EP2573548 - Opto-chemical sensor [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 26.10.2018 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 16.02.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 26.10.2018 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 28.11.2018 [2018/48] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Mettler-Toledo GmbH Im Langacher 44 8606 Greifensee / CH | [2016/07] |
Former [2013/13] | For all designated states Mettler-Toledo AG Im Langacher 44 8606 Greifensee / CH | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Radanovic, Dragan Bahnhofstrasse 118 8620 Wetzikon / CH | 02 /
Venturini, Francesca Birchlenstrasse 25 8600 Dübendorf / CH | [2013/13] | Representative(s) | Mettler-Toledo IP Department Im Langacher 44 8606 Greifensee / CH | [N/P] | Application number, filing date | 11182045.2 | 20.09.2011 | [2013/13] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2573548 | Date: | 27.03.2013 | Language: | DE | [2013/13] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 05.03.2012 | Classification | IPC: | G01N21/77 | [2013/13] | CPC: |
G01N21/77 (EP);
G01N2021/6432 (EP);
G01N2021/773 (EP);
G01N2021/7759 (EP);
G01N2021/7786 (EP);
G01N21/7703 (EP);
G01N21/8507 (EP)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2013/13] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | Optochemischer Sensor | [2013/13] | English: | Opto-chemical sensor | [2013/13] | French: | Capteur optochimique | [2013/13] | Examination procedure | 17.09.2013 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 17.09.2013 | Examination requested [2013/43] | 15.02.2018 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 25.06.2018 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2018/48] | 24.07.2018 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2018/48] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 15.02.2018 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 09.09.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 08.09.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 08.09.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 08.09.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 11.09.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [I]AT381393B (LIST HANS [ST]) [I] 1-7,12 * page 3, line 15 - page 5, line 23; figure 1 *; | [IY]DE4108808 (BIOTECHNOLOG FORSCHUNG GMBH [DE]) [I] 1-7,12 * the whole document * [Y] 8-11; | [Y]EP1199556 (METTLER TOLEDO GMBH [CH]) [Y] 8-11 * paragraph [0021]; figure 2 * |