EP2590325 - Thermally compensated ceramic resonator [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 23.05.2014 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 23.05.2014 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 25.06.2014 [2014/26] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states The Swatch Group Research and Development Ltd. Rue des Sors 3 2074 Marin / CH | [2013/19] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Hessler, Thierry Rue de l'Hôpital 3a 2024 St-Aubin / CH | 02 /
Dubois, Philippe Rue de la Gare 32 2074 Marin / CH | 03 /
Conus, Thierry Rebweg 12 2543 Lengnau / CH | [2013/19] | Representative(s) | Couillard, Yann Luc Raymond, et al ICB Ingénieurs Conseils en Brevets SA Faubourg de l'Hôpital 3 2001 Neuchâtel / CH | [N/P] |
Former [2013/19] | Couillard, Yann Luc Raymond, et al ICB Ingénieurs Conseils en Brevets Faubourg de l'Hôpital 3 2001 Neuchâtel / CH | Application number, filing date | 11187854.2 | 04.11.2011 | [2013/19] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2590325 | Date: | 08.05.2013 | Language: | FR | [2013/19] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 17.02.2012 | Classification | IPC: | H03H9/02, H03H9/24, H03H3/007 | [2013/19] | CPC: |
G04B17/22 (EP,US);
H03H9/131 (CN);
G04B17/227 (US);
G04B17/24 (US);
H03H3/0075 (CN);
H03H3/0076 (EP,CN,US);
H03H3/04 (CN);
H03H9/02448 (EP,US);
H03H9/215 (CN);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2013/19] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | Thermokompensierter Resonator aus Keramik | [2013/19] | English: | Thermally compensated ceramic resonator | [2013/19] | French: | Résonateur thermocompensé en céramique | [2013/19] | Examination procedure | 09.11.2013 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2014/26] | 03.01.2014 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [2014/26] | Fees paid | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.11.2013 | 03   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XI]EP1422436 (CSEMCT SUISSE D ELECTRONIQUE E [CH]) [X] 1-4,8,11 * figures 1,2 * [I] 5-7,10; | [XI]WO2008043727 (SUISSE ELECTRONIQUE MICROTECH [CH], et al) [X] 1-5,9,10 * figure 1; claim 1 * [I] 6-8,11; | [XI]WO2011072960 (SWATCH GROUP RES & DEV LTD [CH], et al) [X] 1-4,8-11 * figure 3; claim 1 * [I] 5-7; | [XI]WO2009068091 (MANUF ET FABRIQUE DE MONTRES E [CH], et al) [X] 1-5,8,11 * figures 3,4 * * page 7, lines 8-15 * [I] 6,7 | by applicant | EP1422436 | WO2008043727 | WO2007059876 |