EP2428720 - Light fixture [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 23.08.2013 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 23.08.2013 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 25.09.2013 [2013/39] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Woodgate, Terence West Hill Little Trodgers Lane Mayfield East Sussex TN20 6PW / GB | [2012/11] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [2012/11] | Representative(s) | Hancox, Jonathan Christopher Thompson Gray LLP Central Court 25 Southampton Buildings London WC2A 1AL / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2012/11] | Hancox, Jonathan Christopher Thompson Gray LLP Central Court 25 Southampton Buildings London WC2A 1AL / GB | Application number, filing date | 11180648.5 | 08.09.2011 | [2012/11] | Priority number, date | GB20100015127 | 10.09.2010 Original published format: GB 201015127 | [2012/19] |
Former [2012/11] | GB20100015127 | 10.09.2010 | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2428720 | Date: | 14.03.2012 | Language: | EN | [2012/11] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP2428720 | Date: | 03.10.2012 | Language: | EN | [2012/40] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 05.09.2012 | Classification | IPC: | F21S2/00, F21V21/30, // F21V19/02, F21Y101/02 | [2012/11] | CPC: |
F21S2/005 (EP,US);
F21V21/14 (GB);
F21V21/30 (EP);
F21V19/02 (EP);
F21Y2115/10 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2012/11] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | Beleuchtungskörper | [2012/11] | English: | Light fixture | [2012/11] | French: | Dispositif d'éclairage | [2012/11] | Examination procedure | 04.04.2013 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2013/39] | 13.05.2013 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [2013/39] |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US4025777 (HAYAKAWA YOSHITO); | [X]GB2342435 (KNIGHT RICHARD [GB]); | [X]US6120164 (LIBIN CHARLES [US], et al); | [X]EP1077158 (PEUGEOT CITROEN AUTOMOBILES SA [FR]); | [X]DE102004023358 (SMIT MICHAEL [DE]); | [X]EP1722156 (TRUMPF KREUZER MED SYS GMBH [DE]) | by applicant | US2009237924 |