EP2402979 - Projection lens arrangement [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 29.08.2014 Database last updated on 05.08.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 29.06.2018 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MK | published on 01.08.2018 [2018/31] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Mapper Lithography IP B.V. Computerlaan 15 2628 XK Delft / NL | [2012/01] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Wieland, Marco Jan-Jaco Boeroestraat 23 2612 GD Delft / NL | 02 /
Van Veen, Alexander Hendrik Vincent Stadhoudersplein 27C 3039 ER ROTTERDAM / NL | [2012/01] | Representative(s) | Mooij, Maarten, et al Hoyng Rokh Monegier LLP Rembrandt Tower, 31st Floor Amstelplein 1 1096 HA Amsterdam / NL | [N/P] |
Former [2012/01] | Mooij, Maarten, et al Hoyng Monegier LLP Rembrandt Tower, 31st floor Amstelplein 1 1096 HA Amsterdam / NL | Application number, filing date | 11183370.3 | 15.04.2009 | [2012/01] | Priority number, date | US20080045243P | 15.04.2008 Original published format: US 45243 P | [2012/01] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2402979 | Date: | 04.01.2012 | Language: | EN | [2012/01] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP2402979 | Date: | 27.06.2012 | Language: | EN | [2012/26] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2402979 | Date: | 23.10.2013 | Language: | EN | [2013/43] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 31.05.2012 | Classification | IPC: | H01J37/317, H01J37/30, B82Y10/00, B82Y40/00 | [2013/17] | CPC: |
H01J37/3177 (EP,KR);
H01J37/317 (KR);
B82Y10/00 (EP,KR);
B82Y40/00 (EP,KR);
H01J37/10 (KR);
H01J37/147 (KR);
H01J37/3007 (EP,KR);
H01J2237/0492 (EP,KR);
H01J2237/10 (EP,KR);
H01J2237/15 (EP,KR)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2012/01] | H01J37/317, H01J37/30, B82Y10/00 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2012/01] | Title | German: | Projektionslinsenanordnung | [2012/01] | English: | Projection lens arrangement | [2012/01] | French: | Configuration de lentilles de projection | [2012/01] | Examination procedure | 27.12.2012 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 27.12.2012 | Examination requested [2013/07] | 15.05.2013 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 09.09.2013 | Fee for grant paid | 09.09.2013 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP09733141.7 / EP2279515 | Opposition(s) | 24.07.2014 | No opposition filed within time limit [2014/40] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 29.09.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 25.04.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 29.04.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 15.04.2009 | AT | 23.10.2013 | BE | 23.10.2013 | BG | 23.10.2013 | CY | 23.10.2013 | CZ | 23.10.2013 | DK | 23.10.2013 | EE | 23.10.2013 | ES | 23.10.2013 | FI | 23.10.2013 | HR | 23.10.2013 | IT | 23.10.2013 | LT | 23.10.2013 | LV | 23.10.2013 | MC | 23.10.2013 | MK | 23.10.2013 | MT | 23.10.2013 | PL | 23.10.2013 | RO | 23.10.2013 | SE | 23.10.2013 | SI | 23.10.2013 | SK | 23.10.2013 | TR | 23.10.2013 | NO | 23.01.2014 | GR | 24.01.2014 | IS | 23.02.2014 | PT | 24.02.2014 | LU | 15.04.2014 | [2018/31] |
Former [2016/33] | HU | 15.04.2009 | |
AT | 23.10.2013 | ||
BE | 23.10.2013 | ||
BG | 23.10.2013 | ||
CY | 23.10.2013 | ||
CZ | 23.10.2013 | ||
DK | 23.10.2013 | ||
EE | 23.10.2013 | ||
ES | 23.10.2013 | ||
FI | 23.10.2013 | ||
HR | 23.10.2013 | ||
IT | 23.10.2013 | ||
LT | 23.10.2013 | ||
LV | 23.10.2013 | ||
MC | 23.10.2013 | ||
MT | 23.10.2013 | ||
PL | 23.10.2013 | ||
RO | 23.10.2013 | ||
SE | 23.10.2013 | ||
SI | 23.10.2013 | ||
SK | 23.10.2013 | ||
TR | 23.10.2013 | ||
NO | 23.01.2014 | ||
GR | 24.01.2014 | ||
IS | 23.02.2014 | ||
PT | 24.02.2014 | ||
LU | 15.04.2014 | ||
Former [2016/32] | HU | 15.04.2009 | |
AT | 23.10.2013 | ||
BE | 23.10.2013 | ||
BG | 23.10.2013 | ||
CY | 23.10.2013 | ||
CZ | 23.10.2013 | ||
DK | 23.10.2013 | ||
EE | 23.10.2013 | ||
ES | 23.10.2013 | ||
FI | 23.10.2013 | ||
HR | 23.10.2013 | ||
IT | 23.10.2013 | ||
LT | 23.10.2013 | ||
LV | 23.10.2013 | ||
MC | 23.10.2013 | ||
MT | 23.10.2013 | ||
PL | 23.10.2013 | ||
RO | 23.10.2013 | ||
SE | 23.10.2013 | ||
SI | 23.10.2013 | ||
SK | 23.10.2013 | ||
NO | 23.01.2014 | ||
GR | 24.01.2014 | ||
IS | 23.02.2014 | ||
PT | 24.02.2014 | ||
LU | 15.04.2014 | ||
Former [2016/28] | AT | 23.10.2013 | |
BE | 23.10.2013 | ||
BG | 23.10.2013 | ||
CY | 23.10.2013 | ||
CZ | 23.10.2013 | ||
DK | 23.10.2013 | ||
EE | 23.10.2013 | ||
ES | 23.10.2013 | ||
FI | 23.10.2013 | ||
HR | 23.10.2013 | ||
IT | 23.10.2013 | ||
LT | 23.10.2013 | ||
LV | 23.10.2013 | ||
MC | 23.10.2013 | ||
MT | 23.10.2013 | ||
PL | 23.10.2013 | ||
RO | 23.10.2013 | ||
SE | 23.10.2013 | ||
SI | 23.10.2013 | ||
SK | 23.10.2013 | ||
NO | 23.01.2014 | ||
GR | 24.01.2014 | ||
IS | 23.02.2014 | ||
PT | 24.02.2014 | ||
LU | 15.04.2014 | ||
Former [2016/16] | AT | 23.10.2013 | |
BE | 23.10.2013 | ||
CY | 23.10.2013 | ||
CZ | 23.10.2013 | ||
DK | 23.10.2013 | ||
EE | 23.10.2013 | ||
ES | 23.10.2013 | ||
FI | 23.10.2013 | ||
HR | 23.10.2013 | ||
IT | 23.10.2013 | ||
LT | 23.10.2013 | ||
LV | 23.10.2013 | ||
MC | 23.10.2013 | ||
MT | 23.10.2013 | ||
PL | 23.10.2013 | ||
RO | 23.10.2013 | ||
SE | 23.10.2013 | ||
SI | 23.10.2013 | ||
SK | 23.10.2013 | ||
NO | 23.01.2014 | ||
IS | 23.02.2014 | ||
PT | 24.02.2014 | ||
LU | 15.04.2014 | ||
Former [2015/14] | AT | 23.10.2013 | |
BE | 23.10.2013 | ||
CY | 23.10.2013 | ||
CZ | 23.10.2013 | ||
DK | 23.10.2013 | ||
EE | 23.10.2013 | ||
ES | 23.10.2013 | ||
FI | 23.10.2013 | ||
HR | 23.10.2013 | ||
IT | 23.10.2013 | ||
LT | 23.10.2013 | ||
LV | 23.10.2013 | ||
MC | 23.10.2013 | ||
PL | 23.10.2013 | ||
RO | 23.10.2013 | ||
SE | 23.10.2013 | ||
SI | 23.10.2013 | ||
SK | 23.10.2013 | ||
NO | 23.01.2014 | ||
IS | 23.02.2014 | ||
PT | 24.02.2014 | ||
LU | 15.04.2014 | ||
Former [2015/01] | AT | 23.10.2013 | |
BE | 23.10.2013 | ||
CY | 23.10.2013 | ||
CZ | 23.10.2013 | ||
DK | 23.10.2013 | ||
EE | 23.10.2013 | ||
ES | 23.10.2013 | ||
FI | 23.10.2013 | ||
HR | 23.10.2013 | ||
IT | 23.10.2013 | ||
LT | 23.10.2013 | ||
LV | 23.10.2013 | ||
MC | 23.10.2013 | ||
PL | 23.10.2013 | ||
RO | 23.10.2013 | ||
SE | 23.10.2013 | ||
SK | 23.10.2013 | ||
NO | 23.01.2014 | ||
IS | 23.02.2014 | ||
PT | 24.02.2014 | ||
LU | 15.04.2014 | ||
Former [2014/52] | AT | 23.10.2013 | |
BE | 23.10.2013 | ||
CY | 23.10.2013 | ||
CZ | 23.10.2013 | ||
DK | 23.10.2013 | ||
EE | 23.10.2013 | ||
ES | 23.10.2013 | ||
FI | 23.10.2013 | ||
HR | 23.10.2013 | ||
IT | 23.10.2013 | ||
LT | 23.10.2013 | ||
LV | 23.10.2013 | ||
MC | 23.10.2013 | ||
PL | 23.10.2013 | ||
RO | 23.10.2013 | ||
SE | 23.10.2013 | ||
SK | 23.10.2013 | ||
NO | 23.01.2014 | ||
IS | 23.02.2014 | ||
PT | 24.02.2014 | ||
Former [2014/41] | AT | 23.10.2013 | |
BE | 23.10.2013 | ||
CY | 23.10.2013 | ||
CZ | 23.10.2013 | ||
DK | 23.10.2013 | ||
EE | 23.10.2013 | ||
ES | 23.10.2013 | ||
FI | 23.10.2013 | ||
HR | 23.10.2013 | ||
IT | 23.10.2013 | ||
LT | 23.10.2013 | ||
LV | 23.10.2013 | ||
PL | 23.10.2013 | ||
RO | 23.10.2013 | ||
SE | 23.10.2013 | ||
SK | 23.10.2013 | ||
NO | 23.01.2014 | ||
IS | 23.02.2014 | ||
PT | 24.02.2014 | ||
Former [2014/38] | AT | 23.10.2013 | |
BE | 23.10.2013 | ||
CY | 23.10.2013 | ||
CZ | 23.10.2013 | ||
EE | 23.10.2013 | ||
ES | 23.10.2013 | ||
FI | 23.10.2013 | ||
HR | 23.10.2013 | ||
IT | 23.10.2013 | ||
LT | 23.10.2013 | ||
LV | 23.10.2013 | ||
PL | 23.10.2013 | ||
RO | 23.10.2013 | ||
SE | 23.10.2013 | ||
SK | 23.10.2013 | ||
NO | 23.01.2014 | ||
IS | 23.02.2014 | ||
PT | 24.02.2014 | ||
Former [2014/37] | AT | 23.10.2013 | |
BE | 23.10.2013 | ||
CY | 23.10.2013 | ||
CZ | 23.10.2013 | ||
EE | 23.10.2013 | ||
ES | 23.10.2013 | ||
FI | 23.10.2013 | ||
HR | 23.10.2013 | ||
LT | 23.10.2013 | ||
LV | 23.10.2013 | ||
PL | 23.10.2013 | ||
RO | 23.10.2013 | ||
SE | 23.10.2013 | ||
SK | 23.10.2013 | ||
NO | 23.01.2014 | ||
IS | 23.02.2014 | ||
PT | 24.02.2014 | ||
Former [2014/36] | AT | 23.10.2013 | |
BE | 23.10.2013 | ||
CY | 23.10.2013 | ||
EE | 23.10.2013 | ||
ES | 23.10.2013 | ||
FI | 23.10.2013 | ||
HR | 23.10.2013 | ||
LT | 23.10.2013 | ||
LV | 23.10.2013 | ||
SE | 23.10.2013 | ||
NO | 23.01.2014 | ||
IS | 23.02.2014 | ||
PT | 24.02.2014 | ||
Former [2014/28] | AT | 23.10.2013 | |
BE | 23.10.2013 | ||
CY | 23.10.2013 | ||
ES | 23.10.2013 | ||
FI | 23.10.2013 | ||
HR | 23.10.2013 | ||
LT | 23.10.2013 | ||
LV | 23.10.2013 | ||
SE | 23.10.2013 | ||
NO | 23.01.2014 | ||
IS | 23.02.2014 | ||
PT | 24.02.2014 | ||
Former [2014/26] | AT | 23.10.2013 | |
BE | 23.10.2013 | ||
CY | 23.10.2013 | ||
ES | 23.10.2013 | ||
FI | 23.10.2013 | ||
HR | 23.10.2013 | ||
LT | 23.10.2013 | ||
LV | 23.10.2013 | ||
SE | 23.10.2013 | ||
NO | 23.01.2014 | ||
IS | 23.02.2014 | ||
Former [2014/25] | AT | 23.10.2013 | |
BE | 23.10.2013 | ||
ES | 23.10.2013 | ||
FI | 23.10.2013 | ||
HR | 23.10.2013 | ||
LT | 23.10.2013 | ||
LV | 23.10.2013 | ||
SE | 23.10.2013 | ||
NO | 23.01.2014 | ||
IS | 23.02.2014 | ||
Former [2014/24] | AT | 23.10.2013 | |
BE | 23.10.2013 | ||
ES | 23.10.2013 | ||
FI | 23.10.2013 | ||
HR | 23.10.2013 | ||
LT | 23.10.2013 | ||
SE | 23.10.2013 | ||
NO | 23.01.2014 | ||
IS | 23.02.2014 | ||
Former [2014/23] | BE | 23.10.2013 | |
FI | 23.10.2013 | ||
HR | 23.10.2013 | ||
LT | 23.10.2013 | ||
SE | 23.10.2013 | ||
NO | 23.01.2014 | ||
IS | 23.02.2014 | ||
Former [2014/22] | FI | 23.10.2013 | |
LT | 23.10.2013 | ||
SE | 23.10.2013 | ||
NO | 23.01.2014 | ||
Former [2014/20] | LT | 23.10.2013 | |
NO | 23.01.2014 | Documents cited: | Search | [XA]US2003085360 (PARKER N WILLIAM [US], et al) [X] 1,3-7,12,13 * paragraphs [0040] - [0042]; figures 2,3,5,6 * [A] 2,8-11,14,15; | [XAI]EP1453076 (CANON KK [JP], et al) [X] 1,3-7,12,13 * paragraph [0036] - paragraph [0044]; figures 12a,12b,13,14 * [A] 2,8-11,15 [I] 14; | [XA]US2005161621 (WIELAND MARCO J [NL], et al) [X] 1,3-6,12-14 * paragraphs [0001] , [0045] , [0059] - [0061]; figures 2, 8,9 *[A] 2,7-11,15 | by applicant | US5905267 | US2001004185 | US2004232349 | US6897458 | US6958804 | US7084414 | US7129502 |