EP2431230 - Flexible mounting device [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 15.02.2013 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 15.02.2013 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 20.03.2013 [2013/12] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Nissan Motor Manufacturing (UK) Ltd. Cranfield Technology Park Moulsoe Road Cranfield Bedfordshire MK43 0DB / GB | [2012/12] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Laishley, Robert Anthony Nissan Tehcnical Centre Europe Cranfield Technology Park Cranfield, Bedfordshire MK430DB / GB | 02 /
Candler, Richard Nissan Technical Centre Europe Cranfield Technology Park Cranfield, Bedfordshire MK430DB / GB | 03 /
Macintosh, Shaun FS Design Ltd The Business & Innovation Centre, Wearfield Sunderland, Tyne and Wear SR5 2TA / GB | [2012/12] | Representative(s) | (deleted) | [2012/12] | Application number, filing date | 11181980.1 | 20.09.2011 | [2012/12] | Priority number, date | GB20100015750 | 21.09.2010 Original published format: GB 201015750 | [2012/19] |
Former [2012/12] | GB20100015750 | 21.09.2010 | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2431230 | Date: | 21.03.2012 | Language: | EN | [2012/12] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 30.11.2011 | Classification | IPC: | B60R11/02 | [2012/12] | CPC: |
B60R11/02 (EP);
B60R11/0241 (EP,GB);
F16M13/02 (GB);
B60R2011/0005 (EP);
B60R2011/0075 (EP);
B60R2011/0078 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2012/12] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | Flexible Montagevorrichtung | [2012/12] | English: | Flexible mounting device | [2012/12] | French: | Dispositif de montage flexible | [2012/12] | Examination procedure | 22.09.2012 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2013/12] | 30.10.2012 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [2013/12] |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US6062518 (ETUE T GERALD [US]); | [X]DE29912359U (KAISER ALWIN [DE]); | [X]DE10206790 (HENRYK BURY GMBH & CO KG DIPL [DE]); | [X]US2005090301 (LANGE THORSTEN [DE], et al); | [X]WO2006010500 (VOLKSWAGEN AG [DE], et al); | [X]US2007281619 (CHEN MIKE [TW]); | [X]EP2193959 (META SYSTEM SPA [IT]) |