EP2586394 - Skullcap attaching device [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 19.05.2017 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.10.2018 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): AL | published on 14.11.2018 [2018/46] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states PINA Medizintechnik Vertriebs AG Ebringerstrasse 161 8240 Thayngen / CH | [2016/28] |
Former [2013/33] | For all designated states PINA-Medizintechnik-Vertriebs AG Ebringerstrasse 161 8240 Thayngen / CH | ||
Former [2013/18] | For all designated states PINA-Medizintechnik-Vertriebs AG Langrietstrasse 17A 8212 Neuhausen am Rheinfall / CH | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Piotrowski, Carmen Rietstrasse 90 8200 Schaffhausen / CH | [2013/18] | Representative(s) | Dr. Graf & Partner AG Intellectual Property Friedtalweg 5 9500 Wil / SG / CH | [N/P] |
Former [2016/28] | Dr. Graf & Partner AG Intellectual Property Herrenacker 15 Postfach 518 8201 Schaffhausen / CH | ||
Former [2013/18] | Dr. Graf & Partner AG Intellectual Property Herrenacker 15 Postfach 518 8201 Schaffhausen / CH | Application number, filing date | 11187209.9 | 28.10.2011 | [2013/18] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2586394 | Date: | 01.05.2013 | Language: | DE | [2013/18] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2586394 | Date: | 13.07.2016 | Language: | DE | [2016/28] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 14.03.2012 | Classification | IPC: | A61B17/88, A61B17/68 | [2013/18] | CPC: |
A61B17/688 (EP,US);
A61B17/8869 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2016/28] |
Former [2013/18] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Title | German: | Schädeldeckelfixierungsvorrichtung | [2013/18] | English: | Skullcap attaching device | [2013/18] | French: | Dispositif de fixation de la boîte crânienne | [2013/18] | Examination procedure | 04.11.2013 | Examination requested [2013/50] | 14.02.2014 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 25.03.2014 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 06.10.2014 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 21.01.2015 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 27.08.2015 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time | 26.10.2015 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 17.02.2016 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 06.06.2016 | Fee for grant paid | 06.06.2016 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 06.06.2016 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 25.03.2014 | Opposition(s) | 18.04.2017 | No opposition filed within time limit [2017/25] | Request for further processing for: | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to reply to the examination report | 26.10.2015 | Request for further processing filed | 26.10.2015 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 04.11.2015 | Decision despatched | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to reply to the Extended European Search Report/Written Opinion of the International Searching Authority/International Preliminary Examination Report/Supplementary international search report/Supplementary European search report | 14.02.2014 | Request for further processing filed | 14.02.2014 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 24.02.2014 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 24.10.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 23.10.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 30.10.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 28.10.2011 | AL | 13.07.2016 | CY | 13.07.2016 | CZ | 13.07.2016 | DK | 13.07.2016 | EE | 13.07.2016 | FI | 13.07.2016 | HR | 13.07.2016 | IT | 13.07.2016 | LT | 13.07.2016 | LV | 13.07.2016 | MC | 13.07.2016 | MK | 13.07.2016 | MT | 13.07.2016 | NL | 13.07.2016 | PL | 13.07.2016 | RO | 13.07.2016 | RS | 13.07.2016 | SE | 13.07.2016 | SI | 13.07.2016 | SK | 13.07.2016 | SM | 13.07.2016 | TR | 13.07.2016 | BG | 13.10.2016 | NO | 13.10.2016 | GR | 14.10.2016 | GB | 28.10.2016 | IE | 28.10.2016 | LU | 28.10.2016 | BE | 31.10.2016 | FR | 02.11.2016 | IS | 13.11.2016 | PT | 14.11.2016 | [2018/46] |
Former [2018/31] | HU | 28.10.2011 | |
CY | 13.07.2016 | ||
CZ | 13.07.2016 | ||
DK | 13.07.2016 | ||
EE | 13.07.2016 | ||
FI | 13.07.2016 | ||
HR | 13.07.2016 | ||
IT | 13.07.2016 | ||
LT | 13.07.2016 | ||
LV | 13.07.2016 | ||
MC | 13.07.2016 | ||
MK | 13.07.2016 | ||
MT | 13.07.2016 | ||
NL | 13.07.2016 | ||
PL | 13.07.2016 | ||
RO | 13.07.2016 | ||
RS | 13.07.2016 | ||
SE | 13.07.2016 | ||
SI | 13.07.2016 | ||
SK | 13.07.2016 | ||
SM | 13.07.2016 | ||
TR | 13.07.2016 | ||
BG | 13.10.2016 | ||
NO | 13.10.2016 | ||
GR | 14.10.2016 | ||
GB | 28.10.2016 | ||
IE | 28.10.2016 | ||
LU | 28.10.2016 | ||
BE | 31.10.2016 | ||
FR | 02.11.2016 | ||
IS | 13.11.2016 | ||
PT | 14.11.2016 | ||
Former [2018/29] | HU | 28.10.2011 | |
CY | 13.07.2016 | ||
CZ | 13.07.2016 | ||
DK | 13.07.2016 | ||
EE | 13.07.2016 | ||
FI | 13.07.2016 | ||
HR | 13.07.2016 | ||
IT | 13.07.2016 | ||
LT | 13.07.2016 | ||
LV | 13.07.2016 | ||
MC | 13.07.2016 | ||
MK | 13.07.2016 | ||
NL | 13.07.2016 | ||
PL | 13.07.2016 | ||
RO | 13.07.2016 | ||
RS | 13.07.2016 | ||
SE | 13.07.2016 | ||
SI | 13.07.2016 | ||
SK | 13.07.2016 | ||
SM | 13.07.2016 | ||
TR | 13.07.2016 | ||
BG | 13.10.2016 | ||
NO | 13.10.2016 | ||
GR | 14.10.2016 | ||
GB | 28.10.2016 | ||
IE | 28.10.2016 | ||
LU | 28.10.2016 | ||
BE | 31.10.2016 | ||
FR | 02.11.2016 | ||
IS | 13.11.2016 | ||
PT | 14.11.2016 | ||
Former [2018/28] | HU | 28.10.2011 | |
CY | 13.07.2016 | ||
CZ | 13.07.2016 | ||
DK | 13.07.2016 | ||
EE | 13.07.2016 | ||
FI | 13.07.2016 | ||
HR | 13.07.2016 | ||
IT | 13.07.2016 | ||
LT | 13.07.2016 | ||
LV | 13.07.2016 | ||
MC | 13.07.2016 | ||
MK | 13.07.2016 | ||
NL | 13.07.2016 | ||
PL | 13.07.2016 | ||
RO | 13.07.2016 | ||
RS | 13.07.2016 | ||
SE | 13.07.2016 | ||
SI | 13.07.2016 | ||
SK | 13.07.2016 | ||
SM | 13.07.2016 | ||
BG | 13.10.2016 | ||
NO | 13.10.2016 | ||
GR | 14.10.2016 | ||
GB | 28.10.2016 | ||
IE | 28.10.2016 | ||
LU | 28.10.2016 | ||
BE | 31.10.2016 | ||
FR | 02.11.2016 | ||
IS | 13.11.2016 | ||
PT | 14.11.2016 | ||
Former [2017/51] | CZ | 13.07.2016 | |
DK | 13.07.2016 | ||
EE | 13.07.2016 | ||
FI | 13.07.2016 | ||
HR | 13.07.2016 | ||
IT | 13.07.2016 | ||
LT | 13.07.2016 | ||
LV | 13.07.2016 | ||
NL | 13.07.2016 | ||
PL | 13.07.2016 | ||
RO | 13.07.2016 | ||
RS | 13.07.2016 | ||
SE | 13.07.2016 | ||
SI | 13.07.2016 | ||
SK | 13.07.2016 | ||
SM | 13.07.2016 | ||
BG | 13.10.2016 | ||
NO | 13.10.2016 | ||
GR | 14.10.2016 | ||
GB | 28.10.2016 | ||
IE | 28.10.2016 | ||
LU | 28.10.2016 | ||
BE | 31.10.2016 | ||
FR | 02.11.2016 | ||
IS | 13.11.2016 | ||
PT | 14.11.2016 | ||
Former [2017/42] | CZ | 13.07.2016 | |
DK | 13.07.2016 | ||
EE | 13.07.2016 | ||
FI | 13.07.2016 | ||
HR | 13.07.2016 | ||
IT | 13.07.2016 | ||
LT | 13.07.2016 | ||
LV | 13.07.2016 | ||
NL | 13.07.2016 | ||
PL | 13.07.2016 | ||
RO | 13.07.2016 | ||
RS | 13.07.2016 | ||
SE | 13.07.2016 | ||
SI | 13.07.2016 | ||
SK | 13.07.2016 | ||
SM | 13.07.2016 | ||
BG | 13.10.2016 | ||
NO | 13.10.2016 | ||
GR | 14.10.2016 | ||
GB | 28.10.2016 | ||
LU | 28.10.2016 | ||
BE | 31.10.2016 | ||
FR | 02.11.2016 | ||
IS | 13.11.2016 | ||
PT | 14.11.2016 | ||
Former [2017/37] | CZ | 13.07.2016 | |
DK | 13.07.2016 | ||
EE | 13.07.2016 | ||
FI | 13.07.2016 | ||
HR | 13.07.2016 | ||
IT | 13.07.2016 | ||
LT | 13.07.2016 | ||
LV | 13.07.2016 | ||
NL | 13.07.2016 | ||
PL | 13.07.2016 | ||
RO | 13.07.2016 | ||
RS | 13.07.2016 | ||
SE | 13.07.2016 | ||
SI | 13.07.2016 | ||
SK | 13.07.2016 | ||
SM | 13.07.2016 | ||
BG | 13.10.2016 | ||
NO | 13.10.2016 | ||
GR | 14.10.2016 | ||
GB | 28.10.2016 | ||
BE | 31.10.2016 | ||
FR | 02.11.2016 | ||
IS | 13.11.2016 | ||
PT | 14.11.2016 | ||
Former [2017/34] | CZ | 13.07.2016 | |
DK | 13.07.2016 | ||
EE | 13.07.2016 | ||
FI | 13.07.2016 | ||
HR | 13.07.2016 | ||
IT | 13.07.2016 | ||
LT | 13.07.2016 | ||
LV | 13.07.2016 | ||
NL | 13.07.2016 | ||
PL | 13.07.2016 | ||
RO | 13.07.2016 | ||
RS | 13.07.2016 | ||
SE | 13.07.2016 | ||
SK | 13.07.2016 | ||
SM | 13.07.2016 | ||
BG | 13.10.2016 | ||
NO | 13.10.2016 | ||
GR | 14.10.2016 | ||
GB | 28.10.2016 | ||
BE | 31.10.2016 | ||
FR | 02.11.2016 | ||
IS | 13.11.2016 | ||
PT | 14.11.2016 | ||
Former [2017/31] | CZ | 13.07.2016 | |
DK | 13.07.2016 | ||
EE | 13.07.2016 | ||
FI | 13.07.2016 | ||
HR | 13.07.2016 | ||
IT | 13.07.2016 | ||
LT | 13.07.2016 | ||
LV | 13.07.2016 | ||
NL | 13.07.2016 | ||
PL | 13.07.2016 | ||
RO | 13.07.2016 | ||
RS | 13.07.2016 | ||
SE | 13.07.2016 | ||
SK | 13.07.2016 | ||
SM | 13.07.2016 | ||
BG | 13.10.2016 | ||
NO | 13.10.2016 | ||
GR | 14.10.2016 | ||
BE | 31.10.2016 | ||
IS | 13.11.2016 | ||
PT | 14.11.2016 | ||
Former [2017/13] | FI | 13.07.2016 | |
HR | 13.07.2016 | ||
IT | 13.07.2016 | ||
LT | 13.07.2016 | ||
LV | 13.07.2016 | ||
NL | 13.07.2016 | ||
PL | 13.07.2016 | ||
RS | 13.07.2016 | ||
SE | 13.07.2016 | ||
NO | 13.10.2016 | ||
GR | 14.10.2016 | ||
BE | 31.10.2016 | ||
IS | 13.11.2016 | ||
PT | 14.11.2016 | ||
Former [2017/11] | FI | 13.07.2016 | |
HR | 13.07.2016 | ||
IT | 13.07.2016 | ||
LT | 13.07.2016 | ||
NL | 13.07.2016 | ||
PL | 13.07.2016 | ||
RS | 13.07.2016 | ||
SE | 13.07.2016 | ||
NO | 13.10.2016 | ||
GR | 14.10.2016 | ||
BE | 31.10.2016 | ||
IS | 13.11.2016 | ||
PT | 14.11.2016 | ||
Former [2017/10] | FI | 13.07.2016 | |
HR | 13.07.2016 | ||
IT | 13.07.2016 | ||
LT | 13.07.2016 | ||
NL | 13.07.2016 | ||
PL | 13.07.2016 | ||
RS | 13.07.2016 | ||
SE | 13.07.2016 | ||
NO | 13.10.2016 | ||
BE | 31.10.2016 | ||
IS | 13.11.2016 | ||
Former [2017/09] | FI | 13.07.2016 | |
IT | 13.07.2016 | ||
LT | 13.07.2016 | ||
NL | 13.07.2016 | ||
NO | 13.10.2016 | ||
Former [2017/07] | LT | 13.07.2016 | Documents cited: | Search | [XAY]EP1985248 (PINA MEDIZINTECHNIK VERTRIEBS [CH], et al) [X] 14 * figure 6 * [A] 7 [Y] 1-6,9-13; | [XA]US2002169455 (BANNERMAN BRETT [US], et al) [X] 1-4,8,14,15 * figures 1A, 9A, 10B * [A] 7; | [X]WO0209602 (SYNTHES AG [CH], et al) [X] 1,14 * figure 12 *; | [XY]DE19952359 (AESCULAP AG & CO KG [DE]) [X] 14 * figure 13 * [Y] 1-6,9-13; | [XY]WO2007147057 (UNIV FLORIDA [US], et al) [X] 14 * figure 1D * [Y] 1-6,9-13 | by applicant | EP1985248 |