EP2455312 - Image forming apparatus [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 01.01.2016 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.10.2018 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): AL | published on 14.11.2018 [2018/46] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd. 129, Samsung-ro Yeongtong-gu Suwon-si, Gyeonggi-do, 443-742 / KR | [2015/09] |
Former [2012/38] | For all designated states Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd. 129, Samsung-ro Yeongtong-gu Suwon-si, Gyeonggi-do, 443-742 / KR | ||
Former [2012/21] | For all designated states Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd. 416 Maetan-dong, Yeongtong-gu Suwon-si, Gyeonggi-do / KR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Shin, Dong Hyup 704-301, Jeongdeunmaeul-hanjin-7th Apt. Jeongja-dong, Bundang-gu, Seongnam-si Gyeonggi-do / KR | 02 /
Lee, Seung Kyu 194-4, Yangno-ri, Bibong-myeon, Hwaseong-si Gyeonggi-do / KR | [2012/21] | Representative(s) | Taor, Simon Edward William, et al Venner Shipley LLP 200 Aldersgate London EC1A 4HD / GB | [2013/09] |
Former [2012/21] | Bruce, Alexander Richard Henry, et al Venner Shipley LLP 200 Aldersgate London EC1A 4HD / GB | Application number, filing date | 11187241.2 | 31.10.2011 | [2012/21] | Priority number, date | KR20100114762 | 18.11.2010 Original published format: KR 20100114762 | [2012/21] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2455312 | Date: | 23.05.2012 | Language: | EN | [2012/21] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP2455312 | Date: | 04.12.2013 | Language: | EN | [2013/49] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2455312 | Date: | 25.02.2015 | Language: | EN | [2015/09] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 04.11.2013 | Classification | IPC: | B65H1/26, B65H3/52, B65H3/06, B65H5/06 | [2013/49] | CPC: |
B65H1/266 (EP,US);
B65H3/0607 (EP,US);
B65H3/5215 (EP,US);
B65H3/5223 (EP,US);
B65H5/062 (EP,US);
B65H2403/514 (EP,US);
B65H2403/53 (EP,US);
B65H2404/1442 (EP,US);
B65H2404/1521 (EP,US);
B65H2405/113 (EP,US);
B65H2511/224 (EP,US);
B65H2511/514 (EP,US);
B65H2601/11 (EP,US)
(-)
| C-Set: |
B65H2511/224, B65H2220/08 (US,EP);
B65H2511/514, B65H2220/01, B65H2220/11 (EP,US) |
Former IPC [2012/21] | B65H1/26, B65H3/52 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2012/21] | Title | German: | Bilderzeugungsvorrichtung | [2012/21] | English: | Image forming apparatus | [2012/21] | French: | Appareil de formation d'images | [2012/21] | Examination procedure | 04.06.2014 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 04.06.2014 | Examination requested [2014/29] | 04.09.2014 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 14.01.2015 | Fee for grant paid | 14.01.2015 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 14.01.2015 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 04.09.2014 | Opposition(s) | 26.11.2015 | No opposition filed within time limit [2016/05] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 21.10.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 17.10.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 31.10.2011 | AL | 25.02.2015 | AT | 25.02.2015 | BE | 25.02.2015 | BG | 25.02.2015 | CY | 25.02.2015 | CZ | 25.02.2015 | DK | 25.02.2015 | EE | 25.02.2015 | ES | 25.02.2015 | FI | 25.02.2015 | HR | 25.02.2015 | IT | 25.02.2015 | LT | 25.02.2015 | LV | 25.02.2015 | MC | 25.02.2015 | MK | 25.02.2015 | MT | 25.02.2015 | PL | 25.02.2015 | PT | 25.02.2015 | RO | 25.02.2015 | RS | 25.02.2015 | SE | 25.02.2015 | SI | 25.02.2015 | SK | 25.02.2015 | SM | 25.02.2015 | TR | 25.02.2015 | NO | 25.05.2015 | GR | 26.05.2015 | IS | 25.06.2015 | CH | 31.10.2015 | IE | 31.10.2015 | LI | 31.10.2015 | LU | 31.10.2015 | [2018/46] |
Former [2018/31] | HU | 31.10.2011 | |
AT | 25.02.2015 | ||
BE | 25.02.2015 | ||
BG | 25.02.2015 | ||
CY | 25.02.2015 | ||
CZ | 25.02.2015 | ||
DK | 25.02.2015 | ||
EE | 25.02.2015 | ||
ES | 25.02.2015 | ||
FI | 25.02.2015 | ||
HR | 25.02.2015 | ||
IT | 25.02.2015 | ||
LT | 25.02.2015 | ||
LV | 25.02.2015 | ||
MC | 25.02.2015 | ||
MK | 25.02.2015 | ||
MT | 25.02.2015 | ||
PL | 25.02.2015 | ||
PT | 25.02.2015 | ||
RO | 25.02.2015 | ||
RS | 25.02.2015 | ||
SE | 25.02.2015 | ||
SI | 25.02.2015 | ||
SK | 25.02.2015 | ||
SM | 25.02.2015 | ||
TR | 25.02.2015 | ||
NO | 25.05.2015 | ||
GR | 26.05.2015 | ||
IS | 25.06.2015 | ||
CH | 31.10.2015 | ||
IE | 31.10.2015 | ||
LI | 31.10.2015 | ||
LU | 31.10.2015 | ||
Former [2017/38] | HU | 31.10.2011 | |
AT | 25.02.2015 | ||
BE | 25.02.2015 | ||
BG | 25.02.2015 | ||
CY | 25.02.2015 | ||
CZ | 25.02.2015 | ||
DK | 25.02.2015 | ||
EE | 25.02.2015 | ||
ES | 25.02.2015 | ||
FI | 25.02.2015 | ||
HR | 25.02.2015 | ||
IT | 25.02.2015 | ||
LT | 25.02.2015 | ||
LV | 25.02.2015 | ||
MC | 25.02.2015 | ||
MT | 25.02.2015 | ||
PL | 25.02.2015 | ||
RO | 25.02.2015 | ||
RS | 25.02.2015 | ||
SE | 25.02.2015 | ||
SI | 25.02.2015 | ||
SK | 25.02.2015 | ||
SM | 25.02.2015 | ||
TR | 25.02.2015 | ||
NO | 25.05.2015 | ||
GR | 26.05.2015 | ||
IS | 25.06.2015 | ||
CH | 31.10.2015 | ||
IE | 31.10.2015 | ||
LI | 31.10.2015 | ||
LU | 31.10.2015 | ||
Former [2016/45] | AT | 25.02.2015 | |
BE | 25.02.2015 | ||
CZ | 25.02.2015 | ||
DK | 25.02.2015 | ||
EE | 25.02.2015 | ||
ES | 25.02.2015 | ||
FI | 25.02.2015 | ||
HR | 25.02.2015 | ||
IT | 25.02.2015 | ||
LT | 25.02.2015 | ||
LV | 25.02.2015 | ||
MC | 25.02.2015 | ||
PL | 25.02.2015 | ||
RO | 25.02.2015 | ||
RS | 25.02.2015 | ||
SE | 25.02.2015 | ||
SI | 25.02.2015 | ||
SK | 25.02.2015 | ||
NO | 25.05.2015 | ||
GR | 26.05.2015 | ||
IS | 25.06.2015 | ||
CH | 31.10.2015 | ||
IE | 31.10.2015 | ||
LI | 31.10.2015 | ||
LU | 31.10.2015 | ||
Former [2016/34] | AT | 25.02.2015 | |
BE | 25.02.2015 | ||
CZ | 25.02.2015 | ||
DK | 25.02.2015 | ||
EE | 25.02.2015 | ||
ES | 25.02.2015 | ||
FI | 25.02.2015 | ||
HR | 25.02.2015 | ||
IT | 25.02.2015 | ||
LT | 25.02.2015 | ||
LV | 25.02.2015 | ||
MC | 25.02.2015 | ||
PL | 25.02.2015 | ||
RO | 25.02.2015 | ||
RS | 25.02.2015 | ||
SE | 25.02.2015 | ||
SI | 25.02.2015 | ||
SK | 25.02.2015 | ||
NO | 25.05.2015 | ||
GR | 26.05.2015 | ||
IS | 25.06.2015 | ||
CH | 31.10.2015 | ||
LI | 31.10.2015 | ||
LU | 31.10.2015 | ||
Former [2016/28] | AT | 25.02.2015 | |
BE | 25.02.2015 | ||
CZ | 25.02.2015 | ||
DK | 25.02.2015 | ||
EE | 25.02.2015 | ||
ES | 25.02.2015 | ||
FI | 25.02.2015 | ||
HR | 25.02.2015 | ||
IT | 25.02.2015 | ||
LT | 25.02.2015 | ||
LV | 25.02.2015 | ||
MC | 25.02.2015 | ||
PL | 25.02.2015 | ||
RO | 25.02.2015 | ||
RS | 25.02.2015 | ||
SE | 25.02.2015 | ||
SI | 25.02.2015 | ||
SK | 25.02.2015 | ||
NO | 25.05.2015 | ||
GR | 26.05.2015 | ||
IS | 25.06.2015 | ||
LU | 31.10.2015 | ||
Former [2016/26] | AT | 25.02.2015 | |
BE | 25.02.2015 | ||
CZ | 25.02.2015 | ||
DK | 25.02.2015 | ||
EE | 25.02.2015 | ||
ES | 25.02.2015 | ||
FI | 25.02.2015 | ||
HR | 25.02.2015 | ||
IT | 25.02.2015 | ||
LT | 25.02.2015 | ||
LV | 25.02.2015 | ||
PL | 25.02.2015 | ||
RO | 25.02.2015 | ||
RS | 25.02.2015 | ||
SE | 25.02.2015 | ||
SI | 25.02.2015 | ||
SK | 25.02.2015 | ||
NO | 25.05.2015 | ||
GR | 26.05.2015 | ||
IS | 25.06.2015 | ||
LU | 31.10.2015 | ||
Former [2016/24] | AT | 25.02.2015 | |
BE | 25.02.2015 | ||
CZ | 25.02.2015 | ||
DK | 25.02.2015 | ||
EE | 25.02.2015 | ||
ES | 25.02.2015 | ||
FI | 25.02.2015 | ||
HR | 25.02.2015 | ||
IT | 25.02.2015 | ||
LT | 25.02.2015 | ||
LV | 25.02.2015 | ||
PL | 25.02.2015 | ||
RO | 25.02.2015 | ||
RS | 25.02.2015 | ||
SE | 25.02.2015 | ||
SI | 25.02.2015 | ||
SK | 25.02.2015 | ||
NO | 25.05.2015 | ||
GR | 26.05.2015 | ||
IS | 25.06.2015 | ||
Former [2016/12] | AT | 25.02.2015 | |
CZ | 25.02.2015 | ||
DK | 25.02.2015 | ||
EE | 25.02.2015 | ||
ES | 25.02.2015 | ||
FI | 25.02.2015 | ||
HR | 25.02.2015 | ||
IT | 25.02.2015 | ||
LT | 25.02.2015 | ||
LV | 25.02.2015 | ||
PL | 25.02.2015 | ||
RO | 25.02.2015 | ||
RS | 25.02.2015 | ||
SE | 25.02.2015 | ||
SI | 25.02.2015 | ||
SK | 25.02.2015 | ||
NO | 25.05.2015 | ||
GR | 26.05.2015 | ||
IS | 25.06.2015 | ||
Former [2016/03] | AT | 25.02.2015 | |
CZ | 25.02.2015 | ||
DK | 25.02.2015 | ||
EE | 25.02.2015 | ||
ES | 25.02.2015 | ||
FI | 25.02.2015 | ||
HR | 25.02.2015 | ||
IT | 25.02.2015 | ||
LT | 25.02.2015 | ||
LV | 25.02.2015 | ||
PL | 25.02.2015 | ||
RO | 25.02.2015 | ||
RS | 25.02.2015 | ||
SE | 25.02.2015 | ||
SK | 25.02.2015 | ||
NO | 25.05.2015 | ||
GR | 26.05.2015 | ||
IS | 25.06.2015 | ||
Former [2015/50] | AT | 25.02.2015 | |
CZ | 25.02.2015 | ||
DK | 25.02.2015 | ||
EE | 25.02.2015 | ||
ES | 25.02.2015 | ||
FI | 25.02.2015 | ||
HR | 25.02.2015 | ||
LT | 25.02.2015 | ||
LV | 25.02.2015 | ||
PL | 25.02.2015 | ||
RO | 25.02.2015 | ||
RS | 25.02.2015 | ||
SE | 25.02.2015 | ||
SK | 25.02.2015 | ||
NO | 25.05.2015 | ||
GR | 26.05.2015 | ||
IS | 25.06.2015 | ||
Former [2015/49] | AT | 25.02.2015 | |
CZ | 25.02.2015 | ||
DK | 25.02.2015 | ||
EE | 25.02.2015 | ||
ES | 25.02.2015 | ||
FI | 25.02.2015 | ||
HR | 25.02.2015 | ||
LT | 25.02.2015 | ||
LV | 25.02.2015 | ||
RO | 25.02.2015 | ||
RS | 25.02.2015 | ||
SE | 25.02.2015 | ||
SK | 25.02.2015 | ||
NO | 25.05.2015 | ||
GR | 26.05.2015 | ||
IS | 25.06.2015 | ||
Former [2015/39] | AT | 25.02.2015 | |
ES | 25.02.2015 | ||
FI | 25.02.2015 | ||
HR | 25.02.2015 | ||
LT | 25.02.2015 | ||
LV | 25.02.2015 | ||
RS | 25.02.2015 | ||
SE | 25.02.2015 | ||
NO | 25.05.2015 | ||
GR | 26.05.2015 | ||
IS | 25.06.2015 | ||
Former [2015/38] | AT | 25.02.2015 | |
ES | 25.02.2015 | ||
FI | 25.02.2015 | ||
HR | 25.02.2015 | ||
LT | 25.02.2015 | ||
SE | 25.02.2015 | ||
NO | 25.05.2015 | ||
GR | 26.05.2015 | ||
IS | 25.06.2015 | ||
Former [2015/37] | ES | 25.02.2015 | |
FI | 25.02.2015 | ||
HR | 25.02.2015 | ||
LT | 25.02.2015 | ||
SE | 25.02.2015 | ||
NO | 25.05.2015 | ||
GR | 26.05.2015 | ||
Former [2015/36] | ES | 25.02.2015 | |
FI | 25.02.2015 | ||
HR | 25.02.2015 | ||
LT | 25.02.2015 | ||
SE | 25.02.2015 | ||
NO | 25.05.2015 | ||
Former [2015/35] | ES | 25.02.2015 | |
LT | 25.02.2015 | ||
NO | 25.05.2015 | ||
Former [2015/33] | ES | 25.02.2015 | Documents cited: | Search | [XA]US5568166 (YAMAZAKI MANABU [JP]) [X] 1-7 * the whole document * [A] 8-10; | [X]EP2199238 (SAMSUNG ELECTRONICS CO LTD [KR]) [X] 1,2 * the whole document *; | [A]US5451043 (ARAI KIYOTAKA [JP]) [A] 1 * the whole document * |