EP2444723 - Lighting device for a vehicle, with anti-vibration system [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 13.10.2017 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 12.01.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 13.10.2017 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 15.11.2017 [2017/46] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states VALEO VISION 34, rue Saint-André 93012 Bobigny Cedex / FR | [2012/17] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Bakacha, Malik 250, Lasseron 44370 Belligné / FR | 02 /
Puente, Jean-Claude 14, Allée des Fossés 93190 LIVRY GARGAN / FR | [2012/17] | Representative(s) | (deleted) | [2012/17] | Application number, filing date | 11185306.5 | 14.10.2011 | [2012/17] | Priority number, date | FR20100058598 | 21.10.2010 Original published format: FR 1058598 | [2012/17] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2444723 | Date: | 25.04.2012 | Language: | FR | [2012/17] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 08.12.2011 | Classification | IPC: | F21V14/04, B60Q1/076, F21V15/04 | [2017/03] | CPC: |
B60Q1/076 (EP);
F21V15/04 (EP)
|
Former IPC [2012/17] | F21V14/04, B60Q1/076 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2012/17] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | Beleuchtungsvorrichtung für Fahrzeug mit Antivibrationssystem | [2012/17] | English: | Lighting device for a vehicle, with anti-vibration system | [2012/17] | French: | Dispositif d'éclairage pour véhicule, avec système anti-vibration | [2012/17] | Examination procedure | 22.10.2012 | Examination requested [2012/48] | 01.02.2013 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 13.01.2017 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 24.05.2017 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2017/46] | 28.06.2017 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time [2017/46] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 13.01.2017 | Request for further processing for: | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to reply to the Extended European Search Report/Written Opinion of the International Searching Authority/International Preliminary Examination Report/Supplementary international search report/Supplementary European search report | 01.02.2013 | Request for further processing filed | 01.02.2013 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 14.02.2013 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.09.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 23.09.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 28.09.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 28.09.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]EP0786376 (VALEO VISION [FR]) [X] 1,5,6,8-12 * column 1, lines 31-44 * * column 3, line 43 - column 4, line 58 * * figures 1-4; claims 1,2,8-11 *; | [X]FR2800335 (VALEO VISION [FR]) [X] 1,2,5,6 * page 6, lines 21-24 * * figure 1; claims 1,2,5,6 *; | [A]EP1820693 (SCHEFENACKER VISION SYSTEMS [DE]) [A] 1-16 * paragraphs [0008] , [0010] , [0011] , [0013] , [0015] - [0017] * * figure 7; claims 1-7 *; | [A]DE102008014823 (HELLA KGAA HUECK & CO [DE]) [A] 1 * abstract *; | [A]US5142455 (KOSMATKA WALTER J [US]) [A] 1-5 * column 4, line 64 - column 5, line 10 * | by applicant | EP0816749 | EP0791780 | DE2651912 | JPS57191141 |