EP2434044 - Detergent dissolving chamber for washing machines [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 22.02.2013 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 22.02.2013 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 27.03.2013 [2013/13] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Vestel Beyaz Esya Sanayi ve Ticaret A.S. Organize Sanayi Bölgesi 45030 Manisa / TR | [2012/13] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Ersavas, Mutlu Manavkuyu Mah. 251. Sok. Emo Apt. B Blok Kat:5 D:11 Bayrakli 35030 IZMIR / TR | 02 /
Dosemeciler, Ozgun Bostanli Mah. 6346 Sok. No:30/7 35540 IZMIR / TR | [2012/13] | Representative(s) | Cayli, Hülya Paragon Consultancy Incorporated Koza Sokak No: 63/2 GOP Cankaya 06540 Ankara / TR | [N/P] |
Former [2012/13] | Cayli, Hülya Paragon Consultancy Incorporated Koza Sokak No: 63/2 GOP 06540 Ankara / TR | Application number, filing date | 11181425.7 | 15.09.2011 | [2012/13] | Priority number, date | TR20100007806 | 23.09.2010 Original published format: TR 201007806 | [2012/13] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2434044 | Date: | 28.03.2012 | Language: | EN | [2012/13] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 30.11.2011 | Classification | IPC: | D06F39/08 | [2012/13] | CPC: |
D06F37/267 (EP);
D06F39/086 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2012/13] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | Kammer zum Lösen von Waschmittel für Waschmaschinen | [2012/13] | English: | Detergent dissolving chamber for washing machines | [2012/13] | French: | Chambre de dissolution de détergent pour machines à laver | [2012/13] | Examination procedure | 29.09.2012 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2013/13] | 07.11.2012 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [2013/13] |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US6574996 (JACOBUS DWIGHT WILLIAM [US], et al) [X] 1,3,4 * column 2, line 53 - column 3, line 8 * * column 3, line 53 - line 62; figure 1 *; | [A]US5671617 (PARK JOO HEUM [KR], et al) [A] 1-5 * column 3, line 9 - line 31; figure 2a *; | [A]DE3106604 (SCHWARZENBERG WASCHGERAETE [DD]) [A] 1-5 * page 5, line 3 - line 6; figure 1 * | by applicant | WO2009083365 | WO2008119630 |