EP2428418 - Air preparation device and vehicle with such [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Patent revoked Status updated on 04.02.2022 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 15.04.2019 | Most recent event Tooltip | 24.06.2022 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): TR | published on 27.07.2022 [2022/30] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states KNORR-BREMSE Systeme für Nutzfahrzeuge GmbH Moosacher Strasse 80 80809 München / DE | [2016/31] |
Former [2012/11] | For all designated states KNORR-BREMSE Systeme für Nutzfahrzeuge GmbH Moosacher Str. 80 80809 München / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Schäbel, Stefan Gernotstr. 7 80804 München / DE | 02 /
Eidenschink, Rainer Taimerhofstr. 11 81927 München / DE | 03 /
Wernwag, Lars Willi-Wien-Str. 18 80999 München / DE | [2012/11] | Representative(s) | Prüfer & Partner mbB Patentanwälte · Rechtsanwälte Sohnckestraße 12 81479 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2016/31] | Schönmann, Kurt Knorr-Bremse AG Moosacher Strasse 80 80809 München / DE | ||
Former [2012/11] | Schönmann, Kurt Knorr-Bremse AG Moosacher Strasse 80 80809 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 11180120.5 | 06.09.2011 | [2012/11] | Priority number, date | DE20101044910 | 09.09.2010 Original published format: DE102010044910 | [2012/11] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2428418 | Date: | 14.03.2012 | Language: | DE | [2012/11] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP2428418 | Date: | 28.01.2015 | Language: | DE | [2015/05] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2428418 | Date: | 03.08.2016 | Language: | DE | [2016/31] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 08.01.2015 | Classification | IPC: | B60T15/48, B60T17/00 | [2012/11] | CPC: |
B60T17/004 (EP);
B01D53/0415 (EP);
B01D53/261 (EP);
B60T15/48 (EP);
B01D2259/455 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2015/36] |
Former [2012/11] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Title | German: | Luftaufbereitungseinrichtung und Fahrzeug mit einer Luftaufbereitungseinrichtung | [2012/11] | English: | Air preparation device and vehicle with such | [2012/11] | French: | Dispositif de traitement de l'air et véhicule doté d'un dispositif de traitement de l'air | [2012/11] | Examination procedure | 19.06.2015 | Examination requested [2015/31] | 17.02.2016 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 17.06.2016 | Fee for grant paid | 17.06.2016 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 17.06.2016 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 17.02.2016 | Opposition(s) | Opponent(s) | 01
03.05.2017
08.05.2017
ADMISSIBLE WABCO GmbH Am Lindener Hafen 21 30453 Hannover / DE Opponent's representative Bremer, Ulrich Advopat Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Brümmerstedt, Oelfke, Seewald & König Theaterstr. 6 30159 Hannover / DE | [2017/23] |
Former [2017/23] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
03.05.2017
ADMISSIBLE WABCO GmbH Am Lindener Hafen 21 30453 Hannover / DE Opponent's representative Bremer, Ulrich Advopat Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Brümmerstedt, Oelfke, Seewald & König Theaterstr. 6 30159 Hannover / DE | 16.06.2017 | Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition | 16.10.2017 | Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition | 25.03.2019 | Date of oral proceedings | 16.04.2019 | Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings | 16.04.2019 | Despatch of communication that the patent will be revoked | 26.01.2022 | Legal effect of revocation of patent [2022/10] | Appeal following opposition | 06.06.2019 | Appeal received No. T1684/19 | 16.08.2019 | Statement of grounds filed | 26.01.2022 | Result of appeal procedure: appeal of the proprietor withdrawn | 26.01.2022 | Date of oral proceedings | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.09.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 30.09.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 30.09.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 06.09.2011 | AL | 03.08.2016 | CY | 03.08.2016 | CZ | 03.08.2016 | DK | 03.08.2016 | EE | 03.08.2016 | ES | 03.08.2016 | FI | 03.08.2016 | HR | 03.08.2016 | LT | 03.08.2016 | LV | 03.08.2016 | MC | 03.08.2016 | MK | 03.08.2016 | MT | 03.08.2016 | PL | 03.08.2016 | RO | 03.08.2016 | RS | 03.08.2016 | SI | 03.08.2016 | SK | 03.08.2016 | SM | 03.08.2016 | AT | 06.09.2016 | IE | 06.09.2016 | LU | 06.09.2016 | BE | 30.09.2016 | CH | 30.09.2016 | LI | 30.09.2016 | BG | 03.11.2016 | NO | 03.11.2016 | GR | 04.11.2016 | IS | 03.12.2016 | PT | 05.12.2016 | TR | 06.09.2021 | [2022/30] |
Former [2018/46] | HU | 06.09.2011 | |
AL | 03.08.2016 | ||
CY | 03.08.2016 | ||
CZ | 03.08.2016 | ||
DK | 03.08.2016 | ||
EE | 03.08.2016 | ||
ES | 03.08.2016 | ||
FI | 03.08.2016 | ||
HR | 03.08.2016 | ||
LT | 03.08.2016 | ||
LV | 03.08.2016 | ||
MC | 03.08.2016 | ||
MK | 03.08.2016 | ||
MT | 03.08.2016 | ||
PL | 03.08.2016 | ||
RO | 03.08.2016 | ||
RS | 03.08.2016 | ||
SI | 03.08.2016 | ||
SK | 03.08.2016 | ||
SM | 03.08.2016 | ||
AT | 06.09.2016 | ||
IE | 06.09.2016 | ||
LU | 06.09.2016 | ||
BE | 30.09.2016 | ||
CH | 30.09.2016 | ||
LI | 30.09.2016 | ||
BG | 03.11.2016 | ||
NO | 03.11.2016 | ||
GR | 04.11.2016 | ||
IS | 03.12.2016 | ||
PT | 05.12.2016 | ||
Former [2018/31] | HU | 06.09.2011 | |
CY | 03.08.2016 | ||
CZ | 03.08.2016 | ||
DK | 03.08.2016 | ||
EE | 03.08.2016 | ||
ES | 03.08.2016 | ||
FI | 03.08.2016 | ||
HR | 03.08.2016 | ||
LT | 03.08.2016 | ||
LV | 03.08.2016 | ||
MC | 03.08.2016 | ||
MK | 03.08.2016 | ||
MT | 03.08.2016 | ||
PL | 03.08.2016 | ||
RO | 03.08.2016 | ||
RS | 03.08.2016 | ||
SI | 03.08.2016 | ||
SK | 03.08.2016 | ||
SM | 03.08.2016 | ||
AT | 06.09.2016 | ||
IE | 06.09.2016 | ||
LU | 06.09.2016 | ||
BE | 30.09.2016 | ||
CH | 30.09.2016 | ||
LI | 30.09.2016 | ||
BG | 03.11.2016 | ||
NO | 03.11.2016 | ||
GR | 04.11.2016 | ||
IS | 03.12.2016 | ||
PT | 05.12.2016 | ||
Former [2018/28] | HU | 06.09.2011 | |
CY | 03.08.2016 | ||
CZ | 03.08.2016 | ||
DK | 03.08.2016 | ||
EE | 03.08.2016 | ||
ES | 03.08.2016 | ||
FI | 03.08.2016 | ||
HR | 03.08.2016 | ||
LT | 03.08.2016 | ||
LV | 03.08.2016 | ||
MC | 03.08.2016 | ||
MK | 03.08.2016 | ||
PL | 03.08.2016 | ||
RO | 03.08.2016 | ||
RS | 03.08.2016 | ||
SI | 03.08.2016 | ||
SK | 03.08.2016 | ||
SM | 03.08.2016 | ||
AT | 06.09.2016 | ||
IE | 06.09.2016 | ||
LU | 06.09.2016 | ||
BE | 30.09.2016 | ||
CH | 30.09.2016 | ||
LI | 30.09.2016 | ||
BG | 03.11.2016 | ||
NO | 03.11.2016 | ||
GR | 04.11.2016 | ||
IS | 03.12.2016 | ||
PT | 05.12.2016 | ||
Former [2018/10] | CZ | 03.08.2016 | |
DK | 03.08.2016 | ||
EE | 03.08.2016 | ||
ES | 03.08.2016 | ||
FI | 03.08.2016 | ||
HR | 03.08.2016 | ||
LT | 03.08.2016 | ||
LV | 03.08.2016 | ||
MC | 03.08.2016 | ||
PL | 03.08.2016 | ||
RO | 03.08.2016 | ||
RS | 03.08.2016 | ||
SI | 03.08.2016 | ||
SK | 03.08.2016 | ||
SM | 03.08.2016 | ||
AT | 06.09.2016 | ||
IE | 06.09.2016 | ||
LU | 06.09.2016 | ||
BE | 30.09.2016 | ||
CH | 30.09.2016 | ||
LI | 30.09.2016 | ||
BG | 03.11.2016 | ||
NO | 03.11.2016 | ||
GR | 04.11.2016 | ||
IS | 03.12.2016 | ||
PT | 05.12.2016 | ||
Former [2017/40] | CZ | 03.08.2016 | |
DK | 03.08.2016 | ||
EE | 03.08.2016 | ||
ES | 03.08.2016 | ||
FI | 03.08.2016 | ||
HR | 03.08.2016 | ||
LT | 03.08.2016 | ||
LV | 03.08.2016 | ||
MC | 03.08.2016 | ||
PL | 03.08.2016 | ||
RO | 03.08.2016 | ||
RS | 03.08.2016 | ||
SI | 03.08.2016 | ||
SK | 03.08.2016 | ||
SM | 03.08.2016 | ||
IE | 06.09.2016 | ||
LU | 06.09.2016 | ||
BE | 30.09.2016 | ||
CH | 30.09.2016 | ||
LI | 30.09.2016 | ||
BG | 03.11.2016 | ||
NO | 03.11.2016 | ||
GR | 04.11.2016 | ||
IS | 03.12.2016 | ||
PT | 05.12.2016 | ||
Former [2017/37] | CZ | 03.08.2016 | |
DK | 03.08.2016 | ||
EE | 03.08.2016 | ||
ES | 03.08.2016 | ||
FI | 03.08.2016 | ||
HR | 03.08.2016 | ||
LT | 03.08.2016 | ||
LV | 03.08.2016 | ||
MC | 03.08.2016 | ||
PL | 03.08.2016 | ||
RO | 03.08.2016 | ||
RS | 03.08.2016 | ||
SI | 03.08.2016 | ||
SK | 03.08.2016 | ||
SM | 03.08.2016 | ||
IE | 06.09.2016 | ||
BE | 30.09.2016 | ||
CH | 30.09.2016 | ||
LI | 30.09.2016 | ||
BG | 03.11.2016 | ||
NO | 03.11.2016 | ||
GR | 04.11.2016 | ||
IS | 03.12.2016 | ||
PT | 05.12.2016 | ||
Former [2017/35] | CZ | 03.08.2016 | |
DK | 03.08.2016 | ||
EE | 03.08.2016 | ||
ES | 03.08.2016 | ||
FI | 03.08.2016 | ||
HR | 03.08.2016 | ||
LT | 03.08.2016 | ||
LV | 03.08.2016 | ||
MC | 03.08.2016 | ||
PL | 03.08.2016 | ||
RO | 03.08.2016 | ||
RS | 03.08.2016 | ||
SK | 03.08.2016 | ||
SM | 03.08.2016 | ||
IE | 06.09.2016 | ||
BE | 30.09.2016 | ||
CH | 30.09.2016 | ||
LI | 30.09.2016 | ||
BG | 03.11.2016 | ||
NO | 03.11.2016 | ||
GR | 04.11.2016 | ||
IS | 03.12.2016 | ||
PT | 05.12.2016 | ||
Former [2017/32] | CZ | 03.08.2016 | |
DK | 03.08.2016 | ||
EE | 03.08.2016 | ||
ES | 03.08.2016 | ||
FI | 03.08.2016 | ||
HR | 03.08.2016 | ||
LT | 03.08.2016 | ||
LV | 03.08.2016 | ||
MC | 03.08.2016 | ||
PL | 03.08.2016 | ||
RO | 03.08.2016 | ||
RS | 03.08.2016 | ||
SK | 03.08.2016 | ||
SM | 03.08.2016 | ||
IE | 06.09.2016 | ||
BE | 30.09.2016 | ||
BG | 03.11.2016 | ||
NO | 03.11.2016 | ||
GR | 04.11.2016 | ||
IS | 03.12.2016 | ||
PT | 05.12.2016 | ||
Former [2017/13] | ES | 03.08.2016 | |
FI | 03.08.2016 | ||
HR | 03.08.2016 | ||
LT | 03.08.2016 | ||
LV | 03.08.2016 | ||
PL | 03.08.2016 | ||
RS | 03.08.2016 | ||
BE | 30.09.2016 | ||
NO | 03.11.2016 | ||
GR | 04.11.2016 | ||
IS | 03.12.2016 | ||
PT | 05.12.2016 | ||
Former [2017/11] | ES | 03.08.2016 | |
FI | 03.08.2016 | ||
HR | 03.08.2016 | ||
LT | 03.08.2016 | ||
PL | 03.08.2016 | ||
RS | 03.08.2016 | ||
BE | 30.09.2016 | ||
NO | 03.11.2016 | ||
GR | 04.11.2016 | ||
IS | 03.12.2016 | ||
PT | 05.12.2016 | ||
Former [2017/10] | FI | 03.08.2016 | |
HR | 03.08.2016 | ||
LT | 03.08.2016 | ||
PL | 03.08.2016 | ||
RS | 03.08.2016 | ||
BE | 30.09.2016 | ||
NO | 03.11.2016 | ||
IS | 03.12.2016 | ||
Former [2017/09] | FI | 03.08.2016 | |
LT | 03.08.2016 | ||
NO | 03.11.2016 | ||
Former [2017/07] | LT | 03.08.2016 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]EP0976636 (KNORR BREMSE SYSTEME [DE]) [A] 1-16 * paragraph [0022] - paragraph [0029]; figures 1,2 *; | [A]EP1714846 (KNORR BREMSE SYSTEME [DE]) [A] 1-16 * paragraph [0043] - paragraph [0045]; figure 6 *; | [A]DE102006034785 (KNORR BREMSE SYSTEME [DE]) [A] 1-16* figure 2; claims 1-5 * | Opposition | DE3213236 | DE3514989 | EP0976636 | DE10047469 | DE10047470 | DE19936283 | EP1322511 | DE10220791 | US2004003893 | DE10242543 | US2004141853 | EP1502778 | DE102004051309 | DE102004051812 | EP1714846 | EP1836078 | DE102006034785 | DE19861222 | DE102007011246 | DE102007011256 | DE102007032389 | DE102008026103 | - "H-APU Hybrid Air Processing Units", WABCO, (20040000), XP055620364 | - "Product catalogue", Systems for Commercial Vehicles, (10-07-2006), pages FP - 10, 19-30, XP055620383 | - "Produktinformation ,,Air Processing Unit ZB44.. family", KNORR-BREMSE, (20040800), page 4pp, XP055620390 |