EP2457708 - Autoclave molding method [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2012/22] | Autoclave molding method and autoclave molding apparatus | ||
[2014/11] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 08.05.2015 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.10.2018 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): AL | published on 14.11.2018 [2018/46] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Kabushiki Kaisha Ashida Seisakusho 3-16, Shinomiya 5-chome Kadoma-shi Osaka-fu Osaka 571-0017 / JP | [2012/22] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Ashida, Takeshi Kabushiki Kaisha Ashida Seisakusho c/o 3-16, Shinomiya 5-chome Kadoma-shi Osaka-fu, Osaka 571-0017 / JP | [2012/22] | Representative(s) | Zimmermann, Alain, et al Cabinet Malemont 10 square Moncey 75009 Paris / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2014/27] | Zimmermann, Alain, et al Cabinet Malemont 91 avenue Kléber 75116 Paris / FR | ||
Former [2012/37] | Zimmermann, Alain, et al Cabinet Malemont 42, avenue du Président Wilson 75116 Paris / FR | ||
Former [2012/22] | De Souza, Paula Cabinet Malemont 42, avenue du Président Wilson 75116 Paris / FR | Application number, filing date | 11182673.1 | 26.09.2011 | [2012/22] | Priority number, date | JP20100278599 | 26.11.2010 Original published format: JP 2010278599 | JP20110171356 | 19.07.2011 Original published format: JP 2011171356 | [2012/22] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2457708 | Date: | 30.05.2012 | Language: | EN | [2012/22] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2457708 | Date: | 02.07.2014 | Language: | EN | [2014/27] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 15.03.2012 | Classification | IPC: | B29C35/00, B29C35/02, B29C43/12, B29C70/44 | [2012/22] | CPC: |
B29C35/0227 (EP,US);
B29C70/44 (EP,BR,US);
B29C70/06 (KR);
B29C33/04 (BR);
B29C35/007 (EP,US);
B29C35/04 (BR);
B29C43/10 (KR);
B29C43/12 (BR);
B29C43/56 (BR);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2012/22] | Title | German: | Autoklav-Formungsverfahren | [2014/11] | English: | Autoclave molding method | [2014/11] | French: | Procédé de moulage autoclave | [2014/11] |
Former [2012/22] | Autoklav-Formungsverfahren und Autoklav-Formungsvorrichtung | ||
Former [2012/22] | Autoclave molding method and autoclave molding apparatus | ||
Former [2012/22] | Procédé de moulage autoclave et appareil de moulage autoclave | Examination procedure | 26.09.2011 | Examination requested [2012/22] | 26.11.2012 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 26.02.2013 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 18.06.2013 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 08.07.2013 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 09.10.2013 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 13.02.2014 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 22.05.2014 | Fee for grant paid | 22.05.2014 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 22.05.2014 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 26.02.2013 | Opposition(s) | 07.04.2015 | No opposition filed within time limit [2015/24] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 26.08.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 26.09.2011 | AL | 02.07.2014 | AT | 02.07.2014 | BE | 02.07.2014 | CY | 02.07.2014 | CZ | 02.07.2014 | DK | 02.07.2014 | EE | 02.07.2014 | FI | 02.07.2014 | HR | 02.07.2014 | LT | 02.07.2014 | LV | 02.07.2014 | MC | 02.07.2014 | MK | 02.07.2014 | MT | 02.07.2014 | PL | 02.07.2014 | RO | 02.07.2014 | RS | 02.07.2014 | SE | 02.07.2014 | SI | 02.07.2014 | SK | 02.07.2014 | SM | 02.07.2014 | TR | 02.07.2014 | IE | 26.09.2014 | LU | 26.09.2014 | CH | 30.09.2014 | LI | 30.09.2014 | BG | 02.10.2014 | NO | 02.10.2014 | GR | 03.10.2014 | IS | 02.11.2014 | PT | 03.11.2014 | [2018/46] |
Former [2018/31] | HU | 26.09.2011 | |
AT | 02.07.2014 | ||
BE | 02.07.2014 | ||
CY | 02.07.2014 | ||
CZ | 02.07.2014 | ||
DK | 02.07.2014 | ||
EE | 02.07.2014 | ||
FI | 02.07.2014 | ||
HR | 02.07.2014 | ||
LT | 02.07.2014 | ||
LV | 02.07.2014 | ||
MC | 02.07.2014 | ||
MK | 02.07.2014 | ||
MT | 02.07.2014 | ||
PL | 02.07.2014 | ||
RO | 02.07.2014 | ||
RS | 02.07.2014 | ||
SE | 02.07.2014 | ||
SI | 02.07.2014 | ||
SK | 02.07.2014 | ||
SM | 02.07.2014 | ||
TR | 02.07.2014 | ||
IE | 26.09.2014 | ||
LU | 26.09.2014 | ||
CH | 30.09.2014 | ||
LI | 30.09.2014 | ||
BG | 02.10.2014 | ||
NO | 02.10.2014 | ||
GR | 03.10.2014 | ||
IS | 02.11.2014 | ||
PT | 03.11.2014 | ||
Former [2016/33] | HU | 26.09.2011 | |
AT | 02.07.2014 | ||
BE | 02.07.2014 | ||
CY | 02.07.2014 | ||
CZ | 02.07.2014 | ||
DK | 02.07.2014 | ||
EE | 02.07.2014 | ||
FI | 02.07.2014 | ||
HR | 02.07.2014 | ||
LT | 02.07.2014 | ||
LV | 02.07.2014 | ||
MC | 02.07.2014 | ||
MT | 02.07.2014 | ||
PL | 02.07.2014 | ||
RO | 02.07.2014 | ||
RS | 02.07.2014 | ||
SE | 02.07.2014 | ||
SI | 02.07.2014 | ||
SK | 02.07.2014 | ||
SM | 02.07.2014 | ||
TR | 02.07.2014 | ||
IE | 26.09.2014 | ||
LU | 26.09.2014 | ||
CH | 30.09.2014 | ||
LI | 30.09.2014 | ||
BG | 02.10.2014 | ||
NO | 02.10.2014 | ||
GR | 03.10.2014 | ||
IS | 02.11.2014 | ||
PT | 03.11.2014 | ||
Former [2016/32] | HU | 26.09.2011 | |
AT | 02.07.2014 | ||
BE | 02.07.2014 | ||
CY | 02.07.2014 | ||
CZ | 02.07.2014 | ||
DK | 02.07.2014 | ||
EE | 02.07.2014 | ||
FI | 02.07.2014 | ||
HR | 02.07.2014 | ||
LT | 02.07.2014 | ||
LV | 02.07.2014 | ||
MC | 02.07.2014 | ||
MT | 02.07.2014 | ||
PL | 02.07.2014 | ||
RO | 02.07.2014 | ||
RS | 02.07.2014 | ||
SE | 02.07.2014 | ||
SI | 02.07.2014 | ||
SK | 02.07.2014 | ||
SM | 02.07.2014 | ||
IE | 26.09.2014 | ||
LU | 26.09.2014 | ||
CH | 30.09.2014 | ||
LI | 30.09.2014 | ||
BG | 02.10.2014 | ||
NO | 02.10.2014 | ||
GR | 03.10.2014 | ||
IS | 02.11.2014 | ||
PT | 03.11.2014 | ||
Former [2016/28] | AT | 02.07.2014 | |
CY | 02.07.2014 | ||
CZ | 02.07.2014 | ||
DK | 02.07.2014 | ||
EE | 02.07.2014 | ||
FI | 02.07.2014 | ||
HR | 02.07.2014 | ||
LT | 02.07.2014 | ||
LV | 02.07.2014 | ||
MC | 02.07.2014 | ||
MT | 02.07.2014 | ||
PL | 02.07.2014 | ||
RO | 02.07.2014 | ||
RS | 02.07.2014 | ||
SE | 02.07.2014 | ||
SI | 02.07.2014 | ||
SK | 02.07.2014 | ||
SM | 02.07.2014 | ||
IE | 26.09.2014 | ||
LU | 26.09.2014 | ||
BE | 30.09.2014 | ||
CH | 30.09.2014 | ||
LI | 30.09.2014 | ||
BG | 02.10.2014 | ||
NO | 02.10.2014 | ||
GR | 03.10.2014 | ||
IS | 02.11.2014 | ||
PT | 03.11.2014 | ||
Former [2016/22] | AT | 02.07.2014 | |
CY | 02.07.2014 | ||
CZ | 02.07.2014 | ||
DK | 02.07.2014 | ||
EE | 02.07.2014 | ||
FI | 02.07.2014 | ||
HR | 02.07.2014 | ||
LT | 02.07.2014 | ||
LV | 02.07.2014 | ||
MC | 02.07.2014 | ||
PL | 02.07.2014 | ||
RO | 02.07.2014 | ||
RS | 02.07.2014 | ||
SE | 02.07.2014 | ||
SI | 02.07.2014 | ||
SK | 02.07.2014 | ||
SM | 02.07.2014 | ||
IE | 26.09.2014 | ||
LU | 26.09.2014 | ||
BE | 30.09.2014 | ||
CH | 30.09.2014 | ||
LI | 30.09.2014 | ||
BG | 02.10.2014 | ||
NO | 02.10.2014 | ||
GR | 03.10.2014 | ||
IS | 02.11.2014 | ||
PT | 03.11.2014 | ||
Former [2015/50] | AT | 02.07.2014 | |
CY | 02.07.2014 | ||
CZ | 02.07.2014 | ||
DK | 02.07.2014 | ||
EE | 02.07.2014 | ||
FI | 02.07.2014 | ||
HR | 02.07.2014 | ||
LT | 02.07.2014 | ||
LV | 02.07.2014 | ||
MC | 02.07.2014 | ||
PL | 02.07.2014 | ||
RO | 02.07.2014 | ||
RS | 02.07.2014 | ||
SE | 02.07.2014 | ||
SI | 02.07.2014 | ||
SK | 02.07.2014 | ||
IE | 26.09.2014 | ||
LU | 26.09.2014 | ||
BE | 30.09.2014 | ||
CH | 30.09.2014 | ||
LI | 30.09.2014 | ||
BG | 02.10.2014 | ||
NO | 02.10.2014 | ||
GR | 03.10.2014 | ||
IS | 02.11.2014 | ||
PT | 03.11.2014 | ||
Former [2015/37] | AT | 02.07.2014 | |
CY | 02.07.2014 | ||
CZ | 02.07.2014 | ||
DK | 02.07.2014 | ||
EE | 02.07.2014 | ||
FI | 02.07.2014 | ||
HR | 02.07.2014 | ||
LT | 02.07.2014 | ||
LV | 02.07.2014 | ||
MC | 02.07.2014 | ||
PL | 02.07.2014 | ||
RO | 02.07.2014 | ||
RS | 02.07.2014 | ||
SE | 02.07.2014 | ||
SK | 02.07.2014 | ||
IE | 26.09.2014 | ||
LU | 26.09.2014 | ||
BE | 30.09.2014 | ||
CH | 30.09.2014 | ||
LI | 30.09.2014 | ||
BG | 02.10.2014 | ||
NO | 02.10.2014 | ||
GR | 03.10.2014 | ||
IS | 02.11.2014 | ||
PT | 03.11.2014 | ||
Former [2015/33] | AT | 02.07.2014 | |
CY | 02.07.2014 | ||
CZ | 02.07.2014 | ||
DK | 02.07.2014 | ||
EE | 02.07.2014 | ||
FI | 02.07.2014 | ||
HR | 02.07.2014 | ||
LT | 02.07.2014 | ||
LV | 02.07.2014 | ||
MC | 02.07.2014 | ||
PL | 02.07.2014 | ||
RO | 02.07.2014 | ||
RS | 02.07.2014 | ||
SE | 02.07.2014 | ||
SK | 02.07.2014 | ||
LU | 26.09.2014 | ||
BE | 30.09.2014 | ||
CH | 30.09.2014 | ||
LI | 30.09.2014 | ||
BG | 02.10.2014 | ||
NO | 02.10.2014 | ||
GR | 03.10.2014 | ||
IS | 02.11.2014 | ||
PT | 03.11.2014 | ||
Former [2015/30] | AT | 02.07.2014 | |
CY | 02.07.2014 | ||
CZ | 02.07.2014 | ||
DK | 02.07.2014 | ||
EE | 02.07.2014 | ||
FI | 02.07.2014 | ||
HR | 02.07.2014 | ||
LT | 02.07.2014 | ||
LV | 02.07.2014 | ||
MC | 02.07.2014 | ||
PL | 02.07.2014 | ||
RO | 02.07.2014 | ||
RS | 02.07.2014 | ||
SE | 02.07.2014 | ||
SK | 02.07.2014 | ||
LU | 26.09.2014 | ||
BE | 30.09.2014 | ||
BG | 02.10.2014 | ||
NO | 02.10.2014 | ||
GR | 03.10.2014 | ||
IS | 02.11.2014 | ||
PT | 03.11.2014 | ||
Former [2015/23] | AT | 02.07.2014 | |
CY | 02.07.2014 | ||
CZ | 02.07.2014 | ||
DK | 02.07.2014 | ||
EE | 02.07.2014 | ||
FI | 02.07.2014 | ||
HR | 02.07.2014 | ||
LT | 02.07.2014 | ||
LV | 02.07.2014 | ||
MC | 02.07.2014 | ||
PL | 02.07.2014 | ||
RO | 02.07.2014 | ||
RS | 02.07.2014 | ||
SE | 02.07.2014 | ||
SK | 02.07.2014 | ||
LU | 26.09.2014 | ||
BG | 02.10.2014 | ||
NO | 02.10.2014 | ||
GR | 03.10.2014 | ||
IS | 02.11.2014 | ||
PT | 03.11.2014 | ||
Former [2015/22] | AT | 02.07.2014 | |
CY | 02.07.2014 | ||
CZ | 02.07.2014 | ||
DK | 02.07.2014 | ||
FI | 02.07.2014 | ||
HR | 02.07.2014 | ||
LT | 02.07.2014 | ||
LV | 02.07.2014 | ||
MC | 02.07.2014 | ||
PL | 02.07.2014 | ||
RO | 02.07.2014 | ||
RS | 02.07.2014 | ||
SE | 02.07.2014 | ||
LU | 26.09.2014 | ||
BG | 02.10.2014 | ||
NO | 02.10.2014 | ||
GR | 03.10.2014 | ||
IS | 02.11.2014 | ||
PT | 03.11.2014 | ||
Former [2015/20] | AT | 02.07.2014 | |
CY | 02.07.2014 | ||
CZ | 02.07.2014 | ||
FI | 02.07.2014 | ||
HR | 02.07.2014 | ||
LT | 02.07.2014 | ||
LV | 02.07.2014 | ||
MC | 02.07.2014 | ||
PL | 02.07.2014 | ||
RS | 02.07.2014 | ||
SE | 02.07.2014 | ||
BG | 02.10.2014 | ||
NO | 02.10.2014 | ||
GR | 03.10.2014 | ||
IS | 02.11.2014 | ||
PT | 03.11.2014 | ||
Former [2015/12] | AT | 02.07.2014 | |
CY | 02.07.2014 | ||
CZ | 02.07.2014 | ||
FI | 02.07.2014 | ||
HR | 02.07.2014 | ||
LT | 02.07.2014 | ||
LV | 02.07.2014 | ||
PL | 02.07.2014 | ||
RS | 02.07.2014 | ||
SE | 02.07.2014 | ||
BG | 02.10.2014 | ||
NO | 02.10.2014 | ||
GR | 03.10.2014 | ||
IS | 02.11.2014 | ||
PT | 03.11.2014 | ||
Former [2015/11] | CY | 02.07.2014 | |
CZ | 02.07.2014 | ||
FI | 02.07.2014 | ||
LT | 02.07.2014 | ||
PL | 02.07.2014 | ||
SE | 02.07.2014 | ||
BG | 02.10.2014 | ||
NO | 02.10.2014 | ||
GR | 03.10.2014 | ||
PT | 03.11.2014 | ||
Former [2015/10] | CZ | 02.07.2014 | |
FI | 02.07.2014 | ||
LT | 02.07.2014 | ||
SE | 02.07.2014 | ||
BG | 02.10.2014 | ||
NO | 02.10.2014 | ||
Former [2015/09] | FI | 02.07.2014 | |
LT | 02.07.2014 | ||
SE | 02.07.2014 | ||
Former [2015/08] | LT | 02.07.2014 | Documents cited: | Search | [X]GB654289 (JOHN ALEXANDER SPERRY) [X] 1,6 * page 3, line 78 - line 115; figures 10-12 ** paragraph [0029] - paragraph [0034]; figures 4-6 *; | [XYI]JPS5751422 (MITSUBISHI RAYON CO) [X] 1,6 * English abstract * * figures 2, 4, 5 * [Y] 2-5,7,8 [I] 10; | [XYI]JPS61173911 (ASHIDA MFG) [X] 1,6,9 * English abstract * * figures 1, 2, 6, 7 * [Y] 2-5,7,8 [I] 10; | [X]US2009256290 (WERNESTROM ULF [SE]) [X] 1,6 * paragraph [0003] * * paragraph [0029] - paragraph [0034]; figures 4-8 *; | [Y] - MIRACLE D B ET AL, Curing, ASM HANDBOOK - COMPOSITES, ASM INTERNATIONAL, MATERIALS PARK, OHIO ,USA, PAGE(S) 486 - 491, (20010101), ISBN 978-0-87170-703-1, XP002563889 [Y] 2,3,7,8 * the whole document * | [Y] - CAMPBELL F C ED - CAMPBELL FLAKE C, Chapter 6: Curing: It's a Matter of Time (t), Temperature (T) and Pressure (P), MANUFACTURING PROCESSES FOR ADVANCED COMPOSITES, ELSEVIER ADVANCED TECHNOLOGY, OXFORD, GB, PAGE(S) 175 - 221, (20040101), ISBN 978-1-85617-415-2, XP002606673 [Y] 4,5 * page 176; figure 1 * * page 182; figures 7, 9 * | Examination | JPS61290036 | JP2003053740 | - "MOLDING METHOD FOR LAMINATED PLATE", JPS61290036A, machine translation, (19861220), XP055068151 | by applicant | JP2006088049 | JP2009051074 | JP2010115822 |