EP2441505 - Using a portable gaming device to record or modify a game or application in real-time running on a home gaming system [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been refused Status updated on 13.01.2023 Database last updated on 30.09.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 13.10.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 13.01.2023 | Refusal of application | published on 15.02.2023 [2023/07] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Sony Interactive Entertainment Inc. 1-7-1 Konan Minato-ku Tokyo 108-8270 / JP | [2017/30] |
Former [2016/24] | For all designated states Sony Interactive Entertainment Inc. 1-7-1 Konan Minato-ku Tokyo 108-0075 / JP | ||
Former [2012/16] | For all designated states Sony Computer Entertainment Inc. 1-7-1 Konan Minato-ku Tokyo 108-0075 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Zhu, Yunpeng 919 East Hillsdale Blvd. 2nd Floor Foster City 94404-2175 / US | 02 /
Stafford, Jeffrey Roger 919 East Hillsdale Blvd. 2nd Floor Foster City 94404-2175 / US | 03 /
Osman, Steven 919 East Hillsdale Blvd. 2nd Floor Foster City 94404-2175 / US | [2012/16] | Representative(s) | D Young & Co LLP 3 Noble Street London EC2V 7BQ / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2012/16] | Turner, James Arthur D Young & Co LLP 120 Holborn London EC1N 2DY / GB | Application number, filing date | 11184814.9 | 12.10.2011 | [2012/16] | Priority number, date | US20100903123 | 12.10.2010 Original published format: US 903123 | [2012/16] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2441505 | Date: | 18.04.2012 | Language: | EN | [2012/16] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP2441505 | Date: | 01.01.2014 | Language: | EN | [2014/01] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 04.12.2013 | Classification | IPC: | A63F13/10, A63F13/12 | [2012/16] | CPC: |
A63F13/2145 (EP);
A63F13/211 (EP,US);
A63F13/25 (US);
A63F13/26 (EP,US);
A63F13/323 (EP);
A63F13/352 (EP,US);
A63F13/355 (EP,US);
A63F13/428 (EP,US);
A63F13/63 (EP,US);
A63F13/86 (EP);
A63F13/92 (EP,US);
A63F13/213 (EP);
A63F13/327 (EP,US);
A63F13/47 (EP,US);
A63F2300/301 (EP,US);
A63F2300/403 (EP,US);
A63F2300/538 (EP,US);
A63F2300/632 (EP,US);
A63F2300/8082 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2012/16] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | Verwendung einer tragbaren Spielvorrichtung zur Aufzeichnung oder Änderung eines Spiels oder Anwendung in Echtzeit-Ausführung auf einem Heimatspielsystem | [2012/16] | English: | Using a portable gaming device to record or modify a game or application in real-time running on a home gaming system | [2012/16] | French: | Utilisation d'un dispositif de jeux portable pour enregistrer ou modifier un jeu ou une application en temps réel sur un système de jeu domestique | [2012/16] | Examination procedure | 30.06.2014 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 30.06.2014 | Examination requested [2014/32] | 11.10.2017 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 19.12.2017 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 02.11.2020 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 25.02.2021 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 03.02.2022 | Application refused, date of legal effect [2023/07] | 03.02.2022 | Date of oral proceedings | 20.09.2022 | Minutes of oral proceedings despatched | 30.09.2022 | Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination [2023/07] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 11.10.2017 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.10.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.10.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.10.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 27.10.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 27.10.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 29.10.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 28.10.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 27.10.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 27.10.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | 27.10.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 12 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US2002165028 (MIYAMOTO SHIGERU [JP], et al) [A] 1-15* the whole document *; | [I]GB2442259 (SONY COMP ENTERTAINMENT EUROPE [GB]) [I] 1-15 * abstract * * pages 6,7 * * page 8, line 31 - page 9, line 21 * * page 10, line 14 * * page 12, line 11 - line 29 * * page 13, line 29 - page 14, line 13 * |