EP2401996 - Medication dispensing and collecting system [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 01.04.2016 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 01.04.2016 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 04.05.2016 [2016/18] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states AutoMed Technologies, Inc. 1400 Busch Parkway Buffalo Grove IL 60089 / US | For all designated states Yuyama Mfg. Co., Ltd. 3-1, Meishinguchi 3-chome Toyonaka-shi Osaka / JP | [2012/01] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Chudy, Duane S. 17 Dukes Lane Lincolnshire, IL 60069 / US | 02 /
Yuyama, Shoji c/o Yuyama Mfg. Co., Ltd. 3 - 1, Meishinguchi 3-chome Toyonaka-shi, Osaka / JP | 03 /
Sugimoto, Shigeru c/o Yuyama Mfg. Co., Ltd. 3 - 1, Meishinguchi 3-chome Toyonaka-shi, Osaka / JP | [2012/01] | Representative(s) | dompatent von Kreisler Selting Werner - Partnerschaft von Patent- und Rechtsanwälten mbB Deichmannhaus am Dom Bahnhofsvorplatz 1 50667 Köln / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2015/22] | Von Kreisler Selting Werner - Partnerschaft von Patentanwälten und Rechtsanwälten mbB Deichmannhaus am Dom Bahnhofsvorplatz 1 50667 Köln / DE | ||
Former [2012/01] | von Kreisler Selting Werner Patentanwälte Deichmannhaus am Dom Bahnhofsvorplatz 1 50667 Köln / DE | Application number, filing date | 11181960.3 | 02.12.1999 | [2012/01] | Priority number, date | US19980205861 | 04.12.1998 Original published format: US 205861 | [2012/01] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2401996 | Date: | 04.01.2012 | Language: | EN | [2012/01] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2401996 | Date: | 27.05.2015 | Language: | EN | [2015/22] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 06.12.2011 | Classification | IPC: | G07F17/00, G07F11/54, B65B5/10 | [2014/45] | CPC: |
G07F11/54 (EP,US);
B65B19/18 (KR);
B65B5/103 (EP,US);
G07F17/0092 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2012/01] | A61J7/00, B65B5/10, G07F11/54 | Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [2015/22] |
Former [2012/01] | DE, FR, GB | Title | German: | System zum Abgeben und Sammeln von Medikamenten | [2012/01] | English: | Medication dispensing and collecting system | [2012/01] | French: | Système pour distribuer et rassembler des médicaments | [2012/01] | Examination procedure | 26.05.2012 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 26.05.2012 | Examination requested [2012/28] | 16.04.2013 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 08.08.2013 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 18.09.2013 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 17.01.2014 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 30.01.2014 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 24.05.2014 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 12.06.2014 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 06.09.2014 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 06.11.2014 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 13.11.2014 | Disapproval of the communication of intention to grant the patent by the applicant or resumption of examination proceedings by the EPO | 17.12.2014 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 14.04.2015 | Fee for grant paid | 14.04.2015 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 14.04.2015 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP09159907.6 / EP2082720 | EP99960654.4 / EP1147047 | Opposition(s) | 01.03.2016 | No opposition filed within time limit [2016/18] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 05.10.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 05.10.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 05.10.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 05.10.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 05.10.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 05.10.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 05.10.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 05.10.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 05.10.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | 05.10.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 12 | 27.12.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 13 | 26.12.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 14 | 27.12.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 15 | 29.12.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 16 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US5839257 (SODERSTROM JAN [US], et al) [A] 1,2 * column 2, line 15 - column 4, line 67; figure - *; | [A]EP0412806 (SANYO ELECTRIC CO [JP]) [A] 1,9 * column 16, line 19 - column 18, line 37; figure - *; | [A]US5771657 (LASHER CHRISTOPHER J [US], et al) [A] 1,9 * column 3, line 32 - column 7, line 67; figure - * | by applicant | US5604692 | JPH07267370 | JPH10149489 | JPH1099001 | JPH09142473 | JPH09212102 | JPH0971530 | JPH0951922 | JPH10203749 | JPH1075813 | US19980021864 |