EP2441410 - Method for producing a medical image and medical workplace [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 08.03.2013 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 08.03.2013 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 10.04.2013 [2013/15] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states KUKA Laboratories GmbH Zugspitzstrasse 140 86165 Augsburg / DE | [2012/16] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Jacob, Dirk Robert-Schumann-Str. 13 87616 Marktoberdorf / DE | 02 /
Kuschel, Martin Bergmannstrasse 51 80339 München / DE | 03 /
Neff, Thomas Guldeinstr. 29 80339 München / DE | 04 /
Ortmaier, Tobias, Prof. Dr.-Ing. Auf der Pferdekoppel 5 30966 Hemmingen / DE | 05 /
Ueberle, Marc-Walter Gärtnerweg 15 86316 Friedberg / DE | [2012/16] | Representative(s) | Patentanwälte Funk & Böss GbR Sigmundstraße 1 80538 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2012/16] | Patentanwälte Funk & Böss GbR Sigmundstraße 1 80538 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 11183895.9 | 05.10.2011 | [2012/16] | Priority number, date | DE20101042372 | 13.10.2010 Original published format: DE102010042372 | [2012/16] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2441410 | Date: | 18.04.2012 | Language: | DE | [2012/16] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 23.01.2012 | Classification | IPC: | A61B19/00 | [2012/16] | CPC: |
A61B90/37 (EP);
A61B34/35 (EP);
A61B2090/364 (EP);
A61B2090/365 (EP);
A61B2090/367 (EP);
A61B2090/368 (EP);
A61B90/361 (EP)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2012/16] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | Verfahren zum Erstellen eines medizinischen Bildes und medizinischer Arbeitsplatz | [2012/16] | English: | Method for producing a medical image and medical workplace | [2012/16] | French: | Procédé de création d'une image médicale et poste de travail médical | [2012/16] | Examination procedure | 19.10.2012 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2013/15] | 22.11.2012 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [2013/15] |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [YD]US6522906 (SALISBURY JR J KENNETH [US], et al) [YD] 9,10 * paragraph [0076]; figures 1,2 * * paragraph [0083] * * paragraph [0036] * * paragraph [0102] *; | [Y]US2003029464 (CHEN DAVID T [US], et al) [Y] 9,10 * paragraph [0046] * * paragraph [0104] * * paragraph [0105] *; | [A]US6167296 (SHAHIDI RAMIN [US]) [A] 9 * claim 1 * | by applicant | US6799065 | US6522906 | US6892090 |