EP2426265 - Demolition arm intended for being connected by a hinged link to the carrier of a demolition vehicle and demolition vehicle provided with such an arm [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 04.08.2017 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 27.04.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 04.08.2017 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 06.09.2017 [2017/36] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Demlone Zone Industrielle La Croix des Chaumes 85170 Le Poire sur Vie / FR | [2012/10] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Cornu, Freddy La Franche 85190 Beaulieu sous la Roche / FR | [2012/10] | Representative(s) | Godineau, Valérie, et al Ipsilon 3, rue Edouard Nignon 44300 Nantes / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2012/46] | Godineau, Valérie, et al Brema-Loyer 3 rue Edouard Nignon 44300 Nantes / FR | ||
Former [2012/10] | Godineau, Valérie Brema-Loyer 9, rue Edmé Mariotte B.P. 70620 44306 Nantes Cedex 3 / FR | Application number, filing date | 11179775.9 | 01.09.2011 | [2012/10] | Priority number, date | FR20100056969 | 02.09.2010 Original published format: FR 1056969 | [2012/10] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2426265 | Date: | 07.03.2012 | Language: | FR | [2012/10] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 06.12.2011 | Classification | IPC: | E02F3/30, E02F3/36, B66C23/70 | [2012/10] | CPC: |
E02F3/301 (EP);
E02F3/306 (EP);
E02F3/3636 (EP);
E02F3/3663 (EP);
E02F3/369 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2012/10] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | Abrissarm, der zur Verbindung mit dem Träger einer Abrissmaschine mittels einer Gelenkverbindung vorgesehen ist, und Abrissmaschine, die mit einem solchen Arm ausgestattet ist | [2012/10] | English: | Demolition arm intended for being connected by a hinged link to the carrier of a demolition vehicle and demolition vehicle provided with such an arm | [2012/10] | French: | Bras de démolition du type destiné à être relié par une liaison articulée au porteur d'un engin de démolition et engin de démolition équipé d'un tel bras | [2012/10] | Examination procedure | 02.07.2012 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 02.07.2012 | Examination requested [2012/32] | 01.04.2017 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2017/36] | 28.04.2017 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2017/36] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 20.09.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 26.09.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 25.09.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.09.2016 | 06   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]JP2005249185 (KOBELCO CONSTR MACHINERY LTD) [Y] 1-10 * abstract *; | [Y]EP0960981 (SPITZNAS MASCHINENFABRIK GMBH [DE]) [Y] 1-10 * abstract * * paragraphs [0029] - [0031] - [0 37] * * column 3, line 6 - line 12 *; | [Y]WO2010084012 (MALACRINO GIANLUCA [IT], et al) [Y] 4-7 * figure 5 *; | [A]EP2130976 (KOBLECO CONSTRUCTION MACHINERY CO LTD [JP]) [A] 1 * figures 6a, 6b *; | [A]JP2009257020 (TAGUCHI KOGYO KK) [A] 1 * figures 1-5 * | by applicant | EP0960981 | JP2005249185 |