EP2444069 - Controlled release compositions [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 10.04.2020 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 03.05.2019 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 13.12.2018 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 27.04.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 09.07.2021 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): HU | published on 11.08.2021 [2021/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Evonik Corporation 299 Jefferson Road Parsippany NJ 07054 / US | [2013/39] |
Former [2012/33] | For all designated states Surmodics Pharmaceuticals, Inc. 756 Tom Martin Drive Birmingham AL 35211 / US | ||
Former [2012/17] | For all designated states PR Pharmaceuticals Inc. 1716 Heath Parkway Fort Collins, CO 80522 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Cook, Cary P. 1426 S. Bowen St. Longmont, CO 80501 / US | [2012/19] | Representative(s) | Dehns St. Bride's House 10 Salisbury Square London EC4Y 8JD / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2019/23] | Dehns St. Brides House 10 Salisbury Square London EC4Y 8JD / GB | ||
Former [2012/17] | Golding, Louise Ann Dehns St Bride's House 10 Salisbury Square London EC4Y 8JD / GB | Application number, filing date | 11187401.2 | 15.07.2004 | [2012/17] | Priority number, date | US20030489402P | 23.07.2003 Original published format: US 489402 P | [2012/17] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2444069 | Date: | 25.04.2012 | Language: | EN | [2012/17] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2444069 | Date: | 05.06.2019 | Language: | EN | [2019/23] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 28.03.2012 | Classification | IPC: | A61K9/14, A61K9/16, A61K9/50, A61K9/51, A61K38/09, A61K38/11, A61K38/28, A61K38/31, A61K31/715, A61K47/54, A61K47/60 | [2018/51] | CPC: |
A61K9/1694 (EP,US);
A61K31/715 (EP,US);
A61K38/09 (EP,US);
A61K38/095 (EP,US);
A61K38/28 (EP,US);
A61K38/31 (EP,US);
A61K47/541 (EP,US);
A61K47/60 (EP,US);
A61K9/1647 (EP,US);
|
Former IPC [2012/17] | A61K9/14, A61K9/16, A61K9/51, A61K38/00, A61K47/48 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2019/23] |
Former [2012/17] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Zusammensetzung mit kontrollierter Freisetzung | [2012/17] | English: | Controlled release compositions | [2012/17] | French: | Compositions à libération contrôlée | [2012/17] | Examination procedure | 25.10.2012 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 25.10.2012 | Examination requested [2012/49] | 29.01.2013 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 01.08.2013 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 03.07.2015 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 15.02.2016 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time | 25.04.2016 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 17.04.2018 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 29.10.2018 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 14.12.2018 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 24.04.2019 | Fee for grant paid | 24.04.2019 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 24.04.2019 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP04778361.8 / EP1656115 | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued (EP20040778361) is 22.10.2009 | Opposition(s) | 06.03.2020 | No opposition filed within time limit [2020/20] | Request for further processing for: | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to reply to the examination report | 25.04.2016 | Request for further processing filed | 25.04.2016 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 09.05.2016 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 01.03.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 01.03.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 01.03.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 01.03.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 01.03.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 01.03.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 23.07.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 22.07.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 23.07.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | 23.07.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 12 | 22.07.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 13 | 24.07.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 14 | 27.07.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 15 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 15.07.2004 | AT | 05.06.2019 | CY | 05.06.2019 | CZ | 05.06.2019 | DK | 05.06.2019 | EE | 05.06.2019 | FI | 05.06.2019 | MC | 05.06.2019 | PL | 05.06.2019 | RO | 05.06.2019 | SI | 05.06.2019 | SK | 05.06.2019 | TR | 05.06.2019 | LU | 15.07.2019 | BE | 31.07.2019 | BG | 05.09.2019 | GR | 06.09.2019 | PT | 07.10.2019 | [2021/32] |
Former [2021/26] | AT | 05.06.2019 | |
CY | 05.06.2019 | ||
CZ | 05.06.2019 | ||
DK | 05.06.2019 | ||
EE | 05.06.2019 | ||
FI | 05.06.2019 | ||
MC | 05.06.2019 | ||
PL | 05.06.2019 | ||
RO | 05.06.2019 | ||
SI | 05.06.2019 | ||
SK | 05.06.2019 | ||
TR | 05.06.2019 | ||
LU | 15.07.2019 | ||
BE | 31.07.2019 | ||
BG | 05.09.2019 | ||
GR | 06.09.2019 | ||
PT | 07.10.2019 | ||
Former [2020/25] | AT | 05.06.2019 | |
CZ | 05.06.2019 | ||
DK | 05.06.2019 | ||
EE | 05.06.2019 | ||
FI | 05.06.2019 | ||
MC | 05.06.2019 | ||
PL | 05.06.2019 | ||
RO | 05.06.2019 | ||
SI | 05.06.2019 | ||
SK | 05.06.2019 | ||
TR | 05.06.2019 | ||
LU | 15.07.2019 | ||
BE | 31.07.2019 | ||
BG | 05.09.2019 | ||
GR | 06.09.2019 | ||
PT | 07.10.2019 | ||
Former [2020/22] | AT | 05.06.2019 | |
CZ | 05.06.2019 | ||
DK | 05.06.2019 | ||
EE | 05.06.2019 | ||
FI | 05.06.2019 | ||
MC | 05.06.2019 | ||
RO | 05.06.2019 | ||
SK | 05.06.2019 | ||
TR | 05.06.2019 | ||
BG | 05.09.2019 | ||
GR | 06.09.2019 | ||
PT | 07.10.2019 | ||
Former [2020/17] | AT | 05.06.2019 | |
CZ | 05.06.2019 | ||
EE | 05.06.2019 | ||
FI | 05.06.2019 | ||
MC | 05.06.2019 | ||
RO | 05.06.2019 | ||
SK | 05.06.2019 | ||
TR | 05.06.2019 | ||
BG | 05.09.2019 | ||
GR | 06.09.2019 | ||
PT | 07.10.2019 | ||
Former [2020/11] | AT | 05.06.2019 | |
CZ | 05.06.2019 | ||
EE | 05.06.2019 | ||
FI | 05.06.2019 | ||
RO | 05.06.2019 | ||
SK | 05.06.2019 | ||
BG | 05.09.2019 | ||
GR | 06.09.2019 | ||
PT | 07.10.2019 | ||
Former [2020/10] | AT | 05.06.2019 | |
CZ | 05.06.2019 | ||
FI | 05.06.2019 | ||
RO | 05.06.2019 | ||
BG | 05.09.2019 | ||
GR | 06.09.2019 | ||
PT | 07.10.2019 | ||
Former [2020/09] | CZ | 05.06.2019 | |
FI | 05.06.2019 | ||
BG | 05.09.2019 | ||
GR | 06.09.2019 | ||
Former [2019/51] | FI | 05.06.2019 | |
BG | 05.09.2019 | ||
GR | 06.09.2019 | ||
Former [2019/48] | FI | 05.06.2019 | Documents cited: | Search | [X]WO9832423 (TAKEDA CHEMICAL INDUSTRIES LTD [JP], et al) [X] 1-11 * page 10 - page 14 * * page 10, line 36 * * page 48 - page 49; example 11 *; | [X]US5876761 (BODMER DAVID [CH], et al) [X] 1-11 * examples 1-10 *; | [XI]US6120805 (SPENLEHAUER GILLES [FR], et al) [X] 1-9,11 * column 4; example 1 * [I] 10; | [E]WO2004078147 (PR PHARMACEUTICALS [US], et al) [E] 1-9,11 * page 27; example 3 * | Examination | US2003134800 | by applicant | US5776885 | WO2004US11485 |