EP2447425 - Cover for covering a basin outlet of a drainage basin [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 10.11.2017 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 02.12.2016 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 30.11.2016 | Most recent event Tooltip | 10.07.2020 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): AL | published on 12.08.2020 [2020/33] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states BLANCO GmbH + Co KG Flehinger Strasse 59 75038 Oberderdingen / DE | [2012/18] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Schmälzle, Frank c/o Albrecht Schmälzle Mittlere Waldparkstrasse 7 75239 Eisingen / DE | [2012/18] | Representative(s) | Hoeger, Stellrecht & Partner Patentanwälte mbB Uhlandstrasse 14c 70182 Stuttgart / DE | [2017/01] |
Former [2012/18] | Hoeger, Stellrecht & Partner Patentanwälte Uhlandstrasse 14c 70182 Stuttgart / DE | Application number, filing date | 11185640.7 | 18.10.2011 | [2012/18] | Priority number, date | DE20101043125 | 29.10.2010 Original published format: DE102010043125 | [2012/18] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2447425 | Date: | 02.05.2012 | Language: | DE | [2012/18] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP2447425 | Date: | 21.05.2014 | Language: | DE | [2014/21] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2447425 | Date: | 04.01.2017 | Language: | DE | [2017/01] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 24.04.2014 | Classification | IPC: | E03C1/262, E03C1/26 | [2014/21] | CPC: |
E03C1/26 (EP);
E03C1/262 (EP);
E03C2201/50 (EP)
|
Former IPC [2012/18] | E03C1/186 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2017/01] |
Former [2012/18] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Title | German: | Abdeckung zum Abdecken eines Beckenauslaufs eines Spülbeckens | [2012/18] | English: | Cover for covering a basin outlet of a drainage basin | [2012/18] | French: | Recouvrement pour recouvrir une évacuation du bac d'un évier | [2012/18] | Examination procedure | 21.11.2014 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 21.11.2014 | Examination requested [2015/01] | 22.06.2016 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 20.10.2016 | Disapproval of the communication of intention to grant the patent by the applicant or resumption of examination proceedings by the EPO | 20.10.2016 | Fee for grant paid | 20.10.2016 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 29.11.2016 | Information about intention to grant a patent | 29.11.2016 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 22.06.2016 | Opposition(s) | 05.10.2017 | No opposition filed within time limit [2017/50] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 25.10.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 23.10.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 28.10.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 24.10.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 18.10.2011 | AL | 04.01.2017 | CY | 04.01.2017 | CZ | 04.01.2017 | DK | 04.01.2017 | EE | 04.01.2017 | ES | 04.01.2017 | FI | 04.01.2017 | HR | 04.01.2017 | IT | 04.01.2017 | LT | 04.01.2017 | LV | 04.01.2017 | MC | 04.01.2017 | MK | 04.01.2017 | MT | 04.01.2017 | NL | 04.01.2017 | PL | 04.01.2017 | RO | 04.01.2017 | RS | 04.01.2017 | SE | 04.01.2017 | SI | 04.01.2017 | SK | 04.01.2017 | SM | 04.01.2017 | TR | 04.01.2017 | BG | 04.04.2017 | NO | 04.04.2017 | GR | 05.04.2017 | IS | 04.05.2017 | PT | 04.05.2017 | [2020/33] |
Former [2020/15] | HU | 18.10.2011 | |
CY | 04.01.2017 | ||
CZ | 04.01.2017 | ||
DK | 04.01.2017 | ||
EE | 04.01.2017 | ||
ES | 04.01.2017 | ||
FI | 04.01.2017 | ||
HR | 04.01.2017 | ||
IT | 04.01.2017 | ||
LT | 04.01.2017 | ||
LV | 04.01.2017 | ||
MC | 04.01.2017 | ||
MK | 04.01.2017 | ||
MT | 04.01.2017 | ||
NL | 04.01.2017 | ||
PL | 04.01.2017 | ||
RO | 04.01.2017 | ||
RS | 04.01.2017 | ||
SE | 04.01.2017 | ||
SI | 04.01.2017 | ||
SK | 04.01.2017 | ||
SM | 04.01.2017 | ||
TR | 04.01.2017 | ||
BG | 04.04.2017 | ||
NO | 04.04.2017 | ||
GR | 05.04.2017 | ||
IS | 04.05.2017 | ||
PT | 04.05.2017 | ||
Former [2019/51] | HU | 18.10.2011 | |
CY | 04.01.2017 | ||
CZ | 04.01.2017 | ||
DK | 04.01.2017 | ||
EE | 04.01.2017 | ||
ES | 04.01.2017 | ||
FI | 04.01.2017 | ||
HR | 04.01.2017 | ||
IT | 04.01.2017 | ||
LT | 04.01.2017 | ||
LV | 04.01.2017 | ||
MC | 04.01.2017 | ||
MK | 04.01.2017 | ||
MT | 04.01.2017 | ||
NL | 04.01.2017 | ||
PL | 04.01.2017 | ||
RO | 04.01.2017 | ||
RS | 04.01.2017 | ||
SE | 04.01.2017 | ||
SI | 04.01.2017 | ||
SK | 04.01.2017 | ||
SM | 04.01.2017 | ||
BG | 04.04.2017 | ||
NO | 04.04.2017 | ||
GR | 05.04.2017 | ||
IS | 04.05.2017 | ||
PT | 04.05.2017 | ||
Former [2019/46] | HU | 18.10.2011 | |
CY | 04.01.2017 | ||
CZ | 04.01.2017 | ||
DK | 04.01.2017 | ||
EE | 04.01.2017 | ||
ES | 04.01.2017 | ||
FI | 04.01.2017 | ||
HR | 04.01.2017 | ||
IT | 04.01.2017 | ||
LT | 04.01.2017 | ||
LV | 04.01.2017 | ||
MC | 04.01.2017 | ||
MT | 04.01.2017 | ||
NL | 04.01.2017 | ||
PL | 04.01.2017 | ||
RO | 04.01.2017 | ||
RS | 04.01.2017 | ||
SE | 04.01.2017 | ||
SI | 04.01.2017 | ||
SK | 04.01.2017 | ||
SM | 04.01.2017 | ||
BG | 04.04.2017 | ||
NO | 04.04.2017 | ||
GR | 05.04.2017 | ||
IS | 04.05.2017 | ||
PT | 04.05.2017 | ||
Former [2019/31] | HU | 18.10.2011 | |
CZ | 04.01.2017 | ||
DK | 04.01.2017 | ||
EE | 04.01.2017 | ||
ES | 04.01.2017 | ||
FI | 04.01.2017 | ||
HR | 04.01.2017 | ||
IT | 04.01.2017 | ||
LT | 04.01.2017 | ||
LV | 04.01.2017 | ||
MC | 04.01.2017 | ||
MT | 04.01.2017 | ||
NL | 04.01.2017 | ||
PL | 04.01.2017 | ||
RO | 04.01.2017 | ||
RS | 04.01.2017 | ||
SE | 04.01.2017 | ||
SI | 04.01.2017 | ||
SK | 04.01.2017 | ||
SM | 04.01.2017 | ||
BG | 04.04.2017 | ||
NO | 04.04.2017 | ||
GR | 05.04.2017 | ||
IS | 04.05.2017 | ||
PT | 04.05.2017 | ||
Former [2018/43] | CZ | 04.01.2017 | |
DK | 04.01.2017 | ||
EE | 04.01.2017 | ||
ES | 04.01.2017 | ||
FI | 04.01.2017 | ||
HR | 04.01.2017 | ||
IT | 04.01.2017 | ||
LT | 04.01.2017 | ||
LV | 04.01.2017 | ||
MC | 04.01.2017 | ||
MT | 04.01.2017 | ||
NL | 04.01.2017 | ||
PL | 04.01.2017 | ||
RO | 04.01.2017 | ||
RS | 04.01.2017 | ||
SE | 04.01.2017 | ||
SI | 04.01.2017 | ||
SK | 04.01.2017 | ||
SM | 04.01.2017 | ||
BG | 04.04.2017 | ||
NO | 04.04.2017 | ||
GR | 05.04.2017 | ||
IS | 04.05.2017 | ||
PT | 04.05.2017 | ||
Former [2018/29] | CZ | 04.01.2017 | |
DK | 04.01.2017 | ||
EE | 04.01.2017 | ||
ES | 04.01.2017 | ||
FI | 04.01.2017 | ||
HR | 04.01.2017 | ||
IT | 04.01.2017 | ||
LT | 04.01.2017 | ||
LV | 04.01.2017 | ||
MC | 04.01.2017 | ||
NL | 04.01.2017 | ||
PL | 04.01.2017 | ||
RO | 04.01.2017 | ||
RS | 04.01.2017 | ||
SE | 04.01.2017 | ||
SI | 04.01.2017 | ||
SK | 04.01.2017 | ||
SM | 04.01.2017 | ||
BG | 04.04.2017 | ||
NO | 04.04.2017 | ||
GR | 05.04.2017 | ||
IS | 04.05.2017 | ||
PT | 04.05.2017 | ||
Former [2018/14] | CZ | 04.01.2017 | |
DK | 04.01.2017 | ||
EE | 04.01.2017 | ||
ES | 04.01.2017 | ||
FI | 04.01.2017 | ||
HR | 04.01.2017 | ||
IT | 04.01.2017 | ||
LT | 04.01.2017 | ||
LV | 04.01.2017 | ||
NL | 04.01.2017 | ||
PL | 04.01.2017 | ||
RO | 04.01.2017 | ||
RS | 04.01.2017 | ||
SE | 04.01.2017 | ||
SI | 04.01.2017 | ||
SK | 04.01.2017 | ||
SM | 04.01.2017 | ||
BG | 04.04.2017 | ||
NO | 04.04.2017 | ||
GR | 05.04.2017 | ||
IS | 04.05.2017 | ||
PT | 04.05.2017 | ||
Former [2017/51] | CZ | 04.01.2017 | |
DK | 04.01.2017 | ||
EE | 04.01.2017 | ||
ES | 04.01.2017 | ||
FI | 04.01.2017 | ||
HR | 04.01.2017 | ||
IT | 04.01.2017 | ||
LT | 04.01.2017 | ||
LV | 04.01.2017 | ||
NL | 04.01.2017 | ||
PL | 04.01.2017 | ||
RO | 04.01.2017 | ||
RS | 04.01.2017 | ||
SE | 04.01.2017 | ||
SK | 04.01.2017 | ||
SM | 04.01.2017 | ||
BG | 04.04.2017 | ||
NO | 04.04.2017 | ||
GR | 05.04.2017 | ||
IS | 04.05.2017 | ||
PT | 04.05.2017 | ||
Former [2017/50] | CZ | 04.01.2017 | |
DK | 04.01.2017 | ||
EE | 04.01.2017 | ||
ES | 04.01.2017 | ||
FI | 04.01.2017 | ||
HR | 04.01.2017 | ||
IT | 04.01.2017 | ||
LT | 04.01.2017 | ||
LV | 04.01.2017 | ||
NL | 04.01.2017 | ||
PL | 04.01.2017 | ||
RO | 04.01.2017 | ||
RS | 04.01.2017 | ||
SE | 04.01.2017 | ||
SK | 04.01.2017 | ||
BG | 04.04.2017 | ||
NO | 04.04.2017 | ||
GR | 05.04.2017 | ||
IS | 04.05.2017 | ||
PT | 04.05.2017 | ||
Former [2017/49] | CZ | 04.01.2017 | |
EE | 04.01.2017 | ||
ES | 04.01.2017 | ||
FI | 04.01.2017 | ||
HR | 04.01.2017 | ||
IT | 04.01.2017 | ||
LT | 04.01.2017 | ||
LV | 04.01.2017 | ||
NL | 04.01.2017 | ||
PL | 04.01.2017 | ||
RO | 04.01.2017 | ||
RS | 04.01.2017 | ||
SE | 04.01.2017 | ||
SK | 04.01.2017 | ||
BG | 04.04.2017 | ||
NO | 04.04.2017 | ||
GR | 05.04.2017 | ||
IS | 04.05.2017 | ||
PT | 04.05.2017 | ||
Former [2017/48] | CZ | 04.01.2017 | |
ES | 04.01.2017 | ||
FI | 04.01.2017 | ||
HR | 04.01.2017 | ||
LT | 04.01.2017 | ||
LV | 04.01.2017 | ||
NL | 04.01.2017 | ||
PL | 04.01.2017 | ||
RS | 04.01.2017 | ||
SE | 04.01.2017 | ||
BG | 04.04.2017 | ||
NO | 04.04.2017 | ||
GR | 05.04.2017 | ||
IS | 04.05.2017 | ||
PT | 04.05.2017 | ||
Former [2017/40] | ES | 04.01.2017 | |
FI | 04.01.2017 | ||
HR | 04.01.2017 | ||
LT | 04.01.2017 | ||
LV | 04.01.2017 | ||
NL | 04.01.2017 | ||
PL | 04.01.2017 | ||
RS | 04.01.2017 | ||
SE | 04.01.2017 | ||
BG | 04.04.2017 | ||
NO | 04.04.2017 | ||
GR | 05.04.2017 | ||
IS | 04.05.2017 | ||
PT | 04.05.2017 | Documents cited: | Search | [XAYI]EP1782720 (PACKCENTER SRL [IT]) [X] 1-3,5,7 * paragraphs [0013] , [0014] , [0032] - [0036]; figures 1,7,8,17 * [A] 14 [Y] 6,8,9 [I] 4,10-13; | [XA]US2186998 (ROSE STEIN) [X] 1,2,11-15 * the whole document * [A] 7,10; | [Y]DE202006014440U (ILLBRUCK SANITAERTECHNIK GMBH [DE]) [Y] 6,8,9 * figures 5,6 *; | [A]DE29501998U (VIEGENER II FA FRANZ [DE]) [A] 13-16 * figure 1 * |