EP2587052 - Wind turbine with cooling system [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 12.07.2013 Database last updated on 03.08.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.07.2013 | Withdrawal of application | published on 14.08.2013 [2013/33] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states EWT IP B.V. Computerweg 1F 3821 AA Amersfoort / NL | [2013/18] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Smeenk, Coenraad Louis Oudegracht 273-G 3511 NN Utrecht / NL | 02 /
Van Den Brink, Alfred Computerweg 1F 3821 AA Amersfoort / NL | [2013/18] | Representative(s) | Nederlandsch Octrooibureau P.O. Box 29720 2502 LS The Hague / NL | [2013/28] |
Former [2013/18] | Swinkels, Bart Willem Nederlandsch Octrooibureau J. W. Frisolaan 13 2517 JS Den Haag / NL | Application number, filing date | 11186535.8 | 25.10.2011 | [2013/18] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2587052 | Date: | 01.05.2013 | Language: | EN | [2013/18] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 26.03.2012 | Classification | IPC: | F03D11/00, F03D1/06 | [2013/18] | CPC: |
F03D1/0658 (EP);
F03D80/60 (EP,US);
F05B2220/7066 (EP);
F05B2260/64 (EP);
Y02E10/72 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2013/18] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | Windturbine mit einem Kühlsystem | [2013/18] | English: | Wind turbine with cooling system | [2013/18] | French: | Eolienne avec un système de refroidissement | [2013/18] | Examination procedure | 11.07.2013 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2013/33] |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XY]US6676122 (WOBBEN ALOYS [DE]) [X] 1-4,9,11,15 * figure 3 * * column 3, line 2 - column 4, line 45 * [Y] 5-8,10,12-14; | [YA]WO2004016945 (SIEMENS AG [DE], et al) [Y] 10 * figure - * * page 6, line 19 - page 7, line 8 * [A] 8,9; | [Y]EP1788239 (GEN ELECTRIC [US]) [Y] 5-7,12-14 * figure 2 * * paragraph [0012] *; | [I]EP2136077 (ROLIC INVEST SARL [LU]) [I] 1,4,5,8-10,15 * figures 1, 4 * * paragraphs [0019] , [ 0020] *; | [A]WO2010040659 (WOBBEN ALOYS [DE], et al) [A] 8,9 * figure 18 ** page 18, line 24 - page 19, line 29 *; | [XY]US2011241353 (NUMAJIRI TOMOHIRO [JP]) [X] 1 * figure 2 * * paragraph [0040] * [Y] 8 | by applicant | WO2010079638 |