EP2439433 - Safety valve and electromagnetic valve [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 04.05.2018 Database last updated on 26.06.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 26.05.2017 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 28.03.2017 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 10.02.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 10.07.2020 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): AL | published on 12.08.2020 [2020/33] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states JTEKT Corporation 5-8, Minamisemba 3-chome Chuo-ku Osaka-shi, Osaka 542-8502 / JP | For all designated states Toyooki Kogyo Co., Ltd. 45, Aza-Kaizan Hatchi-cho Okazaki-shi Aichi 444-3512 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2012/15] | For all designated states JTEKT Corporation 5-8, Minamisemba 3-chome Chuo-ku Osaka-shi, Osaka 542-8502 / JP | ||
For all designated states Toyooki Kogyo Co., Ltd. 45, Aza-Kaizan Hatchi-cho Okazaki-shi Aichi 444-3512 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Imoto, Yoshinori c/o JTEKT CORPORATION 5-8, Minamisemba 3-chome, Chuo-ku Osaka-shi, Osaka 542-8502 / JP | 02 /
Suzuki, Hiroaki c/o JTEKT CORPORATION 5-8, Minamisemba 3-chome, Chuo-ku Osaka-shi, Osaka 542-8502 / JP | 03 /
Numazaki, Kazushi c/o JTEKT CORPORATION 5-8, Minamisemba 3-chome, Chuo-ku Osaka-shi, Osaka 542-8502 / JP | 04 /
Uchimura, Chihiro c/o TOYOTA JIDOSHA KABUSHIKI KAISHA 1, Toyota-cho Toyota-shi, Aichi 471-8571 / JP | 05 /
Yamashita, Akira c/o TOYOTA JIDOSHA KABUSHIKI KAISHA 1, Toyota-cho Toyota-shi, Aichi 471-8571 / JP | 06 /
Ishitoya, Tsukuo c/o TOYOTA JIDOSHA KABUSHIKI KAISHA 1, Toyota-cho Toyota-shi, Aichi 471-8571 / JP | 07 /
Watanabe, Noritaka c/o TOYOOKI KOGYO CO., LTD. 45, Aza-Kaizan, Hatchi-cho Okazaki-shi, Aichi 444-3512 / JP | [2012/15] | Representative(s) | TBK Bavariaring 4-6 80336 München / DE | [2012/15] | Application number, filing date | 11183831.4 | 04.10.2011 | [2012/15] | Priority number, date | JP20100225641 | 05.10.2010 Original published format: JP 2010225641 | [2012/15] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2439433 | Date: | 11.04.2012 | Language: | EN | [2012/15] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP2439433 | Date: | 09.11.2016 | Language: | EN | [2016/45] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2439433 | Date: | 28.06.2017 | Language: | EN | [2017/26] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 11.10.2016 | Classification | IPC: | F16K17/164, F16K27/02, F16K31/06, F16K15/14, F16K17/02, F16K31/02 | [2016/45] | CPC: |
F16K27/029 (EP,US);
F16K15/142 (EP,US);
F16K17/02 (US);
F16K17/164 (EP,US);
F16K31/0686 (EP,US);
F16K31/02 (US);
Y02E60/32 (US);
Y10T137/1624 (EP,US);
Y10T137/2627 (EP,US);
Y10T137/2642 (EP,US)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2012/15] | F16K17/164, F16K27/02, F16K31/06 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2017/11] |
Former [2012/15] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Title | German: | Sicherheitsventil und elektromagnetisches Ventil | [2012/15] | English: | Safety valve and electromagnetic valve | [2012/15] | French: | Soupape de sécurité et soupape électromagnétique | [2012/15] | Examination procedure | 04.10.2011 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 30.01.2017 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 30.01.2017 | Examination requested [2017/11] | 29.03.2017 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 12.05.2017 | Fee for grant paid | 12.05.2017 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 12.05.2017 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 29.03.2017 | Opposition(s) | 29.03.2018 | No opposition filed within time limit [2018/23] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.10.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 30.10.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 30.10.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 28.10.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 04.10.2011 | AL | 28.06.2017 | AT | 28.06.2017 | CY | 28.06.2017 | CZ | 28.06.2017 | DK | 28.06.2017 | EE | 28.06.2017 | ES | 28.06.2017 | FI | 28.06.2017 | HR | 28.06.2017 | IT | 28.06.2017 | LT | 28.06.2017 | LV | 28.06.2017 | MC | 28.06.2017 | MK | 28.06.2017 | NL | 28.06.2017 | PL | 28.06.2017 | PT | 28.06.2017 | RO | 28.06.2017 | RS | 28.06.2017 | SE | 28.06.2017 | SI | 28.06.2017 | SK | 28.06.2017 | SM | 28.06.2017 | TR | 28.06.2017 | BG | 28.09.2017 | NO | 28.09.2017 | GR | 29.09.2017 | GB | 04.10.2017 | IE | 04.10.2017 | LU | 04.10.2017 | MT | 04.10.2017 | IS | 28.10.2017 | BE | 31.10.2017 | CH | 31.10.2017 | FR | 31.10.2017 | LI | 31.10.2017 | [2020/33] |
Former [2020/27] | HU | 04.10.2011 | |
AT | 28.06.2017 | ||
CY | 28.06.2017 | ||
CZ | 28.06.2017 | ||
DK | 28.06.2017 | ||
EE | 28.06.2017 | ||
ES | 28.06.2017 | ||
FI | 28.06.2017 | ||
HR | 28.06.2017 | ||
IT | 28.06.2017 | ||
LT | 28.06.2017 | ||
LV | 28.06.2017 | ||
MC | 28.06.2017 | ||
MK | 28.06.2017 | ||
NL | 28.06.2017 | ||
PL | 28.06.2017 | ||
PT | 28.06.2017 | ||
RO | 28.06.2017 | ||
RS | 28.06.2017 | ||
SE | 28.06.2017 | ||
SI | 28.06.2017 | ||
SK | 28.06.2017 | ||
SM | 28.06.2017 | ||
TR | 28.06.2017 | ||
BG | 28.09.2017 | ||
NO | 28.09.2017 | ||
GR | 29.09.2017 | ||
GB | 04.10.2017 | ||
IE | 04.10.2017 | ||
LU | 04.10.2017 | ||
MT | 04.10.2017 | ||
IS | 28.10.2017 | ||
BE | 31.10.2017 | ||
CH | 31.10.2017 | ||
FR | 31.10.2017 | ||
LI | 31.10.2017 | ||
Former [2020/15] | HU | 04.10.2011 | |
AT | 28.06.2017 | ||
CY | 28.06.2017 | ||
CZ | 28.06.2017 | ||
DK | 28.06.2017 | ||
EE | 28.06.2017 | ||
ES | 28.06.2017 | ||
FI | 28.06.2017 | ||
HR | 28.06.2017 | ||
IT | 28.06.2017 | ||
LT | 28.06.2017 | ||
LV | 28.06.2017 | ||
MC | 28.06.2017 | ||
MK | 28.06.2017 | ||
NL | 28.06.2017 | ||
PL | 28.06.2017 | ||
RO | 28.06.2017 | ||
RS | 28.06.2017 | ||
SE | 28.06.2017 | ||
SI | 28.06.2017 | ||
SK | 28.06.2017 | ||
SM | 28.06.2017 | ||
TR | 28.06.2017 | ||
BG | 28.09.2017 | ||
NO | 28.09.2017 | ||
GR | 29.09.2017 | ||
GB | 04.10.2017 | ||
IE | 04.10.2017 | ||
LU | 04.10.2017 | ||
MT | 04.10.2017 | ||
IS | 28.10.2017 | ||
BE | 31.10.2017 | ||
CH | 31.10.2017 | ||
FR | 31.10.2017 | ||
LI | 31.10.2017 | ||
Former [2019/51] | HU | 04.10.2011 | |
AT | 28.06.2017 | ||
CY | 28.06.2017 | ||
CZ | 28.06.2017 | ||
DK | 28.06.2017 | ||
EE | 28.06.2017 | ||
ES | 28.06.2017 | ||
FI | 28.06.2017 | ||
HR | 28.06.2017 | ||
IT | 28.06.2017 | ||
LT | 28.06.2017 | ||
LV | 28.06.2017 | ||
MC | 28.06.2017 | ||
MK | 28.06.2017 | ||
NL | 28.06.2017 | ||
PL | 28.06.2017 | ||
RO | 28.06.2017 | ||
RS | 28.06.2017 | ||
SE | 28.06.2017 | ||
SI | 28.06.2017 | ||
SK | 28.06.2017 | ||
SM | 28.06.2017 | ||
BG | 28.09.2017 | ||
NO | 28.09.2017 | ||
GR | 29.09.2017 | ||
GB | 04.10.2017 | ||
IE | 04.10.2017 | ||
LU | 04.10.2017 | ||
MT | 04.10.2017 | ||
IS | 28.10.2017 | ||
BE | 31.10.2017 | ||
CH | 31.10.2017 | ||
FR | 31.10.2017 | ||
LI | 31.10.2017 | ||
Former [2019/46] | HU | 04.10.2011 | |
AT | 28.06.2017 | ||
CY | 28.06.2017 | ||
CZ | 28.06.2017 | ||
DK | 28.06.2017 | ||
EE | 28.06.2017 | ||
ES | 28.06.2017 | ||
FI | 28.06.2017 | ||
HR | 28.06.2017 | ||
IT | 28.06.2017 | ||
LT | 28.06.2017 | ||
LV | 28.06.2017 | ||
MC | 28.06.2017 | ||
NL | 28.06.2017 | ||
PL | 28.06.2017 | ||
RO | 28.06.2017 | ||
RS | 28.06.2017 | ||
SE | 28.06.2017 | ||
SI | 28.06.2017 | ||
SK | 28.06.2017 | ||
SM | 28.06.2017 | ||
BG | 28.09.2017 | ||
NO | 28.09.2017 | ||
GR | 29.09.2017 | ||
GB | 04.10.2017 | ||
IE | 04.10.2017 | ||
LU | 04.10.2017 | ||
MT | 04.10.2017 | ||
IS | 28.10.2017 | ||
BE | 31.10.2017 | ||
CH | 31.10.2017 | ||
FR | 31.10.2017 | ||
LI | 31.10.2017 | ||
Former [2019/31] | HU | 04.10.2011 | |
AT | 28.06.2017 | ||
CZ | 28.06.2017 | ||
DK | 28.06.2017 | ||
EE | 28.06.2017 | ||
ES | 28.06.2017 | ||
FI | 28.06.2017 | ||
HR | 28.06.2017 | ||
IT | 28.06.2017 | ||
LT | 28.06.2017 | ||
LV | 28.06.2017 | ||
MC | 28.06.2017 | ||
NL | 28.06.2017 | ||
PL | 28.06.2017 | ||
RO | 28.06.2017 | ||
RS | 28.06.2017 | ||
SE | 28.06.2017 | ||
SI | 28.06.2017 | ||
SK | 28.06.2017 | ||
SM | 28.06.2017 | ||
BG | 28.09.2017 | ||
NO | 28.09.2017 | ||
GR | 29.09.2017 | ||
GB | 04.10.2017 | ||
IE | 04.10.2017 | ||
LU | 04.10.2017 | ||
MT | 04.10.2017 | ||
IS | 28.10.2017 | ||
BE | 31.10.2017 | ||
CH | 31.10.2017 | ||
FR | 31.10.2017 | ||
LI | 31.10.2017 | ||
Former [2018/45] | AT | 28.06.2017 | |
CZ | 28.06.2017 | ||
DK | 28.06.2017 | ||
EE | 28.06.2017 | ||
ES | 28.06.2017 | ||
FI | 28.06.2017 | ||
HR | 28.06.2017 | ||
IT | 28.06.2017 | ||
LT | 28.06.2017 | ||
LV | 28.06.2017 | ||
MC | 28.06.2017 | ||
NL | 28.06.2017 | ||
PL | 28.06.2017 | ||
RO | 28.06.2017 | ||
RS | 28.06.2017 | ||
SE | 28.06.2017 | ||
SI | 28.06.2017 | ||
SK | 28.06.2017 | ||
SM | 28.06.2017 | ||
BG | 28.09.2017 | ||
NO | 28.09.2017 | ||
GR | 29.09.2017 | ||
GB | 04.10.2017 | ||
IE | 04.10.2017 | ||
LU | 04.10.2017 | ||
MT | 04.10.2017 | ||
IS | 28.10.2017 | ||
BE | 31.10.2017 | ||
CH | 31.10.2017 | ||
FR | 31.10.2017 | ||
LI | 31.10.2017 | ||
Former [2018/43] | AT | 28.06.2017 | |
CZ | 28.06.2017 | ||
DK | 28.06.2017 | ||
EE | 28.06.2017 | ||
ES | 28.06.2017 | ||
FI | 28.06.2017 | ||
HR | 28.06.2017 | ||
IT | 28.06.2017 | ||
LT | 28.06.2017 | ||
LV | 28.06.2017 | ||
MC | 28.06.2017 | ||
NL | 28.06.2017 | ||
PL | 28.06.2017 | ||
RO | 28.06.2017 | ||
RS | 28.06.2017 | ||
SE | 28.06.2017 | ||
SI | 28.06.2017 | ||
SK | 28.06.2017 | ||
SM | 28.06.2017 | ||
BG | 28.09.2017 | ||
NO | 28.09.2017 | ||
GR | 29.09.2017 | ||
GB | 04.10.2017 | ||
LU | 04.10.2017 | ||
MT | 04.10.2017 | ||
IS | 28.10.2017 | ||
BE | 31.10.2017 | ||
CH | 31.10.2017 | ||
FR | 31.10.2017 | ||
LI | 31.10.2017 | ||
Former [2018/37] | AT | 28.06.2017 | |
CZ | 28.06.2017 | ||
DK | 28.06.2017 | ||
EE | 28.06.2017 | ||
ES | 28.06.2017 | ||
FI | 28.06.2017 | ||
HR | 28.06.2017 | ||
IT | 28.06.2017 | ||
LT | 28.06.2017 | ||
LV | 28.06.2017 | ||
MC | 28.06.2017 | ||
NL | 28.06.2017 | ||
PL | 28.06.2017 | ||
RO | 28.06.2017 | ||
RS | 28.06.2017 | ||
SE | 28.06.2017 | ||
SI | 28.06.2017 | ||
SK | 28.06.2017 | ||
SM | 28.06.2017 | ||
BG | 28.09.2017 | ||
NO | 28.09.2017 | ||
GR | 29.09.2017 | ||
GB | 04.10.2017 | ||
LU | 04.10.2017 | ||
IS | 28.10.2017 | ||
BE | 31.10.2017 | ||
CH | 31.10.2017 | ||
FR | 31.10.2017 | ||
LI | 31.10.2017 | ||
Former [2018/36] | AT | 28.06.2017 | |
CZ | 28.06.2017 | ||
DK | 28.06.2017 | ||
EE | 28.06.2017 | ||
ES | 28.06.2017 | ||
FI | 28.06.2017 | ||
HR | 28.06.2017 | ||
IT | 28.06.2017 | ||
LT | 28.06.2017 | ||
LV | 28.06.2017 | ||
MC | 28.06.2017 | ||
NL | 28.06.2017 | ||
PL | 28.06.2017 | ||
RO | 28.06.2017 | ||
RS | 28.06.2017 | ||
SE | 28.06.2017 | ||
SK | 28.06.2017 | ||
SM | 28.06.2017 | ||
BG | 28.09.2017 | ||
NO | 28.09.2017 | ||
GR | 29.09.2017 | ||
GB | 04.10.2017 | ||
LU | 04.10.2017 | ||
IS | 28.10.2017 | ||
BE | 31.10.2017 | ||
CH | 31.10.2017 | ||
LI | 31.10.2017 | ||
Former [2018/35] | AT | 28.06.2017 | |
CZ | 28.06.2017 | ||
DK | 28.06.2017 | ||
EE | 28.06.2017 | ||
ES | 28.06.2017 | ||
FI | 28.06.2017 | ||
HR | 28.06.2017 | ||
IT | 28.06.2017 | ||
LT | 28.06.2017 | ||
LV | 28.06.2017 | ||
MC | 28.06.2017 | ||
NL | 28.06.2017 | ||
PL | 28.06.2017 | ||
RO | 28.06.2017 | ||
RS | 28.06.2017 | ||
SE | 28.06.2017 | ||
SK | 28.06.2017 | ||
SM | 28.06.2017 | ||
BG | 28.09.2017 | ||
NO | 28.09.2017 | ||
GR | 29.09.2017 | ||
GB | 04.10.2017 | ||
LU | 04.10.2017 | ||
IS | 28.10.2017 | ||
CH | 31.10.2017 | ||
LI | 31.10.2017 | ||
Former [2018/29] | AT | 28.06.2017 | |
CZ | 28.06.2017 | ||
DK | 28.06.2017 | ||
EE | 28.06.2017 | ||
ES | 28.06.2017 | ||
FI | 28.06.2017 | ||
HR | 28.06.2017 | ||
IT | 28.06.2017 | ||
LT | 28.06.2017 | ||
LV | 28.06.2017 | ||
MC | 28.06.2017 | ||
NL | 28.06.2017 | ||
PL | 28.06.2017 | ||
RO | 28.06.2017 | ||
RS | 28.06.2017 | ||
SE | 28.06.2017 | ||
SK | 28.06.2017 | ||
SM | 28.06.2017 | ||
BG | 28.09.2017 | ||
NO | 28.09.2017 | ||
GR | 29.09.2017 | ||
IS | 28.10.2017 | ||
Former [2018/21] | AT | 28.06.2017 | |
CZ | 28.06.2017 | ||
DK | 28.06.2017 | ||
EE | 28.06.2017 | ||
ES | 28.06.2017 | ||
FI | 28.06.2017 | ||
HR | 28.06.2017 | ||
IT | 28.06.2017 | ||
LT | 28.06.2017 | ||
LV | 28.06.2017 | ||
NL | 28.06.2017 | ||
PL | 28.06.2017 | ||
RO | 28.06.2017 | ||
RS | 28.06.2017 | ||
SE | 28.06.2017 | ||
SK | 28.06.2017 | ||
SM | 28.06.2017 | ||
BG | 28.09.2017 | ||
NO | 28.09.2017 | ||
GR | 29.09.2017 | ||
IS | 28.10.2017 | ||
Former [2018/11] | AT | 28.06.2017 | |
CZ | 28.06.2017 | ||
EE | 28.06.2017 | ||
ES | 28.06.2017 | ||
FI | 28.06.2017 | ||
HR | 28.06.2017 | ||
IT | 28.06.2017 | ||
LT | 28.06.2017 | ||
LV | 28.06.2017 | ||
NL | 28.06.2017 | ||
PL | 28.06.2017 | ||
RO | 28.06.2017 | ||
RS | 28.06.2017 | ||
SE | 28.06.2017 | ||
SK | 28.06.2017 | ||
SM | 28.06.2017 | ||
BG | 28.09.2017 | ||
NO | 28.09.2017 | ||
GR | 29.09.2017 | ||
IS | 28.10.2017 | ||
Former [2018/10] | AT | 28.06.2017 | |
CZ | 28.06.2017 | ||
EE | 28.06.2017 | ||
FI | 28.06.2017 | ||
HR | 28.06.2017 | ||
LT | 28.06.2017 | ||
LV | 28.06.2017 | ||
NL | 28.06.2017 | ||
RO | 28.06.2017 | ||
RS | 28.06.2017 | ||
SE | 28.06.2017 | ||
SK | 28.06.2017 | ||
BG | 28.09.2017 | ||
NO | 28.09.2017 | ||
GR | 29.09.2017 | ||
Former [2018/09] | EE | 28.06.2017 | |
FI | 28.06.2017 | ||
HR | 28.06.2017 | ||
LT | 28.06.2017 | ||
LV | 28.06.2017 | ||
NL | 28.06.2017 | ||
RS | 28.06.2017 | ||
SE | 28.06.2017 | ||
BG | 28.09.2017 | ||
NO | 28.09.2017 | ||
GR | 29.09.2017 | ||
Former [2017/52] | FI | 28.06.2017 | |
HR | 28.06.2017 | ||
LT | 28.06.2017 | ||
LV | 28.06.2017 | ||
NL | 28.06.2017 | ||
RS | 28.06.2017 | ||
SE | 28.06.2017 | ||
BG | 28.09.2017 | ||
NO | 28.09.2017 | ||
GR | 29.09.2017 | ||
Former [2017/50] | FI | 28.06.2017 | |
HR | 28.06.2017 | ||
LT | 28.06.2017 | ||
LV | 28.06.2017 | ||
RS | 28.06.2017 | ||
SE | 28.06.2017 | ||
BG | 28.09.2017 | ||
NO | 28.09.2017 | ||
GR | 29.09.2017 | ||
Former [2017/49] | FI | 28.06.2017 | |
HR | 28.06.2017 | ||
LT | 28.06.2017 | ||
NO | 28.09.2017 | ||
GR | 29.09.2017 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US3006160 (HEIDORN JOHN H) [A] 1-7* the whole document *; | [X]JPH08180850 (SHIN KOBE ELECTRIC MACHINERY) [X] 1 * abstract *; | [A]WO2004023010 (HERCULES VALVE INC [CA]) [A] 1-7 * the whole document *; | [A]US2010243085 (VAN WEELDEN CURTIS L [US], et al) [A] 1-7 * the whole document *; | [XP]DE202011003184U (DESOI GMBH [DE]) [XP] 1,3 * the whole document * | by applicant | JPS59197680 | JPH11151160 | JPH11182722 | JP2003240148 |