EP2455567 - Covering for a hinge of a window, door or similar [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 20.11.2020 Database last updated on 15.07.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 16.12.2016 | Most recent event Tooltip | 20.11.2020 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 23.12.2020 [2020/52] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Roto Frank Fenster- und Türtechnologie GmbH Wilhelm-Frank-Platz 1 70771 Leinfelden-Echterdingen / DE | [2019/28] |
Former [2012/21] | For all designated states Roto Frank AG Wilhelm-Frank-Platz 1 70771 Leinfelden-Echterdingen / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Egresits, Arpad IV. László király Strasse 8 9400 Sopron / HU | [2012/21] | Representative(s) | Kohler Schmid Möbus Patentanwälte Partnerschaftsgesellschaft mbB Gropiusplatz 10 70563 Stuttgart / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2012/21] | Kohler Schmid Möbus Patentanwälte Ruppmannstraße 27 70565 Stuttgart / DE | Application number, filing date | 11186736.2 | 26.10.2011 | [2012/21] | Priority number, date | DE20101061803 | 23.11.2010 Original published format: DE102010061803 | [2012/21] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2455567 | Date: | 23.05.2012 | Language: | DE | [2012/21] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP2455567 | Date: | 10.09.2014 | Language: | DE | [2014/37] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 07.08.2014 | Classification | IPC: | E05D11/00, E05D5/12, // E05D3/02 | [2014/37] | CPC: |
E05D11/0054 (EP);
E05D5/128 (EP);
E05D15/5205 (EP);
E05D2003/027 (EP);
E05Y2600/53 (EP);
E05Y2600/56 (EP);
|
Former IPC [2012/21] | E05D11/00 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2012/21] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | Abdeckung für ein Band eines Fensters, einer Tür oder dergleichen | [2012/21] | English: | Covering for a hinge of a window, door or similar | [2012/21] | French: | Recouvrement pour une charnière de fenêtre, de porte ou analogue | [2012/21] | Examination procedure | 25.10.2014 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 25.10.2014 | Examination requested [2014/49] | 19.12.2016 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 24.03.2017 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 18.03.2020 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 29.07.2020 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2020/52] | 18.08.2020 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2020/52] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 19.12.2016 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 26.10.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 24.10.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.10.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 27.10.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 25.10.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 24.10.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 24.10.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 09 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XAI]DE7531392U (PUCHTLER, FRIEDRICH) [X] 1,3,4 * page 6, line 13 - page 9, line 11; figures 1-6 * [A] 5-7 [I] 2,8-10; | [XAI]EP1508662 (STEINBACH & VOLLMANN [DE]) [X] 1,3 * paragraph [0012] - paragraph [0018]; figures 1-5 * [A] 4-7 [I] 2,9,10; | [A]DE102007043757 (SCHUERING GMBH & CO FENSTER TE [DE]) [A] 10 * paragraph [0068]; figures 10,13-15 *; | [A]DE7713654U (WILH. FRANK GMBH) [A] 1-10 * the whole document * |