EP2442631 - Emi shielding gasket [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 30.08.2019 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 11.11.2016 | Most recent event Tooltip | 30.08.2019 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 02.10.2019 [2019/40] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Innochips Technology Co., Ltd. 769-12 Wonsi-Dong Danwon-Gu Ansan-si Gyeonggi-do 425-090 / KR | [2012/16] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Park, In-Kil B-104, Hyundaitown House 265 Gumi-Dong, Bundang-Gu Seongnam-Si Gyeonggi-Do, 463-802 / KR | 02 /
Kim, Dae Kyum 105-705, Samhwan Apt., Mansu 1-Dong, Namdong-Gu 405-740 Incheon / KR | [2012/16] | Representative(s) | Michalski Hüttermann & Partner Patentanwälte mbB Kaistraße 16A 40221 Düsseldorf / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2013/10] | Michalski Hüttermann & Partner Patentanwälte Hafenspitze Speditionstrasse 21 40221 Düsseldorf / DE | ||
Former [2012/16] | Hüttermann, Aloys Michalski Hüttermann & Partner Patentanwälte Neuer Zollhof 2 40221 Düsseldorf / DE | Application number, filing date | 11184598.8 | 11.10.2011 | [2012/16] | Priority number, date | KR20100100438 | 14.10.2010 Original published format: KR 20100100438 | [2012/16] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2442631 | Date: | 18.04.2012 | Language: | EN | [2012/16] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP2442631 | Date: | 07.05.2014 | Language: | EN | [2014/19] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 09.04.2014 | Classification | IPC: | H05K9/00 | [2012/16] | CPC: |
H05K9/0015 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2012/16] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | Abschirmungsdichtung gegen elektromagnetische Störungen | [2012/16] | English: | Emi shielding gasket | [2012/16] | French: | Joint de protection contre les interférences électromagnétiques | [2012/16] | Examination procedure | 07.11.2014 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 07.11.2014 | Examination requested [2014/51] | 30.06.2016 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 10.11.2016 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 01.05.2019 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2019/40] | 28.05.2019 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2019/40] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 30.06.2016 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 29.10.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 29.10.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.10.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 28.10.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 27.10.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.10.2018 | 08   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XI]WO2004054344 (GORE ENTERPRISE HOLDINGS INC [US]) [X] 1,2 * the whole document * [I] 3-7; | [X]US2008061518 (GILLILAND DON A [US], et al) [X] 1 * the whole document *; | [XI]JPH0715164 (NEC CORP) [X] 1,2 * the whole document * [I] 3-7; | [A]US4857668 (BUONANNO SAMUEL S [US]) [A] 1 * figure all *; | [A]US4820885 (LINDSAY TOM E [US]) [A] 1 * figure all * | by applicant | KR20100100438 |