EP2439794 - Light emitting device [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 17.02.2017 Database last updated on 26.06.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.10.2018 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): AL | published on 14.11.2018 [2018/46] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states LG Innotek Co., Ltd. Seoul Square 541, Namdaemunno 5-ga Jung-gu Seoul 100-714 / KR | [N/P] |
Former [2012/15] | For all designated states LG Innotek Co., Ltd. Seoul Square 541, Namdaemunno 5-ga Jung-gu Seoul 100-714 / KR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Kim, Jae Wook Seoul Square, 541 Namdaemunno 5-ga Jung-gu 100-714 Seoul / KR | [2012/15] | Representative(s) | Zardi, Marco M. Zardi & Co. SA Via Pioda 6 6900 Lugano / CH | [2016/15] |
Former [2012/15] | Zardi, Marco M. Zardi & Co. S.A. Via Pioda 6 6900 Lugano / CH | Application number, filing date | 11183904.9 | 05.10.2011 | [2012/15] | Priority number, date | KR20100097281 | 06.10.2010 Original published format: KR 20100097281 | [2012/15] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2439794 | Date: | 11.04.2012 | Language: | EN | [2012/15] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP2439794 | Date: | 29.10.2014 | Language: | EN | [2014/44] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2439794 | Date: | 13.04.2016 | Language: | EN | [2016/15] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 01.10.2014 | Classification | IPC: | H01L33/38, H01L33/14, // H01L33/02 | [2014/44] | CPC: |
H01L33/14 (EP,US);
H01L33/382 (EP,US);
H01L2224/48091 (EP,US);
H01L2933/0016 (EP,US);
H01L33/025 (EP,US)
| C-Set: |
H01L2224/48091, H01L2924/00014 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2012/15] | H01L33/38, H01L33/14 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2015/24] |
Former [2012/15] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Title | German: | Lichtemittierende Vorrichtung | [2012/15] | English: | Light emitting device | [2012/15] | French: | Dispositif électroluminescent | [2012/15] | Examination procedure | 28.04.2015 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 28.04.2015 | Examination requested [2015/24] | 12.10.2015 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 12.02.2016 | Fee for grant paid | 12.02.2016 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 12.02.2016 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | EP16154884.7 / EP3043393 | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 12.10.2015 | Opposition(s) | 16.01.2017 | No opposition filed within time limit [2017/12] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 26.09.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 23.10.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 23.10.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 05.10.2011 | AL | 13.04.2016 | AT | 13.04.2016 | BE | 13.04.2016 | BG | 13.04.2016 | CY | 13.04.2016 | CZ | 13.04.2016 | DK | 13.04.2016 | EE | 13.04.2016 | ES | 13.04.2016 | FI | 13.04.2016 | HR | 13.04.2016 | IS | 13.04.2016 | IT | 13.04.2016 | LT | 13.04.2016 | LV | 13.04.2016 | MC | 13.04.2016 | MK | 13.04.2016 | PL | 13.04.2016 | RO | 13.04.2016 | RS | 13.04.2016 | SE | 13.04.2016 | SI | 13.04.2016 | SK | 13.04.2016 | SM | 13.04.2016 | TR | 13.04.2016 | NO | 13.07.2016 | GR | 14.07.2016 | PT | 16.08.2016 | IE | 05.10.2016 | LU | 05.10.2016 | CH | 31.10.2016 | LI | 31.10.2016 | MT | 31.10.2016 | [2018/46] |
Former [2018/38] | HU | 05.10.2011 | |
AT | 13.04.2016 | ||
BE | 13.04.2016 | ||
BG | 13.04.2016 | ||
CY | 13.04.2016 | ||
CZ | 13.04.2016 | ||
DK | 13.04.2016 | ||
EE | 13.04.2016 | ||
ES | 13.04.2016 | ||
FI | 13.04.2016 | ||
HR | 13.04.2016 | ||
IS | 13.04.2016 | ||
IT | 13.04.2016 | ||
LT | 13.04.2016 | ||
LV | 13.04.2016 | ||
MC | 13.04.2016 | ||
MK | 13.04.2016 | ||
PL | 13.04.2016 | ||
RO | 13.04.2016 | ||
RS | 13.04.2016 | ||
SE | 13.04.2016 | ||
SI | 13.04.2016 | ||
SK | 13.04.2016 | ||
SM | 13.04.2016 | ||
TR | 13.04.2016 | ||
NO | 13.07.2016 | ||
GR | 14.07.2016 | ||
PT | 16.08.2016 | ||
IE | 05.10.2016 | ||
LU | 05.10.2016 | ||
CH | 31.10.2016 | ||
LI | 31.10.2016 | ||
MT | 31.10.2016 | ||
Former [2018/31] | HU | 05.10.2011 | |
AT | 13.04.2016 | ||
BE | 13.04.2016 | ||
CY | 13.04.2016 | ||
CZ | 13.04.2016 | ||
DK | 13.04.2016 | ||
EE | 13.04.2016 | ||
ES | 13.04.2016 | ||
FI | 13.04.2016 | ||
HR | 13.04.2016 | ||
IS | 13.04.2016 | ||
IT | 13.04.2016 | ||
LT | 13.04.2016 | ||
LV | 13.04.2016 | ||
MC | 13.04.2016 | ||
MK | 13.04.2016 | ||
PL | 13.04.2016 | ||
RO | 13.04.2016 | ||
RS | 13.04.2016 | ||
SE | 13.04.2016 | ||
SI | 13.04.2016 | ||
SK | 13.04.2016 | ||
SM | 13.04.2016 | ||
TR | 13.04.2016 | ||
NO | 13.07.2016 | ||
GR | 14.07.2016 | ||
PT | 16.08.2016 | ||
IE | 05.10.2016 | ||
LU | 05.10.2016 | ||
CH | 31.10.2016 | ||
LI | 31.10.2016 | ||
MT | 31.10.2016 | ||
Former [2018/29] | HU | 05.10.2011 | |
AT | 13.04.2016 | ||
BE | 13.04.2016 | ||
CY | 13.04.2016 | ||
CZ | 13.04.2016 | ||
DK | 13.04.2016 | ||
EE | 13.04.2016 | ||
ES | 13.04.2016 | ||
FI | 13.04.2016 | ||
HR | 13.04.2016 | ||
IT | 13.04.2016 | ||
LT | 13.04.2016 | ||
LV | 13.04.2016 | ||
MC | 13.04.2016 | ||
MK | 13.04.2016 | ||
PL | 13.04.2016 | ||
RO | 13.04.2016 | ||
RS | 13.04.2016 | ||
SE | 13.04.2016 | ||
SI | 13.04.2016 | ||
SK | 13.04.2016 | ||
SM | 13.04.2016 | ||
TR | 13.04.2016 | ||
NO | 13.07.2016 | ||
GR | 14.07.2016 | ||
PT | 16.08.2016 | ||
IE | 05.10.2016 | ||
LU | 05.10.2016 | ||
CH | 31.10.2016 | ||
LI | 31.10.2016 | ||
Former [2018/28] | HU | 05.10.2011 | |
AT | 13.04.2016 | ||
BE | 13.04.2016 | ||
CY | 13.04.2016 | ||
CZ | 13.04.2016 | ||
DK | 13.04.2016 | ||
EE | 13.04.2016 | ||
ES | 13.04.2016 | ||
FI | 13.04.2016 | ||
HR | 13.04.2016 | ||
IT | 13.04.2016 | ||
LT | 13.04.2016 | ||
LV | 13.04.2016 | ||
MC | 13.04.2016 | ||
MK | 13.04.2016 | ||
PL | 13.04.2016 | ||
RO | 13.04.2016 | ||
RS | 13.04.2016 | ||
SE | 13.04.2016 | ||
SI | 13.04.2016 | ||
SK | 13.04.2016 | ||
SM | 13.04.2016 | ||
NO | 13.07.2016 | ||
GR | 14.07.2016 | ||
PT | 16.08.2016 | ||
IE | 05.10.2016 | ||
LU | 05.10.2016 | ||
CH | 31.10.2016 | ||
LI | 31.10.2016 | ||
Former [2017/51] | AT | 13.04.2016 | |
BE | 13.04.2016 | ||
CZ | 13.04.2016 | ||
DK | 13.04.2016 | ||
EE | 13.04.2016 | ||
ES | 13.04.2016 | ||
FI | 13.04.2016 | ||
HR | 13.04.2016 | ||
IT | 13.04.2016 | ||
LT | 13.04.2016 | ||
LV | 13.04.2016 | ||
PL | 13.04.2016 | ||
RO | 13.04.2016 | ||
RS | 13.04.2016 | ||
SE | 13.04.2016 | ||
SI | 13.04.2016 | ||
SK | 13.04.2016 | ||
SM | 13.04.2016 | ||
NO | 13.07.2016 | ||
GR | 14.07.2016 | ||
PT | 16.08.2016 | ||
IE | 05.10.2016 | ||
LU | 05.10.2016 | ||
CH | 31.10.2016 | ||
LI | 31.10.2016 | ||
Former [2017/43] | AT | 13.04.2016 | |
BE | 13.04.2016 | ||
CZ | 13.04.2016 | ||
DK | 13.04.2016 | ||
EE | 13.04.2016 | ||
ES | 13.04.2016 | ||
FI | 13.04.2016 | ||
HR | 13.04.2016 | ||
IT | 13.04.2016 | ||
LT | 13.04.2016 | ||
LV | 13.04.2016 | ||
PL | 13.04.2016 | ||
RO | 13.04.2016 | ||
RS | 13.04.2016 | ||
SE | 13.04.2016 | ||
SI | 13.04.2016 | ||
SK | 13.04.2016 | ||
SM | 13.04.2016 | ||
NO | 13.07.2016 | ||
GR | 14.07.2016 | ||
PT | 16.08.2016 | ||
LU | 05.10.2016 | ||
CH | 31.10.2016 | ||
LI | 31.10.2016 | ||
Former [2017/37] | AT | 13.04.2016 | |
BE | 13.04.2016 | ||
CZ | 13.04.2016 | ||
DK | 13.04.2016 | ||
EE | 13.04.2016 | ||
ES | 13.04.2016 | ||
FI | 13.04.2016 | ||
HR | 13.04.2016 | ||
IT | 13.04.2016 | ||
LT | 13.04.2016 | ||
LV | 13.04.2016 | ||
PL | 13.04.2016 | ||
RO | 13.04.2016 | ||
RS | 13.04.2016 | ||
SE | 13.04.2016 | ||
SI | 13.04.2016 | ||
SK | 13.04.2016 | ||
SM | 13.04.2016 | ||
NO | 13.07.2016 | ||
GR | 14.07.2016 | ||
PT | 16.08.2016 | ||
CH | 31.10.2016 | ||
LI | 31.10.2016 | ||
Former [2017/11] | AT | 13.04.2016 | |
BE | 13.04.2016 | ||
CZ | 13.04.2016 | ||
DK | 13.04.2016 | ||
EE | 13.04.2016 | ||
ES | 13.04.2016 | ||
FI | 13.04.2016 | ||
HR | 13.04.2016 | ||
IT | 13.04.2016 | ||
LT | 13.04.2016 | ||
LV | 13.04.2016 | ||
PL | 13.04.2016 | ||
RO | 13.04.2016 | ||
RS | 13.04.2016 | ||
SE | 13.04.2016 | ||
SK | 13.04.2016 | ||
SM | 13.04.2016 | ||
NO | 13.07.2016 | ||
GR | 14.07.2016 | ||
PT | 16.08.2016 | ||
Former [2017/10] | AT | 13.04.2016 | |
BE | 13.04.2016 | ||
CZ | 13.04.2016 | ||
DK | 13.04.2016 | ||
EE | 13.04.2016 | ||
ES | 13.04.2016 | ||
FI | 13.04.2016 | ||
HR | 13.04.2016 | ||
IT | 13.04.2016 | ||
LT | 13.04.2016 | ||
LV | 13.04.2016 | ||
PL | 13.04.2016 | ||
RO | 13.04.2016 | ||
RS | 13.04.2016 | ||
SE | 13.04.2016 | ||
SK | 13.04.2016 | ||
NO | 13.07.2016 | ||
GR | 14.07.2016 | ||
PT | 16.08.2016 | ||
Former [2017/09] | AT | 13.04.2016 | |
BE | 13.04.2016 | ||
CZ | 13.04.2016 | ||
DK | 13.04.2016 | ||
EE | 13.04.2016 | ||
ES | 13.04.2016 | ||
FI | 13.04.2016 | ||
HR | 13.04.2016 | ||
IT | 13.04.2016 | ||
LT | 13.04.2016 | ||
LV | 13.04.2016 | ||
PL | 13.04.2016 | ||
RO | 13.04.2016 | ||
RS | 13.04.2016 | ||
SE | 13.04.2016 | ||
NO | 13.07.2016 | ||
GR | 14.07.2016 | ||
PT | 16.08.2016 | ||
Former [2017/07] | AT | 13.04.2016 | |
BE | 13.04.2016 | ||
DK | 13.04.2016 | ||
ES | 13.04.2016 | ||
FI | 13.04.2016 | ||
HR | 13.04.2016 | ||
IT | 13.04.2016 | ||
LT | 13.04.2016 | ||
LV | 13.04.2016 | ||
PL | 13.04.2016 | ||
RS | 13.04.2016 | ||
SE | 13.04.2016 | ||
NO | 13.07.2016 | ||
GR | 14.07.2016 | ||
PT | 16.08.2016 | ||
Former [2017/03] | AT | 13.04.2016 | |
BE | 13.04.2016 | ||
ES | 13.04.2016 | ||
FI | 13.04.2016 | ||
HR | 13.04.2016 | ||
IT | 13.04.2016 | ||
LT | 13.04.2016 | ||
LV | 13.04.2016 | ||
PL | 13.04.2016 | ||
RS | 13.04.2016 | ||
SE | 13.04.2016 | ||
NO | 13.07.2016 | ||
GR | 14.07.2016 | ||
PT | 16.08.2016 | ||
Former [2016/52] | AT | 13.04.2016 | |
ES | 13.04.2016 | ||
FI | 13.04.2016 | ||
HR | 13.04.2016 | ||
LT | 13.04.2016 | ||
LV | 13.04.2016 | ||
PL | 13.04.2016 | ||
RS | 13.04.2016 | ||
SE | 13.04.2016 | ||
NO | 13.07.2016 | ||
GR | 14.07.2016 | ||
PT | 16.08.2016 | ||
Former [2016/51] | AT | 13.04.2016 | |
ES | 13.04.2016 | ||
FI | 13.04.2016 | ||
HR | 13.04.2016 | ||
LT | 13.04.2016 | ||
LV | 13.04.2016 | ||
PL | 13.04.2016 | ||
RS | 13.04.2016 | ||
NO | 13.07.2016 | ||
GR | 14.07.2016 | ||
PT | 16.08.2016 | ||
Former [2016/50] | AT | 13.04.2016 | |
ES | 13.04.2016 | ||
FI | 13.04.2016 | ||
HR | 13.04.2016 | ||
LT | 13.04.2016 | ||
LV | 13.04.2016 | ||
PL | 13.04.2016 | ||
RS | 13.04.2016 | ||
NO | 13.07.2016 | ||
Former [2016/49] | FI | 13.04.2016 | |
LT | 13.04.2016 | ||
PL | 13.04.2016 | ||
NO | 13.07.2016 | ||
Former [2016/46] | LT | 13.04.2016 | |
NO | 13.07.2016 | Documents cited: | Search | [XAYI]DE102008030584 (OSRAM OPTO SEMICONDUCTORS GMBH [DE]) [X] 1,2,4,5,10,15 * paragraphs [0042] - [0046] - [0 51] , [0 63] - [0066]; figures 5,6,9 * [A] 3 [Y] 8,11,12 [I] 6,7,9,13,14; | [A]DE102008034708 (OSRAM OPTO SEMICONDUCTORS GMBH [DE]) [A] 9* figures 1.,2 *; | [YA]EP2224501 (LG INNOTEK CO LTD [KR]) [Y] 8,11,12 * paragraphs [0047] , [0 51] - [0054]; figure - * [A] 3,6,7 |