EP2439369 - Tensioning device [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 13.11.2015 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 13.11.2015 | Withdrawal of application | published on 16.12.2015 [2015/51] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states GEZE GmbH Reinhold-Vöster-Strasse 21-29 71229 Leonberg / DE | [2012/15] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Buess, Roland Lehninger Weg 9 71263 Weil der Stadt / DE | [2012/15] | Representative(s) | (deleted) | [2012/15] | Application number, filing date | 11183768.8 | 04.10.2011 | [2012/15] | Priority number, date | DE20101042120 | 07.10.2010 Original published format: DE102010042120 | [2012/15] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2439369 | Date: | 11.04.2012 | Language: | DE | [2012/15] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP2439369 | Date: | 30.07.2014 | Language: | DE | [2014/31] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 26.06.2014 | Classification | IPC: | E05F15/14 | [2012/15] | CPC: |
E05F15/643 (EP);
E05Y2201/638 (EP);
E05Y2201/668 (EP);
E05Y2201/672 (EP);
E05Y2600/10 (EP);
E05Y2600/20 (EP);
E05Y2600/31 (EP)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2012/15] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | Spannvorrichtung | [2012/15] | English: | Tensioning device | [2012/15] | French: | Dispositif tendeur | [2012/15] | Examination procedure | 27.01.2015 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 27.01.2015 | Examination requested [2015/10] | 02.07.2015 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 11.11.2015 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2015/51] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 02.07.2015 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 24.10.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 23.10.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 26.10.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XA]DE19816563 (PRETTL ROLF [DE]) [X] 1-6,8 * column 1, line 64 - column 2, line 8 * [A] 7; | [A]DE202007014675U (MARANTEC ANTRIEB STEUERUNG [DE]) [A] 7 * paragraph [0052]; figures 12-13 *; | [A]DE202007015808U (WILLACH GMBH GEB [DE]) [A] 1-8 * abstract * | by applicant | DE102008028660 |