EP2447778 - Gantry apparatus [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 22.11.2019 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 12.02.2019 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 17.11.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 22.11.2019 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 25.12.2019 [2019/52] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd. 129, Samsung-ro Yeongtong-gu Suwon-si, Gyeonggi-do, 443-742 / KR | [2012/39] |
Former [2012/18] | For all designated states Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd 416 Maetan-Dong, Yeongtong-Gu, Suwon-Si Gyeonggi-Do 443-742 / KR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Hong, Sang Joon 407-1501, Jugong-4th Apt., Wooman-1-dong Paldal-gu, Suwon-si Gyeonggi-do / KR | 02 /
Kim, Oui Serg 205-702, Pangyowon Maeul, Pangyo-dong, Bundang-gu Seongnam-si Gyeonggi-do / KR | 03 /
Park, Sang Hyun 212-1406, Pos-hometown Apt., Bojeong-dong Giheung-gu, Yongin-si Gyeonggi-do / KR | 04 /
Hamelinck, Roger Franciscus Mattheus Maria p/a TNO Science and Industry Stieltjesweg 1 2628 CK Delft / NL | [2012/18] | Representative(s) | Grootscholten, Johannes A.M., et al Arnold & Siedsma Bezuidenhoutseweg 57 2594 AC The Hague / NL | [N/P] |
Former [2012/18] | Grootscholten, Johannes A.M., et al Arnold & Siedsma Sweelinckplein 1 2517 GK Den Haag / NL | Application number, filing date | 11185764.5 | 19.10.2011 | [2012/18] | Priority number, date | KR20100104962 | 26.10.2010 Original published format: KR 20100104962 | [2012/18] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2447778 | Date: | 02.05.2012 | Language: | EN | [2012/18] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP2447778 | Date: | 02.08.2017 | Language: | EN | [2017/31] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 29.06.2017 | Classification | IPC: | G03F7/20 | [2012/18] | CPC: |
G03F7/70391 (EP,KR,US);
H01J9/42 (KR);
F16H21/44 (KR,US);
Y10T74/18888 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2017/51] |
Former [2012/18] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | Brückenvorrichtung | [2012/18] | English: | Gantry apparatus | [2012/18] | French: | Portique | [2012/18] | Examination procedure | 19.10.2011 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 09.11.2017 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 09.11.2017 | Examination requested [2017/51] | 13.02.2019 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 25.06.2019 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2019/52] | 31.07.2019 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time [2019/52] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 13.02.2019 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 24.10.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 23.10.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 26.10.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 25.10.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 23.10.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 26.10.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US5147600 (KADONO HIROAKI [JP], et al) [A] 1* figure 1 *; | [A]EP1416500 (KOREA ATOMIC ENERGY RES [KR], et al) [A] 1 * figure 5 *; | [A]EP1569035 (ASML NETHERLANDS BV [NL]) [A] 1-12 * paragraphs [0052] , [0063] - [0066]; figures 1,3,5; claims 1-4 *; | [A]US2006244943 (OPOWER HANS [DE], et al) [A] 1,2,11,12 * paragraphs [0004] , [0036] - [0038] - [0047] - [0049]; figures 1,3,4,5 *; | [XAI]CN2906657Y (CHENGDU TECHO PHOTOELECTRICITY [CN]) [X] 1,2 * abstract * * paragraphs [0001] , [0021]; figures 1,2,13 * [A] 3-9 [I] 10-12; | [A]US2009002669 (LIU RONG [US], et al) [A] 1-12 * figure 2 *; | [A] - VOLKEL R ET AL, "Microlens Lithography and Smart Masks", MICROELECTRONIC ENGINEERING, ELSEVIER PUBLISHERS BV., AMSTERDAM, NL, (19970201), vol. 35, no. 1, doi:10.1016/S0167-9317(96)00199-2, ISSN 0167-9317, pages 513 - 516, XP004054112 [A] 1-12 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/S0167-9317(96)00199-2 |