EP2448003 - Conductive paste comprising a conductive powder and a metallic glass for forming a solar cell electrode [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been refused Status updated on 19.10.2018 Database last updated on 15.06.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.10.2018 | Refusal of application | published on 21.11.2018 [2018/47] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd. 129, Samsung-ro Yeongtong-gu Suwon-si, Gyeonggi-do, 443-742 / KR | For all designated states Industry-Academic Cooperation Foundation, Yonsei University 134, Sinchon-dong Seodaemun-gu Seoul 120-749 / KR | [2012/39] |
Former [2012/18] | For all designated states Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd. 416, Maetan-Dong Yeongtong-Gu Suwon-si Gyeonggi-Do 442-742 / KR | ||
For all designated states Industry-Academic Cooperation Foundation, Yonsei University 134, Sinchon-dong Seodaemun-gu Seoul 120-749 / KR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Kim, Se Yun 102-604, Lucky Apt. Daehyeon-dong Seodaemun-gu Seoul / KR | 02 /
Lee, Eun Sung 413-58, Yeonhui 1-dong Seodaemun-gu Seoul / KR | 03 /
Jee, Sang Soo Supsok Maeul Moamiredo 1 Danji Apt., Neung-dong Hwaseong-si Gyeonggi-do / KR | 04 /
Song, In Yong 531-602, Sinan Apt. Yeongtong-dong Yeongtong-gu, Suwon-si Gyeonggi-do / KR | 05 /
Lee, Sang Mock Hyundai Morningside 2-cha Apt., 103-401, Bora-ri Giheung-eup, Yongin-si Gyeonggi-do / KR | 06 /
Kim, Do-Hyang 1001, Gongjak Villat 1029-1, Bangbae-dong Seocho-gu 137-060 Seoul / KR | 07 /
Lim, Ka Ram 3-101, Dodo Villa 607-11, Mok 3-dong Yangcheon-gu Seoul / KR | [2012/18] | Representative(s) | Portch, Daniel, et al Elkington and Fife LLP Prospect House 8 Pembroke Road Sevenoaks, Kent TN13 1XR / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2012/18] | Greene, Simon Kenneth Elkington and Fife LLP 8 Pembroke Road Sevenoaks Kent TN13 1XR / GB | Application number, filing date | 11186756.0 | 26.10.2011 | [2012/18] | Priority number, date | KR20100105204 | 27.10.2010 Original published format: KR 20100105204 | KR20110074688 | 27.07.2011 Original published format: KR 20110074688 | [2012/18] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2448003 | Date: | 02.05.2012 | Language: | EN | [2012/18] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP2448003 | Date: | 08.08.2012 | Language: | EN | [2012/32] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 06.07.2012 | Classification | IPC: | H01L31/0224, H01B1/22, C22C1/04, B22F1/00, // C22C45/00, C22C45/10 | [2012/18] | CPC: |
H01B1/22 (EP,US);
B22F1/10 (EP,US);
B23K35/001 (EP,US);
B23K35/0244 (EP,US);
B23K35/3006 (EP,US);
B23K35/3013 (EP,US);
B23K35/302 (EP,US);
B23K35/3033 (EP,US);
C22C1/11 (EP,US);
C22C16/00 (EP,US);
C22C30/00 (EP,US);
C22C30/02 (EP,US);
C22C45/001 (EP,US);
C22C45/10 (EP,US);
C22C9/00 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2012/18] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | Leitfähige Paste enthaltend ein leitfähiges Pulver und ein metallisches Glas zur Herstellung einer Solarzellenelektrode | [2012/18] | English: | Conductive paste comprising a conductive powder and a metallic glass for forming a solar cell electrode | [2012/18] | French: | Pâte conductrice contenant un poudre conducteur et un verre métallique pour la formation d'une électrode de cellule solaire | [2012/18] | Examination procedure | 30.03.2012 | Examination requested [2012/20] | 07.02.2013 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 11.02.2014 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 28.05.2014 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 20.06.2018 | Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 22.06.2018 | 22.06.2018 | Date of oral proceedings (cancelled) | 04.07.2018 | Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination [2018/47] | 14.07.2018 | Application refused, date of legal effect [2018/47] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 11.02.2014 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.10.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.10.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 02.11.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 31.10.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 02.11.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]EP1039568 (CANON KK [JP]) [X] 1,9,10,12 * paragraph [0051] * * paragraph [0066] - paragraph [0068] * * paragraph [0078] * * paragraph [0112] * * figure 1(b) *; | [A]KR20050087249 (SAMSUNG SDI CO LTD [KR]) [A] 1-4,9-13 * the whole document *; | [Y]US2005211340 (KIM YU CHAN [KR], et al) [Y] 7,8 * the whole document *; | [X]US2009250106 (HAYASHI TOSHIHARU [JP], et al) [X] 1-3,9,12-15 * paragraph [0002] * * paragraph [0023] - paragraph [0024] * * paragraph [0097] - paragraph [0099] * * paragraph [0109] - paragraph [0112] * * paragraph [0132] * * paragraph [0152] - paragraph [0153] * * paragraph [0171] - paragraph [0175] * * paragraph [0185] - paragraph [0186] * * tables 1, 3, examples A11, A12 * * tables 2, 4, example A27, comparative examples A11, A12 * * table 7, examples B41, B42 * * table 16, examples C22, C28, C31 *; | [X]US2010096014 (IIDA HIDEYO [JP], et al) [X] 1-4,9-15 * the whole document *; | [X]US2010098840 (DU CHEN-HSUN [TW], et al) [X] 12-15 * the whole document *; | [A]JP2010133021 (TOPY IND) [A] 1-6 * paragraph [0028] * * paragraph [0034] * * paragraph [0045] *; | [X]JP2010199196 (MITSUBISHI MATERIALS CORP) [X] 1-3,9,12-15 * paragraph [0001] * * paragraph [0015] * * paragraph [0031] * * paragraph [0045] - paragraph [0046] * * paragraph [0054] * * table 1, entries 15-16 * * table 3, entries 15-16 *; | [XPY]EP2325848 (SAMSUNG ELECTRONICS CO LTD [KR]) [XP] 1-6,9-15 * the whole document * [Y] 7,8; | [E]EP2416327 (SAMSUNG ELECTRONICS CO LTD [KR], et al) [E] 1-4,9-15 * the whole document *; | [E]EP2450908 (SAMSUNG ELECTRONICS CO LTD [KR]) [E] 1-6,9-15 * the whole document *; | [XPYI] - KIM S Y ET AL, "Replacement of oxide glass with metallic glass for Ag screen printing metallization on Si emitter", APPLIED PHYSICS LETTERS, AIP, AMERICAN INSTITUTE OF PHYSICS, MELVILLE, NY, US, (20110603), vol. 98, no. 22, doi:10.1063/1.3596469, ISSN 0003-6951, pages 222112-1 - 222112-3, XP012140883 [XP] 1-6,9,10,12-15 * the whole document * [Y] 7,8 [I] 11 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1063/1.3596469 | [XPY] - KIM S J ET AL, "Silver/metallic glass paste for shallow emitter Si-solar cell", 26TH EUROPEAN PHOTOVOLTAIC SOLAR ENERGY CONFERENCE AND EXHIBITION, 5-9 SEPTEMBER 2011, (2011), doi:10.4229/26THEUPVSEC2011-1DV.2.35, pages 492 - 494, XP009160654 [XP] 1-4,9,10,12-15 * the whole document * [Y] 5-8 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.4229/26thEUPVSEC2011-1DV.2.35 | [YA] - LEE S-W ET AL, "Design of a bulk amorphous alloy containing Cu-Zr with simultaneous improvement in glass-forming ability and plasticity", JOURNAL OF MATERIALS RESEARCH, (200702), vol. 22, no. 02, doi:10.1557/jmr.2007.0063, ISSN 0884-2914, pages 486 - 492, XP055031306 [Y] 7,8 * the whole document * [A] 1-6,9-15 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1557/jmr.2007.0063 | [Y] - KIM Y C ET AL, "Enhanced glass forming ability and mechanical properties of new Cu-based bulk metallic glasses", MATERIALS SCIENCE AND ENGINEERING A: STRUCTURAL MATERIALS: PROPERTIES, MICROSTRUCTURE & PROCESSING, LAUSANNE, CH, (20061115), vol. 437, no. 2, doi:10.1016/J.MSEA.2006.07.141, ISSN 0921-5093, pages 248 - 253, XP027953056 [Y] 5-8 * the whole document * | [A] - NEUHAUS D-H ET AL, "Industrial Silicon Wafer Solar Cells", ADVANCES IN OPTOELECTRONICS, (2007), vol. 2007, doi:10.1155/2007/24521, ISSN 1687-563X, XP055031298 [A] 1-15 * section 2.5 "Screen printing of the front contact" * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1155/2007/24521 | [A] - BASHEV V F ET AL, "Crystallization of Al-Ni alloys during rapid cooling", RUSSIAN METALLURGY, ALLERTON PRESS, INC, (1989), no. 6, ISSN 0036-0295, pages 51 - 54, XP009160582 [A] 1-4,9-15 * the whole document * | [A] - IVANOV E ET AL, "Synthesis of nickel aluminides by mechanical alloying", MATERIALS LETTERS, NORTH HOLLAND PUBLISHING COMPANY. AMSTERDAM, NL, (198808), vol. 7, no. 1-2, doi:10.1016/0167-577X(88)90081-X, ISSN 0167-577X, pages 51 - 54, XP024149792 [A] 1-4,9-15 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/0167-577X(88)90081-X | [A] - GORSHKOV N N ET AL, "Explosive compaction of amorphous Cu-Sn powder prepared by the method of mechanical alloying", COMBUSTION, EXPLOSION, AND SHOCK WAVES, (1989), vol. 25, no. 2, doi:10.1007/BF00742023, pages 244 - 247, XP009155964 [A] 1-3,9-15 * page 244, first paragraph - page 245, first paragraph * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1007/BF00742023 | [A] - SALKAR R A ET AL, "The sonochemical preparation of amorphous silver nanoparticles", JOURNAL OF MATERIALS CHEMISTRY, (1999), vol. 9, no. 6, doi:10.1039/a900568d, ISSN 0959-9428, pages 1333 - 1335, XP055017952 [A] 1-3,9,12-15 * section "Preparation of silver nanoparticles" * * section "Results and discussion", first paragraph * * figures 1-3 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1039/a900568d | [A] - "Amorphous metal", Wikipedia, (20101021), URL: http://en.wikipedia.org/w/index.php?title=Amorphous_metal&oldid=392080524, (20120130), XP055017848 [A] 1-15 * page 1, first paragraph * | [A] - LIM S S ET AL, "Assessment of the Al-Ag Binary Phase Diagram", CALPHAD, (1995), vol. 19, no. 2, doi:10.1016/0364-5916(95)00014-6, ISSN 0364-5916, pages 131 - 141, XP055017954 [A] 1-15 * figures 1,3,5,6,7 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/0364-5916(95)00014-6 | [A] - OH C-S ET AL, "A thermodynamic study on the Ag-Sb-Sn system", JOURNAL OF ALLOYS AND COMPOUNDS, ELSEVIER SEQUOIA, LAUSANNE, CH, (19960501), vol. 238, doi:10.1016/0925-8388(95)02191-4, ISSN 0925-8388, pages 155 - 166, XP004080478 [A] 1-3,9-15 * figures 5,8 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/0925-8388(95)02191-4 | [A] - BAREN M R, "Ag-In (Silver-Indium)", BAREN M R, White C E T, Okamoto H (Editors), Phase Diagrams of Indium Alloys and Their Engineering Applications, Materials Park, ASM International, (1992), pages 15 - 19, ISBN 978-0-87170-438-2, XP008098250 [A] 1-3,9,12-15 * table 4 * * figure 1 * | [A] - WANG X D ET AL, "Atomic structure and glass forming ability of Cu46Zr46Al8 bulk metallic glass", JOURNAL OF APPLIED PHYSICS, AMERICAN INSTITUTE OF PHYSICS. NEW YORK, US, (20081107), vol. 104, no. 9, doi:10.1063/1.3009320, ISSN 0021-8979, pages 093519-1 - 093519-5, XP012118047 [A] 5,6,12-15 * figure 1 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1063/1.3009320 | [A] - WANG Q ET AL, "Cluster line criterion and Cu-Zr-Al bulk metallic glass formation", MATERIALS SCIENCE AND ENGINEERING A: STRUCTURAL MATERIALS: PROPERTIES, MICROSTRUCTURE & PROCESSING, LAUSANNE, CH, (20070319), vol. 449-451, doi:10.1016/J.MSEA.2006.02.271, ISSN 0921-5093, pages 18 - 23, XP005914563 [A] 5,6,12-15 * table 2, line 9 * * figure 4 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.msea.2006.02.271 | [A] - "Electrical resitivity of pure metals", CRC Handbook of Chemistry and Physics, 77th edition, Boca Raton, New York, London, Tokyo, CRC Press, (1996), pages 12-40 - 12-42, ISBN 0-8493-0477-6, XP002668350 [A] 9 * the whole document * | [A] - Metallurgy Division of the Materials Science and Engineering Laboratory of NIST, "Ag-Cu-Sn System", (20100805), URL: http://web.archive.org/web/20100805072225/http://www.metallurgy.nist.gov/phase/solder/agcusn.html, (20120628), XP055031251 [A] 14,15 * figure "Calculated Liquidus Projection" * |