC | 17.06.2015 | ||
PL | 17.06.2015 | ||
RO | 17.06.2015 | ||
SI | 17.06.2015 | ||
SK | 17.06.2015 | ||
BG | 17.09.2015 | ||
NO | 17.09.2015 | ||
GR | 18.09.2015 | ||
IS | 17.10.2015 | ||
PT | 19.10.2015 | ||
LU | 26.11.2015 | ||
Former [2016/31] | AT | 17.06.2015 | |
CZ | 17.06.2015 | ||
DK | 17.06.2015 | ||
EE | 17.06.2015 | ||
FI | 17.06.2015 | ||
HR | 17.06.2015 | ||
LT | 17.06.2015 | ||
LV | 17.06.2015 | ||
MC | 17.06.2015 | ||
PL | 17.06.2015 | ||
RO | 17.06.2015 | ||
SK | 17.06.2015 | ||
BG | 17.09.2015 | ||
NO | 17.09.2015 | ||
GR | 18.09.2015 | ||
IS | 17.10.2015 | ||
PT | 19.10.2015 | ||
LU | 26.11.2015 | ||
Former [2016/28] | AT | 17.06.2015 | |
CZ | 17.06.2015 | ||
DK | 17.06.2015 | ||
EE | 17.06.2015 | ||
FI | 17.06.2015 | ||
HR | 17.06.2015 | ||
LT | 17.06.2015 | ||
LV | 17.06.2015 | ||
MC | 17.06.2015 | ||
PL | 17.06.2015 | ||
RO | 17.06.2015 | ||
SK | 17.06.2015 | ||
BG | 17.09.2015 | ||
NO | 17.09.2015 | ||
GR | 18.09.2015 | ||
IS | 17.10.2015 | ||
PT | 19.10.2015 | ||
Former [2016/20] | AT | 17.06.2015 | |
CZ | 17.06.2015 | ||
DK | 17.06.2015 | ||
EE | 17.06.2015 | ||
FI | 17.06.2015 | ||
HR | 17.06.2015 | ||
LT | 17.06.2015 | ||
LV | 17.06.2015 | ||
PL | 17.06.2015 | ||
RO | 17.06.2015 | ||
SK | 17.06.2015 | ||
BG | 17.09.2015 | ||
NO | 17.09.2015 | ||
GR | 18.09.2015 | ||
IS | 17.10.2015 | ||
PT | 19.10.2015 | ||
Former [2016/11] | AT | 17.06.2015 | |
CZ | 17.06.2015 | ||
EE | 17.06.2015 | ||
FI | 17.06.2015 | ||
HR | 17.06.2015 | ||
LT | 17.06.2015 | ||
LV | 17.06.2015 | ||
PL | 17.06.2015 | ||
RO | 17.06.2015 | ||
SK | 17.06.2015 | ||
BG | 17.09.2015 | ||
NO | 17.09.2015 | ||
GR | 18.09.2015 | ||
IS | 17.10.2015 | ||
PT | 19.10.2015 | ||
Former [2016/10] | CZ | 17.06.2015 | |
EE | 17.06.2015 | ||
FI | 17.06.2015 | ||
HR | 17.06.2015 | ||
LT | 17.06.2015 | ||
LV | 17.06.2015 | ||
PL | 17.06.2015 | ||
RO | 17.06.2015 | ||
SK | 17.06.2015 | ||
BG | 17.09.2015 | ||
NO | 17.09.2015 | ||
GR | 18.09.2015 | ||
IS | 17.10.2015 | ||
PT | 19.10.2015 | ||
Former [2016/09] | EE | 17.06.2015 | |
FI | 17.06.2015 | ||
HR | 17.06.2015 | ||
LT | 17.06.2015 | ||
LV | 17.06.2015 | ||
BG | 17.09.2015 | ||
NO | 17.09.2015 | ||
GR | 18.09.2015 | ||
Former [2015/50] | FI | 17.06.2015 | |
HR | 17.06.2015 | ||
LT | 17.06.2015 | ||
LV | 17.06.2015 | ||
BG | 17.09.2015 | ||
NO | 17.09.2015 | ||
GR | 18.09.2015 | ||
Former [2015/49] | FI | 17.06.2015 | |
HR | 17.06.2015 | ||
LT | 17.06.2015 | ||
LV | 17.06.2015 | ||
NO | 17.09.2015 | ||
GR | 18.09.2015 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]WO2006086544 (REGENERON PHARMA [US], et al) [A] 1-12 * the whole document *; | [A]WO2007022101 (REGENERON PHARMA [US], et al) [A] 1-12 * the whole document *; | [A]US2007207486 (LENZ HEINZ-JOSEF [US]) [A] 1-12 * abstract *; | [XA] - HAN S W ET AL, VEGF gene polymorphisms and susceptibility to rheumatoid arthritis, RHEUMATOLOGY (OXFORD), VOL. 43, NR. 9, PAGE(S) 1173-1177, (200409), ISSN 1462-0324, XP002681348 [X] 11,12 * page 1174; table 1 * [A] 1-10 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1093/RHEUMATOLOGY/KEH281 | [A] - KOUKOURAKIS M I ET AL, "VEGF gene sequence variation defines VEGF gene expression status and angiogenic activity in non-small cell lung cancer", LUNG CANCER, ELSEVIER, AMSTERDAM, NL, (20041201), vol. 46, no. 3, doi:10.1016/J.LUNGCAN.2004.04.037, ISSN 0169-5002, pages 293 - 298, XP004638802 [A] 1-12 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.lungcan.2004.04.037 | [XP] - SCHNEIDER BRYAN P ET AL, "Association of vascular endothelial growth factor and vascular endothelial growth factor receptor-2 genetic polymorphisms with outcome in a trial of paclitaxel compared with paclitaxel plus bevacizumab in advanced breast cancer: ECOG 2100.", JOURNAL OF CLINICAL ONCOLOGY : OFFICIAL JOURNAL OF THE AMERICAN SOCIETY OF CLINICAL ONCOLOGY 1 OCT 2008, (20081001), vol. 26, no. 28, ISSN 1527-7755, pages 4672 - 4678, XP009111528 [XP] 1-12 * the whole document * | by applicant | US4656127 | US4816567 | WO9102087 | US4998617 | WO9215712 | US5176996 | US5210015 | US5256775 | US5264564 | US5858659 | US5952172 | US5968740 | US6018041 | US6025136 | US6455249 | - FERRARA, DAVIS-SMYTH, ENDOCRINE REV., (1997), vol. 18, pages 4 - 25 | - FERRARA, J. J\ÆOL. MED., (1999), vol. 77, pages 527 - 543 | - PRESTA ET AL., CANCER RES., (1997), vol. 57, pages 4593 - 4599 | - SCHNEIDER ET AL., BREAST CANCER RESEARCH AND TREATMENT, (2008), vol. 111, pages 157 - 63 | - Methods in Enzymology, ACADEMIC PRESS, INC. | - LEUNG ET AL., SCIENCE, (1989), vol. 246, page 1306 | - HOUCK ET AL., MOL. ENDOCRIN., (1991), vol. 5, page 1806 | - KOHLER ET AL., NATURE, (1975), vol. 256, page 495 | - CLACKSON ET AL., NATURE, (1991), vol. 352, pages 624 - 628 | - MARKS ET AL., J. MO/. BIOL., (1991), vol. 222, pages 581 - 597 | - HE ET AL., ADV. EXP. MED. BIOL., (2007), vol. 593, pages 117 - 133 | - HELLER, ANNU. REV. BIOMED. ENG., (2002), vol. 4, pages 129 - 153 | - CRONIN ET AL., HUMAN MUTATION, (1996), vol. 7, page 244 | - MYERS ET AL., SCIENCE, (1985), vol. 230, page 1242 | - COTTON ET AL., PROC. NATL. ACAD. SCI. USA, (1988), vol. 85, page 4397 | - SALEEBA ET AL., METH. ENZYMOL., (1992), vol. 217, pages 286 - 295 | - ORITA ET AL., PROC NATL. ACAD. SCI USA, (1989), vol. 86, page 2766 | - COTTON, MUTAT. RES., (1993), vol. 285, pages 125 - 144 | - HAYASHI, GENET. ANAL. TECH. APPL., (1992), vol. 9, pages 73 - 79 | - KEEN ET AL., TRENDS GENET., (1991), vol. 7, page 5 | - MYERS ET AL., NATURE, (1985), page 313495 | - ROSENBAUM, REISSNER, BIOPHY,S. CHEM., (1987), vol. 265, page 1275 | - SAIKI ET AL., NATURE, (1986), vol. 324, page 163 | - SAIKI ET AL., PROC. NATL. ACAD. SCI. USA, (1989), vol. 86, page 6230 | - GIBBS ET AL., NUCL. ACIDS RES., (1989), vol. 17, pages 2437 - 2448 | - PROSSNER, TIBTECH, (1993), vol. 11, page 238 | - NEWTON ET AL., NUCL. ACIDS RES., (1989), vol. 17, page 2503 | - GASPARINI ET AL., MOL. CELL. PROBES, (1992), vol. 6, page 1 | - LARIDEGREN, U. ET AL., SCIENCE, (1988), vol. 241, pages 1077 - 1080 | - NICKERSON, D. A. ET AL., PROC. NATL. ACAD. SCI. USA, (1990), vol. 87, pages 8923 - 8927 | - KOMHER, J. S. ET AL., NUCL. ACIDS. RES., (1989), vol. 17, pages 7779 - 7784 | - SOKOLOV, B. P., NUCL. ACIDS RES., (1990), vol. 18, page 3671 | - SYVANEN, A.-C. ET AL., GENOMICS, (1990), vol. 8, pages 684 - 692 | - KUPPUSWAMY, M. N. ET AL., PROC. NATL. ACAD. SCI. USA, (1991), vol. 88, pages 1143 - 1147 | - PREZANT, T. R. ET AL., HUM. MUTAT., (1992), vol. 1, pages 159 - 164 | - UGOZZOLI, L. ET AL., GATA, (1992), vol. 9, pages 107 - 112 | - NYREN, P. ET AL., ANAL. BIOCHEM., (1993), vol. 208, pages 171 - 175 | - HOLLAND ET AL., PROC. NATL. ACAD. SCI. USA, (1991), vol. 88, pages 7276 - 7280 | - KELLEY, S. O. ET AL., NUCL. ACIDS RES., (1999), vol. 27, pages 4830 - 4837 | US19990610386 | US20070991616 |