EP2584584 - Method for adjusting a STEM equipped with an aberration corrector [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 21.03.2014 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 21.03.2014 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 23.04.2014 [2014/17] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states FEI Company 5350 NE Dawson Creek Drive Hillsboro, OR 97124-5793 / US | [2013/17] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Bischoff, Maarten Jan van Oortstraat 14 5401 BW Uden / NL | 02 /
Rieger, Bernd Maerten Trompstraat 22 2628 RE Delft / NL | [2013/17] | Representative(s) | Bakker, Hendrik FEI Company Patent Department P.O. Box 1745 5602 BS Eindhoven / NL | [N/P] |
Former [2013/17] | Bakker, Hendrik FEI Company Patent Department P.O. Box 1745 5602 BS Eindhoven / NL | Application number, filing date | 11185734.8 | 19.10.2011 | [2013/17] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2584584 | Date: | 24.04.2013 | Language: | EN | [2013/17] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 17.07.2012 | Classification | IPC: | H01J37/153, H01J37/20, H01J37/26, H01J37/28 | [2013/17] | CPC: |
H01J37/153 (EP,US);
H01J37/22 (US);
H01J37/20 (EP,US);
H01J37/265 (EP,US);
H01J37/28 (EP,US);
G01N23/20 (US);
H01J2237/1532 (EP,US);
H01J2237/1534 (EP,US);
H01J2237/216 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2013/17] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | Verfahren zur Einstellung eines STEM mit Aberrationskorrektor | [2013/17] | English: | Method for adjusting a STEM equipped with an aberration corrector | [2013/17] | French: | Procédé d'ajustement d'un METB équipé d'un correcteur d'aberrations | [2013/17] | Examination procedure | 25.10.2013 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2014/17] | 02.12.2013 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [2014/17] | Fees paid | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.10.2013 | 03   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [AD] - ANDREW R. LUPINI ET AL, "Rapid autotuning for crystalline specimens from an inline hologram", JOURNAL OF ELECTRON MICROSCOPY, (20081106), vol. 57, no. 6, doi:10.1093/jmicro/dfn022, pages 195 - 201, XP055022082 [AD] 1 * abstract * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1093/jmicro/dfn022 | [A] - NORIO BABA ET AL, "An auto-tuning method for focusing and astigmatism correction in HAADF-STEM, based on the image contrast transfer function", JOURNAL OF ELECTRON MICROSCOPY, (20010101), vol. 50, no. 3, doi:10.1093/jmicro/50.3.163, ISSN 0022-0744, pages 163 - 176, XP055022096 [A] 1 * abstract * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1093/jmicro/50.3.163 | by applicant | US6552340 | US7060986 | - A.R. LUPINI ET AL., "Rapid autotuning for crystalline specimens", JOURNAL OF ELECTRON MICROSCOPY, (2008), vol. 57, no. 6, doi:doi:10.1093/jmicro/dfn022, pages 15 - 201, XP055022082 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1093/jmicro/dfn022 | - S. UHLEMANN ET AL., "Residual wave aberrations in the first spherical corrected transmission electron microscope", ULTRAMICROSCOPY, (1998), vol. 72, pages 109 - 119 |