EP2441551 - Device for screwing in screws [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 09.09.2016 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 09.09.2016 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 12.10.2016 [2016/41] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states SFS intec Holding AG Nefenstrasse 30 9435 Heerbrugg / CH | [2012/16] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Mair, Roland Appenzellerstrasse 56 6840 Götzis / AT | 02 /
Müller, Paul Kapellweg 68a 9443 Widnau / CH | [2012/16] | Representative(s) | (deleted) | [2012/16] | Application number, filing date | 11184793.5 | 12.10.2011 | [2012/16] | Priority number, date | DE20101048775 | 18.10.2010 Original published format: DE102010048775 | [2012/16] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2441551 | Date: | 18.04.2012 | Language: | DE | [2012/16] | Classification | IPC: | B25B21/00 | [2012/16] | CPC: |
B25B21/002 (EP);
E04D15/04 (EP);
E04D2015/047 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2012/16] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | Vorrichtung zum Eindrehen von Schrauben | [2012/16] | English: | Device for screwing in screws | [2012/16] | French: | Dispositif d'introduction par rotation de vis | [2012/16] | Examination procedure | deleted | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 03.05.2016 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2016/41] | 01.06.2016 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2016/41] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 12.09.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 16.09.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.10.2015 | 05   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | by applicant | DE9115893U | AT360926B |