EP2401989 - Combination barb restraint and stent attachment deployment mechanism [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 30.11.2012 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 30.11.2012 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 02.01.2013 [2013/01] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Cordis Corporation 14201 N.W. 60th Avenue Miami Lakes Florida 33014 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2012/01] | For all designated states Cordis Corporation 14201 NW 60th Avenue Miami Lakes, FL 33014 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Fleming III, James A. 4002 Donegal Drive Bethlehem, PA Pennsylvania 18020 / US | 02 /
Majercak, Davis C. 519 Madison Drive Stewartsville, NJ New Jersey 08886 / US | [2012/01] | Representative(s) | Small, Gary James Carpmaels & Ransford LLP One Southampton Row London WC1B 5HA / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2012/01] | Small, Gary James Carpmaels & Ransford One Southampton Row London WC1B 5HA / GB | Application number, filing date | 11183158.2 | 16.04.2009 | [2012/01] | Priority number, date | US20080104727 | 17.04.2008 Original published format: US 104727 | [2012/01] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2401989 | Date: | 04.01.2012 | Language: | EN | [2012/01] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 23.11.2011 | Classification | IPC: | A61F2/82, A61F2/06 | [2012/01] | CPC: |
A61F2/07 (EP,US);
A61F2/89 (EP,US);
A61F2002/065 (EP,US);
A61F2002/075 (EP,US);
A61F2002/8483 (EP,US);
A61F2220/0066 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2012/01] | Title | German: | Kombination einer Widerhakenhalteeinrichtung und eines Stent-Befestigungseinsatzmechanismus | [2012/01] | English: | Combination barb restraint and stent attachment deployment mechanism | [2012/01] | French: | Combinaison de retenue par cran et de mécanisme de mise en place de fixation d'endoprothèse | [2012/01] | Examination procedure | 05.07.2012 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2013/01] | 13.08.2012 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [2013/01] | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP09251101.3 / EP2110102 | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued (EP20090251101) is 09.10.2009 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.09.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 28.03.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [E]EP2095793 (CORDIS CORP [US]) [E] 1-13 * paragraphs [0022] - [0024] - [0044] - [0057]; figures 6-12 *; | [XI]EP1621159 (CORDIS CORP [US]) [X] 1 * paragraphs [0024] , [0025]; figures 3-6 * [I] 5; | [Y]EP1878392 (CORDIS CORP [US]) [Y] 1-4,6,9-13 * paragraphs [0048] - [0050]; figures 2,3,6 *; | [Y]WO03075799 (ENDOVASCULAR TECH INC [US]) [Y] 1-4,6,9-13 * page 20, line 15 - page 28, line 12; figures 1-1AA *; | [Y]US2004243221 (FAWZI NATALIE V [US], et al) [Y] 1-4,6,9-13 * the whole document *; | [A]US2003065380 (KUGLER CHAD J [US], et al) [A] 1 * paragraph [0036]; figures 5A,5B * |