EP2439087 - Device for preventing slipping of vehicle [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 01.03.2013 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 01.03.2013 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 03.04.2013 [2013/14] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Park, Il Jun 106-703 Daelim Apt. 415-1 Susaek-dong, Eunpyeong-gu Seoul 122-755 / KR | [2012/15] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [2012/15] | Representative(s) | Kling, Simone Lavoix Munich Bayerstrasse 83 80335 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2012/15] | Kling, Simone Lavoix Munich Bayerstrasse 85a 80335 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 11184343.9 | 06.03.2008 | [2012/15] | Priority number, date | KR20070023109 | 08.03.2007 Original published format: KR 20070023109 | [2012/15] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2439087 | Date: | 11.04.2012 | Language: | EN | [2012/15] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP2439087 | Date: | 18.07.2012 | Language: | EN | [2012/29] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 19.06.2012 | Classification | IPC: | B60C27/22 | [2012/15] | CPC: |
B60C27/22 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2012/15] | Title | German: | Antirutschvorrichtung für ein Fahrzeug | [2012/15] | English: | Device for preventing slipping of vehicle | [2012/15] | French: | Dispositif pour éviter le glissement d'un véhicule | [2012/15] | Examination procedure | 02.10.2012 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2013/14] | 07.11.2012 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2013/14] | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP08723307.8 / EP2137014 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 07.10.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 07.10.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.03.2012 | 05   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]WO2006049403 (PARK IL JUN [KR]) [A] 1-10* figure -; claim - *; | [A]KR200424423Y (PARK IL-JUN) [A] 1-10 * figure - * | by applicant | KR100526439B | KR20060045946 |