EP2428196 - Occupant protective features for the foot region of a bed [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 21.03.2014 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 21.03.2014 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 23.04.2014 [2014/17] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Hill-Rom Services, Inc. 1069 State Route 46 East Batesville, IN 47006 / US | [2012/11] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Receveur, Timothy Joseph 4646 Heritage Trail Guilford, IN Indiana 47022 / US | [2012/11] | Representative(s) | Findlay, Alice Rosemary Reddie & Grose LLP The White Chapel Building 10 Whitechapel High Street London E1 8QS / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2012/11] | Findlay, Alice Rosemary Reddie & Grose LLP 16 Theobalds Road London WC1X 8PL / GB | Application number, filing date | 11180074.4 | 05.09.2011 | [2012/11] | Priority number, date | US20100877597 | 08.09.2010 Original published format: US 877597 | [2012/11] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2428196 | Date: | 14.03.2012 | Language: | EN | [2012/11] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP2428196 | Date: | 17.04.2013 | Language: | EN | [2013/16] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 14.03.2013 | Classification | IPC: | A61G7/057, A61G7/075 | [2012/11] | CPC: |
A61G7/05769 (EP,US);
A47C19/02 (US);
A47C27/081 (US);
A61G7/0506 (EP,US);
A61G7/0755 (EP,US);
A61G7/012 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2012/11] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | Nutzerschutzelementen für das Fußende eines Betts | [2012/11] | English: | Occupant protective features for the foot region of a bed | [2012/11] | French: | Eléments protecteurs en bout de lit | [2012/11] | Examination procedure | 18.10.2013 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2014/17] | 27.11.2013 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [2014/17] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 12.09.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US4941221 (KANZLER GRAHAM L B [AU]) [X] 1-3 * abstract *; | [X]US5175899 (LOU KWONG L [US]) [X] 1,6 * column 3, line 7 - line 31; figures 1, 5 *; | [Y]US5745939 (FLICK ROLAND E [US], et al) [Y] 9* abstract *; | [X]US5966762 (WU SHAN-CHIEH [TW]) [X] 1-8 * column 2, line 7 - column 3, line 25; figures 1-12 *; | [X]US2001001163 (ALLEN E DAVID [US], et al) [X] 1-3,6-8 * paragraph [0038] - paragraph [0040]; figures 1, 2, 17 *; | [XY]EP1281380 (HILL ROM SERVICES INC [US]) [X] 1-8 * paragraph [0015] - paragraph [0023]; figures 1, 4, 5 * [Y] 9 |