EP2492167 - Motor-driven power steering apparatus [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 09.01.2015 Database last updated on 15.06.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 09.01.2015 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 11.02.2015 [2015/07] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Showa Corporation 14-1 Fujiwara-cho 1-chome Gyoda-shi Saitama / JP | [2012/35] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Sekikawa, Shinsuke c/o Showa Corporation 112-1, Hagadai, Hagamachi Haga-gun, Tochigi / JP | [2012/35] | Representative(s) | Jenkins, Peter David Page White & Farrer Limited Bedford House 21A John Street London WC1N 2BF / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2012/35] | Jenkins, Peter David Page White & Farrer Bedford House John Street London WC1N 2BF / GB | Application number, filing date | 11181838.1 | 19.09.2011 | [2012/35] | Priority number, date | JP20110038942 | 24.02.2011 Original published format: JP 2011038942 | JP20110040873 | 25.02.2011 Original published format: JP 2011040873 | [2012/35] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2492167 | Date: | 29.08.2012 | Language: | EN | [2012/35] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 12.06.2012 | Classification | IPC: | F16H57/021, F16H55/28, F16H55/24, F16H57/022, F16H57/12, B62D5/04 | [2014/18] | CPC: |
B62D5/0409 (EP,US);
F16H2057/0213 (EP,US);
F16H2057/0222 (EP,US);
F16H2057/127 (EP,US);
F16H55/24 (EP,US);
F16H55/283 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2012/35] | B62D5/04, F16H55/24 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2012/35] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | Motorbetriebene Servolenkungsvorrichtung | [2012/35] | English: | Motor-driven power steering apparatus | [2012/35] | French: | Appareil de direction assistée commandé par moteur | [2012/35] | Examination procedure | 19.12.2012 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 19.12.2012 | Examination requested [2013/07] | 11.04.2014 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 22.08.2014 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2015/07] | 29.09.2014 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time [2015/07] | Divisional application(s) | EP13150097.7 / EP2578470 | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 11.04.2014 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 10.07.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.09.2014 | 04   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XAI]US2010116582 (RHO HEE-DONG [KR], et al) [X] 1,2,4,5 * paragraphs [0002] , [0017] , [0018] * * paragraphs [0034] - [0065] * * figures 3-9 * [A] 6-10 [I] 3; | [XA]JP2008037288 (TOYOTA MOTOR CORP) [X] 1,3-5 * abstract * * figures 1-4 * [A] 2,6,10; | [XA]JP2003004105 (KOYO SEIKO CO) [X] 1,2,4,5 * abstract * * figures 1-4 * [A] 3,6,10; | [XI]EP1808618 (JTEKT CORP [JP]) [X] 6,7 * paragraphs [0001] , [0010] * * paragraphs [0017] - [0059] * * figure - * [I] 8-10; | [A]JP2011020645 (SHOWA CORP) [A] 1-6,10 * abstract * * figures 1-3 * | by applicant | JP3646205B | JP2010167904 |