EP2492367 - Surface coating method and device for exterior part [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been refused Status updated on 11.02.2022 Database last updated on 15.07.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 16.12.2019 | Most recent event Tooltip | 11.02.2022 | Refusal of application | published on 16.03.2022 [2022/11] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd. 129, Samsung-ro Yeongtong-gu Suwon-si, Gyeonggi-do, 443-742 / KR | [2012/39] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Ohira, Shigeo Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd 416 Maetan-dong Yeongtong-gu Suwon-si Gyeonggi-do 442-742 / KR | 02 /
Lim, Yong-Pil Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd 416 Maetan-dong Yeongtong-gu Suwon-si Gyeonggi-do 442-742 / KR | 03 /
Park, Jong-Bae Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd 416 Maetan-dong Yeongtong-gu Suwon-si Gyeonggi-do 442-742 / KR | 04 /
Choo, Sung-Hwan Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd 416 Maetan-dong Yeongtong-gu Suwon-si Gyeonggi-do 442-742 / KR | 05 /
Kim, Jong-Hwa Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd 416 Maetan-dong Yeongtong-gu Suwon-si Gyeonggi-do 442-742 / KR | 06 /
Kim, Hak-Ju Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd 416 Maetan-dong Yeongtong-gu Suwon-si Gyeonggi-do 442-742 / KR | 07 /
Kim, Se-Jin Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd 416 Maetan-dong Yeongtong-gu Suwon-si Gyeonggi-do 442-742 / KR | [2012/35] | Representative(s) | HGF HGF Limited 1 City Walk Leeds LS11 9DX / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2013/32] | Birchenough, Lewis, et al Harrison Goddard Foote LLP Saviour House 9 St Saviourgate York YO1 8NQ / GB | ||
Former [2012/35] | Jenkins, Richard Gavin Harrison Goddard Foote Saviour House 9 St Saviourgate York, YO1 8NQ / GB | Application number, filing date | 11182846.3 | 27.09.2011 | [2012/35] | Priority number, date | KR20110016098 | 23.02.2011 Original published format: KR 20110016098 | [2012/35] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2492367 | Date: | 29.08.2012 | Language: | EN | [2012/35] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 26.06.2012 | Classification | IPC: | C23C14/10, C23C14/20, C23C14/24, C23C14/50 | [2012/35] | CPC: |
C23C14/10 (EP,US);
C23C14/50 (KR);
C23C14/20 (EP,US);
C23C14/24 (EP,KR,US);
C23C14/34 (KR);
C23C14/505 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2012/35] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | Oberflächenbeschichtungsverfahren und Vorrichtung für den äußeren Teil | [2012/35] | English: | Surface coating method and device for exterior part | [2012/35] | French: | Procédé de revêtement de surface et dispositif pour pièce extérieure | [2012/35] | Examination procedure | 28.02.2013 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 28.02.2013 | Examination requested [2013/15] | 11.07.2013 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 21.11.2013 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 19.12.2019 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 20.04.2020 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 12.10.2021 | Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 30.11.2021 | 20.10.2021 | Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination [2022/11] | 30.10.2021 | Application refused, date of legal effect [2022/11] | 30.11.2021 | Date of oral proceedings (cancelled) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 11.07.2013 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 23.08.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 18.08.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 01.09.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 12.09.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 06.09.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 21.09.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 24.09.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 23.09.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.09.2021 | 11   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XY]WO03083162 (SATIS VACUUM IND S P A [IT], et al) [X] 1,2,4-11 * page 14, line 12 - page 18, line 26; figures 1-11; claims 1-25 * [Y] 3,12; | [X]JPS51147483 (NIPPON ELECTRIC CO) [X] 1,7-11 * abstract *; | [X]JPS5679435 (FUJITSU LTD) [X] 1,7-11 * abstract *; | [X]US2010272893 (CHANG PING [US], et al) [X] 7-11 * paragraphs [0051] - [0060]; figures 3-4; claims 1-7 *; | [Y]US2010045911 (HIRAIDE YOSHIFUMI [JP]) [Y] 3,12 * paragraph [0021] - paragraph [0027]; figures 1-3; claims 1-2 *; | [A]DE4322465 (FRAUNHOFER GES FORSCHUNG [DE], et al) [A] 1-12 * column 1, line 1 - column 5, line 48; figure 1; claims 1-5 * |