EP2581469 - Aqueous activator solution and process for electroless copper deposition on laser-direct structured substrates [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 19.02.2016 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.10.2018 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): AL | published on 14.11.2018 [2018/46] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Enthone, Inc. 350 Frontage Road West Haven, CT 06516 / US | [2013/16] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Bastenbeck, Edwin W. 1260 Buckingham Street No. 304 Watertown, CT 06795 / US | 02 /
Orschel, Harald, Dr. Alte Schulstrasse 135D 40764 Langenfeld / DE | 03 /
Prinz, Ulrich, Dr. Lüderitzweg 18 42697 Solingen / DE | [2013/16] | Representative(s) | Michalski Hüttermann & Partner Patentanwälte mbB Kaistraße 16A 40221 Düsseldorf / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2015/16] | Michalski Hüttermann & Partner Patentanwälte mbB Speditionstraße 21 40221 Düsseldorf / DE | ||
Former [2013/16] | Michalski Hüttermann & Partner Patentanwälte Hafenspitze Speditionstrasse 21 40221 Düsseldorf / DE | Application number, filing date | 11184516.0 | 10.10.2011 | [2013/16] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2581469 | Date: | 17.04.2013 | Language: | EN | [2013/16] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2581469 | Date: | 15.04.2015 | Language: | EN | [2015/16] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 05.12.2011 | Classification | IPC: | C23C18/16, C23C18/20, H05K3/18, C23C18/30, C23C18/22, C23C18/38, C23C18/42 | [2014/45] | CPC: |
C23C18/1607 (EP,US);
H05K3/182 (US);
C23C18/1641 (EP,US);
C23C18/166 (EP,US);
C23C18/204 (EP,US);
C23C18/2086 (EP,US);
C23C18/22 (EP,US);
C23C18/30 (EP,US);
C23C18/38 (EP,US);
C23C18/42 (EP,US);
B05D3/005 (US);
B05D5/12 (US);
|
Former IPC [2013/16] | C23C18/16, C23C18/20, H05K3/18, C23C18/30, C23C18/22 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2013/16] | Title | German: | Wässrige Aktivierungslösung und Verfahren zur stromlosen Kupferabscheidung auf direkt laserstrukturierten Substraten | [2013/16] | English: | Aqueous activator solution and process for electroless copper deposition on laser-direct structured substrates | [2013/16] | French: | Solution d'activation aqueuse et procédé pour le dépôt autocatalytique de cuivre sur des substrats structurés directement par laser | [2013/16] | Examination procedure | 25.07.2012 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 25.07.2012 | Examination requested [2013/16] | 18.07.2013 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 14.11.2013 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 08.05.2014 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 02.09.2014 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 22.12.2014 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 04.03.2015 | Fee for grant paid | 04.03.2015 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 04.03.2015 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 18.07.2013 | Opposition(s) | 18.01.2016 | No opposition filed within time limit [2016/12] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 29.10.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 29.08.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 10.10.2011 | AL | 15.04.2015 | AT | 15.04.2015 | BE | 15.04.2015 | BG | 15.04.2015 | CY | 15.04.2015 | CZ | 15.04.2015 | DK | 15.04.2015 | EE | 15.04.2015 | ES | 15.04.2015 | FI | 15.04.2015 | HR | 15.04.2015 | LT | 15.04.2015 | LV | 15.04.2015 | MC | 15.04.2015 | MK | 15.04.2015 | MT | 15.04.2015 | NL | 15.04.2015 | PL | 15.04.2015 | RO | 15.04.2015 | RS | 15.04.2015 | SE | 15.04.2015 | SI | 15.04.2015 | SK | 15.04.2015 | SM | 15.04.2015 | TR | 15.04.2015 | NO | 15.07.2015 | GR | 16.07.2015 | IS | 15.08.2015 | PT | 17.08.2015 | GB | 10.10.2015 | IE | 10.10.2015 | LU | 10.10.2015 | [2018/46] |
Former [2018/31] | HU | 10.10.2011 | |
AT | 15.04.2015 | ||
BE | 15.04.2015 | ||
BG | 15.04.2015 | ||
CY | 15.04.2015 | ||
CZ | 15.04.2015 | ||
DK | 15.04.2015 | ||
EE | 15.04.2015 | ||
ES | 15.04.2015 | ||
FI | 15.04.2015 | ||
HR | 15.04.2015 | ||
LT | 15.04.2015 | ||
LV | 15.04.2015 | ||
MC | 15.04.2015 | ||
MK | 15.04.2015 | ||
MT | 15.04.2015 | ||
NL | 15.04.2015 | ||
PL | 15.04.2015 | ||
RO | 15.04.2015 | ||
RS | 15.04.2015 | ||
SE | 15.04.2015 | ||
SI | 15.04.2015 | ||
SK | 15.04.2015 | ||
SM | 15.04.2015 | ||
TR | 15.04.2015 | ||
NO | 15.07.2015 | ||
GR | 16.07.2015 | ||
IS | 15.08.2015 | ||
PT | 17.08.2015 | ||
GB | 10.10.2015 | ||
IE | 10.10.2015 | ||
LU | 10.10.2015 | ||
Former [2017/38] | HU | 10.10.2011 | |
AT | 15.04.2015 | ||
BE | 15.04.2015 | ||
BG | 15.04.2015 | ||
CY | 15.04.2015 | ||
CZ | 15.04.2015 | ||
DK | 15.04.2015 | ||
EE | 15.04.2015 | ||
ES | 15.04.2015 | ||
FI | 15.04.2015 | ||
HR | 15.04.2015 | ||
LT | 15.04.2015 | ||
LV | 15.04.2015 | ||
MC | 15.04.2015 | ||
MT | 15.04.2015 | ||
NL | 15.04.2015 | ||
PL | 15.04.2015 | ||
RO | 15.04.2015 | ||
RS | 15.04.2015 | ||
SE | 15.04.2015 | ||
SI | 15.04.2015 | ||
SK | 15.04.2015 | ||
SM | 15.04.2015 | ||
NO | 15.07.2015 | ||
GR | 16.07.2015 | ||
IS | 15.08.2015 | ||
PT | 17.08.2015 | ||
GB | 10.10.2015 | ||
IE | 10.10.2015 | ||
LU | 10.10.2015 | ||
Former [2016/45] | AT | 15.04.2015 | |
BE | 15.04.2015 | ||
CZ | 15.04.2015 | ||
DK | 15.04.2015 | ||
EE | 15.04.2015 | ||
ES | 15.04.2015 | ||
FI | 15.04.2015 | ||
HR | 15.04.2015 | ||
LT | 15.04.2015 | ||
LV | 15.04.2015 | ||
MC | 15.04.2015 | ||
NL | 15.04.2015 | ||
PL | 15.04.2015 | ||
RO | 15.04.2015 | ||
RS | 15.04.2015 | ||
SI | 15.04.2015 | ||
SK | 15.04.2015 | ||
NO | 15.07.2015 | ||
GR | 16.07.2015 | ||
IS | 15.08.2015 | ||
PT | 17.08.2015 | ||
GB | 10.10.2015 | ||
IE | 10.10.2015 | ||
LU | 10.10.2015 | ||
Former [2016/37] | AT | 15.04.2015 | |
BE | 15.04.2015 | ||
CZ | 15.04.2015 | ||
DK | 15.04.2015 | ||
EE | 15.04.2015 | ||
ES | 15.04.2015 | ||
FI | 15.04.2015 | ||
HR | 15.04.2015 | ||
LT | 15.04.2015 | ||
LV | 15.04.2015 | ||
MC | 15.04.2015 | ||
NL | 15.04.2015 | ||
PL | 15.04.2015 | ||
RO | 15.04.2015 | ||
RS | 15.04.2015 | ||
SI | 15.04.2015 | ||
SK | 15.04.2015 | ||
NO | 15.07.2015 | ||
GR | 16.07.2015 | ||
IS | 15.08.2015 | ||
PT | 17.08.2015 | ||
GB | 10.10.2015 | ||
LU | 10.10.2015 | ||
Former [2016/34] | AT | 15.04.2015 | |
CZ | 15.04.2015 | ||
DK | 15.04.2015 | ||
EE | 15.04.2015 | ||
ES | 15.04.2015 | ||
FI | 15.04.2015 | ||
HR | 15.04.2015 | ||
LT | 15.04.2015 | ||
LV | 15.04.2015 | ||
MC | 15.04.2015 | ||
NL | 15.04.2015 | ||
PL | 15.04.2015 | ||
RO | 15.04.2015 | ||
RS | 15.04.2015 | ||
SI | 15.04.2015 | ||
SK | 15.04.2015 | ||
NO | 15.07.2015 | ||
GR | 16.07.2015 | ||
IS | 15.08.2015 | ||
PT | 17.08.2015 | ||
GB | 10.10.2015 | ||
LU | 10.10.2015 | ||
Former [2016/28] | AT | 15.04.2015 | |
CZ | 15.04.2015 | ||
DK | 15.04.2015 | ||
EE | 15.04.2015 | ||
ES | 15.04.2015 | ||
FI | 15.04.2015 | ||
HR | 15.04.2015 | ||
LT | 15.04.2015 | ||
LV | 15.04.2015 | ||
MC | 15.04.2015 | ||
NL | 15.04.2015 | ||
PL | 15.04.2015 | ||
RO | 15.04.2015 | ||
RS | 15.04.2015 | ||
SI | 15.04.2015 | ||
SK | 15.04.2015 | ||
NO | 15.07.2015 | ||
GR | 16.07.2015 | ||
IS | 15.08.2015 | ||
PT | 17.08.2015 | ||
LU | 10.10.2015 | ||
Former [2016/26] | AT | 15.04.2015 | |
CZ | 15.04.2015 | ||
DK | 15.04.2015 | ||
EE | 15.04.2015 | ||
ES | 15.04.2015 | ||
FI | 15.04.2015 | ||
HR | 15.04.2015 | ||
LT | 15.04.2015 | ||
LV | 15.04.2015 | ||
NL | 15.04.2015 | ||
PL | 15.04.2015 | ||
RO | 15.04.2015 | ||
RS | 15.04.2015 | ||
SI | 15.04.2015 | ||
SK | 15.04.2015 | ||
NO | 15.07.2015 | ||
GR | 16.07.2015 | ||
IS | 15.08.2015 | ||
PT | 17.08.2015 | ||
LU | 10.10.2015 | ||
Former [2016/24] | AT | 15.04.2015 | |
CZ | 15.04.2015 | ||
DK | 15.04.2015 | ||
EE | 15.04.2015 | ||
ES | 15.04.2015 | ||
FI | 15.04.2015 | ||
HR | 15.04.2015 | ||
LT | 15.04.2015 | ||
LV | 15.04.2015 | ||
NL | 15.04.2015 | ||
PL | 15.04.2015 | ||
RO | 15.04.2015 | ||
RS | 15.04.2015 | ||
SI | 15.04.2015 | ||
SK | 15.04.2015 | ||
NO | 15.07.2015 | ||
GR | 16.07.2015 | ||
IS | 15.08.2015 | ||
PT | 17.08.2015 | ||
Former [2016/10] | AT | 15.04.2015 | |
CZ | 15.04.2015 | ||
DK | 15.04.2015 | ||
EE | 15.04.2015 | ||
ES | 15.04.2015 | ||
FI | 15.04.2015 | ||
HR | 15.04.2015 | ||
LT | 15.04.2015 | ||
LV | 15.04.2015 | ||
NL | 15.04.2015 | ||
PL | 15.04.2015 | ||
RO | 15.04.2015 | ||
RS | 15.04.2015 | ||
SK | 15.04.2015 | ||
NO | 15.07.2015 | ||
GR | 16.07.2015 | ||
IS | 15.08.2015 | ||
PT | 17.08.2015 | ||
Former [2016/09] | AT | 15.04.2015 | |
DK | 15.04.2015 | ||
EE | 15.04.2015 | ||
ES | 15.04.2015 | ||
FI | 15.04.2015 | ||
HR | 15.04.2015 | ||
LT | 15.04.2015 | ||
LV | 15.04.2015 | ||
NL | 15.04.2015 | ||
RS | 15.04.2015 | ||
NO | 15.07.2015 | ||
GR | 16.07.2015 | ||
IS | 15.08.2015 | ||
PT | 17.08.2015 | ||
Former [2016/07] | AT | 15.04.2015 | |
DK | 15.04.2015 | ||
ES | 15.04.2015 | ||
FI | 15.04.2015 | ||
HR | 15.04.2015 | ||
LT | 15.04.2015 | ||
LV | 15.04.2015 | ||
NL | 15.04.2015 | ||
RS | 15.04.2015 | ||
NO | 15.07.2015 | ||
GR | 16.07.2015 | ||
IS | 15.08.2015 | ||
PT | 17.08.2015 | ||
Former [2015/51] | AT | 15.04.2015 | |
ES | 15.04.2015 | ||
FI | 15.04.2015 | ||
HR | 15.04.2015 | ||
LT | 15.04.2015 | ||
LV | 15.04.2015 | ||
NL | 15.04.2015 | ||
RS | 15.04.2015 | ||
NO | 15.07.2015 | ||
GR | 16.07.2015 | ||
IS | 15.08.2015 | ||
PT | 17.08.2015 | ||
Former [2015/50] | ES | 15.04.2015 | |
FI | 15.04.2015 | ||
HR | 15.04.2015 | ||
LT | 15.04.2015 | ||
LV | 15.04.2015 | ||
NL | 15.04.2015 | ||
RS | 15.04.2015 | ||
NO | 15.07.2015 | ||
GR | 16.07.2015 | ||
IS | 15.08.2015 | ||
PT | 17.08.2015 | ||
Former [2015/49] | ES | 15.04.2015 | |
FI | 15.04.2015 | ||
HR | 15.04.2015 | ||
LT | 15.04.2015 | ||
LV | 15.04.2015 | ||
NL | 15.04.2015 | ||
RS | 15.04.2015 | ||
NO | 15.07.2015 | ||
GR | 16.07.2015 | ||
PT | 17.08.2015 | ||
Former [2015/42] | NL | 15.04.2015 | Documents cited: | Search | [XI]EP0926262 (FRAUNHOFER GES FORSCHUNG [DE]) [X] 1,2,4,7 * paragraph [0008] - paragraph [0019] * * claims 1,3,4,10 * [I] 3,5,6; | [X]US2010075496 (CHEN QINGYUN [US], et al) [X] 1-7 * paragraph [0028] - paragraph [0033] * * paragraph [0043] - paragraph [0044] * * example 1 * * claim 1 *; | [XYI]JP2010080495 (HITACHI MAXELL) [X] 1-5,7 * abstract * * paragraphs [0015] , [0021] , [0027] , [0030] * * paragraph [0068] - paragraph [0071] * * figure 8 * [Y] 8-14 [I] 6; | [XYI]US2010320635 (OTA HIRONORI [JP], et al) [X] 1-4,7 * paragraph [0022] - paragraph [0024] * * paragraph [0029] * * paragraph [0039] - paragraph [0044] * [Y] 8-14 [I] 5,6; | [A] - M. HÜKSE ET AL, "Laser supported activation and additive metallization of thermoplastics for 3D-MIDS", PROCEEDINGS OF THE 3RD LANE 2001, AUGUST 28-31, 2001, ERLANGEN, GERMANY, (20010101), XP055013109 [A] 1-14 * the whole document * | [A] - PIOTR RYTLEWSKI ET AL, "Surface morphology studies of laser irradiated and chemically metalized polyamide composites", SURFACE AND COATINGS TECHNOLOGY, (20110901), vol. 205, no. 23-24, doi:10.1016/j.surfcoat.2011.04.105, ISSN 0257-8972, pages 5248 - 5253, XP055013110 [A] 1-14 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.surfcoat.2011.04.105 | Examination | WO2011072506 | by applicant | US2004241422 | EP1584708 | US2007163887 |