EP2434370 - Methods and systems for power management in a data processing system [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been refused Status updated on 02.04.2022 Database last updated on 23.04.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 15.09.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 02.04.2022 | Refusal of application | published on 04.05.2022 [2022/18] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Apple Inc. One Apple Park Way Cupertino CA 95014 / US | [2018/31] |
Former [2012/13] | For all designated states Apple Inc. 1 Infinite Loop Cupertino, CA 95014 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
De Cesare, Joshua 678 Regas Drive Campbell, CA 95008 / US | 02 /
Semeria, Bernard 678 Florales Drive Palo Alto, CA 96306 / US | 03 /
Smith, Michael 475 E. McKinley Avenue Sunnyvale, CA 94086 / US | [2012/13] | Representative(s) | Barton, Russell Glen Withers & Rogers LLP 2 London Bridge London SE1 9RA / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2012/13] | Barton, Russell Glen Withers & Rogers LLP 4 More London Riverside London SE1 2AU / GB | Application number, filing date | 11187173.7 | 18.12.2007 | [2012/13] | Priority number, date | US20070620703 | 07.01.2007 Original published format: US 620703 | [2012/13] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2434370 | Date: | 28.03.2012 | Language: | EN | [2012/13] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP2434370 | Date: | 05.08.2015 | Language: | EN | [2015/32] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 07.07.2015 | Classification | IPC: | G06F1/32 | [2012/13] | CPC: |
G06F1/3203 (EP,US);
G06F1/324 (US);
G06F1/3237 (EP,US);
G06F1/3287 (EP,US);
Y02D10/00 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2012/13] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RS | Not yet paid | Title | German: | Verfahren und Systeme zur Stromverwaltung in einem Datenverarbeitungssystem | [2012/13] | English: | Methods and systems for power management in a data processing system | [2012/13] | French: | Procédés et systèmes pour la gestion de la puissance dans un système de traitement de données | [2012/13] | Examination procedure | 28.10.2011 | Examination requested [2012/13] | 05.02.2016 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 15.09.2017 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 14.03.2018 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 16.04.2020 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M05) | 24.09.2020 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 01.12.2021 | Application refused, date of legal effect [2022/18] | 01.12.2021 | Date of oral proceedings | 14.12.2021 | Minutes of oral proceedings despatched | 15.12.2021 | Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination [2022/18] | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP07863051.4 / EP2115550 | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued (EP20070863051) is 28.10.2009 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.10.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 28.10.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 15.02.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 11.12.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 12.12.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 11.12.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 10.12.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 13.12.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 12.12.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | 12.12.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 12 | 13.12.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 13 | 14.12.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 14 | 10.11.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 15 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]JP2001188628 (NEC CORP) [A] 1-19* the whole document *; | [A]EP1164460 (ACCESS CO LTD [JP]) [A] 1-19 * the whole document *; | [A]EP1282030 (MITSUBISHI ELECTRIC CORP [JP]) [A] 1-19 * the whole document *; | [A]US2003177402 (PIAZZA WILLIAM JOSEPH [US]) [A] 1-19 * the whole document *; | [I]EP1503271 (SONY COMPUTER ENTERTAINMENT INC [JP]) [I] 1-19 * paragraphs [0013] - [0053]; figures 1-6 *; | [A]US2006031692 (KATO KAZUOMI [JP], et al) [A] 1-19 * the whole document *; | [A]US2006031704 (HAYASHI HIROO [US]) [A] 1-19 * the whole document *; | [I]EP1739523 (SEIKO EPSON CORP [JP]) [I] 1-19 * paragraphs [0002] , [0003] , [0007] , [0012] , [0044] - [0102]; figures 1-9c * | by applicant | US2003095096 | US2004224638 | US20060586862 |