EP2583917 - Substrate transmission apparatus [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 21.06.2013 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 21.06.2013 | Withdrawal of application | published on 24.07.2013 [2013/30] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Gintech Energy Corporation No. 21, Kebei 1st Rd. Jhunan Township, Miaoli County 350 / TW | [2013/17] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Liu, Kuo-Chung No. 21, Kebei 1st Rd. Jhunan Township 350 Miaoli County / TW | 02 /
Lee, Chih-Chung No. 21, Kebei 1st Rd. Jhunan Township 350 Miaoli County / TW | 03 /
Chien, Peng-Sheng No. 21, Kebei 1st Rd. Jhunan Township 350 Miaoli County / TW | [2013/17] | Representative(s) | Granleese, Rhian Jane Marks & Clerk LLP 15 Fetter Lane London EC4A 1BW / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2013/17] | Granleese, Rhian Jane Marks & Clerk LLP 90 Long Acre London WC2E 9RA / GB | Application number, filing date | 11185938.5 | 20.10.2011 | [2013/17] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2583917 | Date: | 24.04.2013 | Language: | EN | [2013/17] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 20.03.2012 | Classification | IPC: | B65G37/00, B65G39/02, B65G39/04 | [2013/17] | CPC: |
B65G37/005 (EP);
B65G39/02 (EP);
B65G39/04 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2013/17] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | Substratübertragungsvorrichtung | [2013/17] | English: | Substrate transmission apparatus | [2013/17] | French: | Appareil de transmission de substrat | [2013/17] | Examination procedure | 20.10.2011 | Examination requested [2013/17] | 13.06.2013 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2013/30] |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XY]KR20110080829 (SEMES CO LTD [KR]) [X] 1,4-10 * paragraph [0032] - paragraph [0052] * * figures 1-6 * [Y] 2,3; | [Y]GB1053516 (LAKE, LESLIE THOMAS) [Y] 2,3 * page 2, line 8 - line 17 *; | [A]KR20110058012 (SEMES CO LTD [KR]) [A] 1,6-10 * the whole document *; | [A]KR20100096434 (SNT CO LTD [KR]) [A] 1 * the whole document * |