EP2565504 - Connector of a transport pipeline [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 07.02.2014 Database last updated on 02.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.02.2014 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 12.03.2014 [2014/11] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Aurotec GmbH Wartenburgerstrasse 1a 4840 Vöcklabruck / AT | [2013/10] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Zikeli, Stefan Himmelreich Strasse 30 4844 Regau / AT | 02 /
Ecker, Friedrich St. Anna Strasse 10 4850 Timelkam / AT | [2013/10] | Representative(s) | SONN Patentanwälte GmbH & Co KG Riemergasse 14 1010 Wien / AT | [N/P] |
Former [2013/10] | Sonn & Partner Patentanwälte Riemergasse 14 1010 Wien / AT | Application number, filing date | 11179847.6 | 02.09.2011 | [2013/10] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2565504 | Date: | 06.03.2013 | Language: | DE | [2013/10] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 23.04.2012 | Classification | IPC: | F16K17/16, F16K17/40, F28F27/00 | [2013/10] | CPC: |
F28F7/02 (EP,CN,US);
F16K17/1613 (CN,RU);
F16K17/162 (US);
F16K17/02 (US);
F28F27/00 (CN,RU);
B01F25/43161 (EP,US);
F16K17/40 (RU);
F28F2265/12 (EP,US);
Y10T137/0379 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2013/10] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | Verbindungsstück einer Transportleitung | [2013/10] | English: | Connector of a transport pipeline | [2013/10] | French: | Pièce de raccordement d'une conduite de transport | [2013/10] | Examination procedure | 07.09.2013 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2014/11] | 16.10.2013 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [2014/11] | Fees paid | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.09.2013 | 03   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XYI]US4046280 (HANSEN FRANKLIN A) [X] 1-4,9,10,12 * column 3, line 11 - line 44; figures 1,2 * [Y] 6-8 [I] 13-15; | [I]DE2658225 (KRAFTWERK UNION AG) [I] 1-4,10,12,13 * page 6, line 2 - line 29; figure 1 *; | [Y]GB2028426 (BS & B SAFETY SYSTEMS LTD) [Y] 6,8 * page 3, line 24 - line 54; figures 1,3 *; | [AD]EP0789822 (CHEMIEFASER LENZING AG [AT]) [AD] 13-15 * column 4, line 25 - line 47; figure 1 *; | [AD]WO2009000642 (SULZER CHEMTECH AG [CH], et al) [AD] 1* figure 1 *; | [Y]US2010305883 (DANZY ROGER DALE [US]) [Y] 7 * paragraphs [0024] , [0026]; figures 2A,2B * | by applicant | US3845879 | US3872874 | US4079854 | US4590957 | US4724857 | US5337776 | WO9428213 | US5577523 | EP0789822 | US6241113 | WO2005054731 | EP1591703 | EP1892445 | US2008202595 | WO2009000642 | US7841765 | US7870865 |