EP2564743 - An apparatus and method for processing a food stuff [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 21.02.2014 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 21.02.2014 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 26.03.2014 [2014/13] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Koninklijke Philips N.V. High Tech Campus 5 5656 AE Eindhoven / NL | [2013/39] |
Former [2013/10] | For all designated states Koninklijke Philips Electronics N.V. Groenewoudseweg 1 5621 BA Eindhoven / NL | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Untereregger, Johann P.O. Box 220 5600 AE Eindhoven / NL | 02 /
Rosenwirth, Christian P.O. Box 220 5600 AE Eindhoven / NL | [2013/10] | Representative(s) | Damen, Daniel Martijn Philips Intellectual Property & Standards High Tech Campus 5 5656 AE Eindhoven / NL | [N/P] |
Former [2013/10] | Damen, Daniel Martijn Philips Intellectual Property & Standards P.O. Box 220 5600 AE Eindhoven / NL | Application number, filing date | 11179685.0 | 01.09.2011 | [2013/10] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2564743 | Date: | 06.03.2013 | Language: | EN | [2013/10] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 25.01.2012 | Classification | IPC: | A47J43/07 | [2013/10] | CPC: |
A47J43/07 (EP,RU,US);
A47J43/0711 (EP,US);
B26D1/28 (EP,US);
B26D3/22 (EP,US);
A47J43/0722 (EP,US);
B26D7/08 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2013/10] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | Vorrichtung und Verfahren zur Verarbeitung eines Lebensmittels | [2013/10] | English: | An apparatus and method for processing a food stuff | [2013/10] | French: | Appareil et procédé pour traiter des aliments | [2013/10] | Examination procedure | 07.09.2013 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2014/13] | 29.10.2013 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [2014/13] | Fees paid | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.09.2013 | 03   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XYI]DE7934681U (PHILIPS N.V.) [X] 1,3-10,13,15 * figure 1 * [Y] 11,12 [I] 2,14; | [YD]WO2010012727 (BSH BOSCH SIEMENS HAUSGERAETE [DE], et al) [YD] 11,12 * figures 1a, 1b * |